Taylor v. Saul
Plaintiff: Brooke Lynn Taylor
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 9:2019cv00111
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
2 Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/5/2019. (APP)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Martin on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Martin, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Emailed to counsel (APP)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/1/2019. (TXB)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Brooke Lynn Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (APP) Modified on 7/2/2019 to reflect removing "Lodged" from this entry (APP).
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Eric Rasmusson appearing for Plaintiff Brooke Lynn Taylor. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (APP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Justin Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Lynn Taylor
Represented By: Eric Rasmusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?