Center for Biological Diversity v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: David Bernhardt and Margaret Everson
Case Number: 9:2019cv00109
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, other case initiating documents served on US Attorney Alme, USFWS Director Everson, Attorney General Barr, Secretary Bernhardt on 7/1/19, 7/3/19, 7/5/19, 7/8/19 respectively, filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Adkins, Collette)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Acknowledgment of PHV Order - Andrea Santarsiere appearing for Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Santarsiere, Andrea) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct docket text. (ASG).
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Center for Biological Diversity (Adkins, Collette)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Collette L. Adkins and Andrea Santarsiere for Center for Biological Diversity. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/28/2019. (ASG)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Collette Adkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2330668.) Kristine Marie Akland appearing for Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Adkins Dec, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Akland, Kristine)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Andrea Santarsiere to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2330661.) Kristine Marie Akland appearing for Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Santarsiere Dec., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Akland, Kristine)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Originals mailed to Counsel Akland. (ASG)
June 27, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2329913. (NOS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (CDH) Modified on 6/27/2019 to reflect NEF regenerated to counsel with proper header(CDH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Everson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Kristine Marie Akland
Represented By: Collette L. Adkins
Represented By: Andrea Santarsiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?