Logue v. Root et al
Plaintiff: Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr.
Defendant: C.D.O. Cooper, Jennifer Root, Michael Buckley, Liz Fisher and Tammy Bowen
Case Number: 9:2019cv00101
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
2 Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/5/2019. (APP) copy mailed to Logue
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 OBJECTION to #21 Findings and Recommendations filed by Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. (TAG). Modified on 7/30/2019 to attache properly scanned document; NEF regenerated (TAG).
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT re #18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter) (TAG)
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Goicoechea on behalf of Tammy Bowen, C.D.O. Cooper, Jennifer Root (Goicoechea, Sean)
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tammy Bowen, C.D.O. Cooper, Jennifer Root. (Goicoechea, Sean)
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay and OBJECTION re #21 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TAG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 SUPERSEDING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 , #17 MOTIONS to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/17/2019. Mailed to Logue (TAG)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER staying and holding in abeyance #18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting #19 "Supplemental to Amended Complaint" as described. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/17/2019. Mailed to Logue; identified documents returned to Logue as directed. (TAG)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner, by Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. (TAG)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (TAG)
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner, by Plaintiff Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TAG)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. Ruling on #13 MOTION to Amend reserved; #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel denied, #14 MOTION for Leave to File denied, exhibits stricken. Response due by 7/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/2/2019. Mailed to Logue (TAG)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE by Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr re #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner,, #14 MOTION for Leave to File, #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (TAG)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits by Plaintiff Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 STRICKEN Exhibit) (TAG) Modified on 7/2/2019: attachment stricken per #16 (TAG).
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner, by Plaintiff Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TAG)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TAG)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Clerk to Serve defendant(s). Waiver of Service of Summons is due within 30 days of this Order; if executed, an answer or other appropriate motion is due within 60 days of this Order. Waiver of Service due by 7/29/2019. Notice of Appearance due by 8/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/28/2019. Mailed to Logue; documents forwarded to defendants as directed. (TAG)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/28/2019. Mailed to Logue (TAG) Modified on 7/17/2019: document superseded by #21 (TAG).
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Brief/Response to #7 Order filed by Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. (TAG)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Logue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/21/2019. Mailed to Logue and MCDF (TAG)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis granted. Response due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/21/2019. Mailed to Logue (TAG)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner, by Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. (TAG)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. (TAG)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. Amendment to #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (TAG)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Logue with docket sheet (TAG)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Case Law Citation, #3 Exhibit State Court Statement of Facts, #4 Motion to Enter Exhibits, #5 Exhibit, #6 Letter) (TAG) Modified on 6/21/2019: complaint deemed filed (TAG).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TAG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2019: #1 Amended Page 2) (TAG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logue v. Root et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.D.O. Cooper
Represented By: Sean P. Goicoechea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Root
Represented By: Sean P. Goicoechea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Bowen
Represented By: Sean P. Goicoechea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Redmond Logue, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?