Brasier v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Travis Brasier
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00112
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING CASE. Status Report due by 1/28/2020. The preliminary pretrial conference set for 9/26/2019 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/1/2019. (dle)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Travis Brasier of Acceptance of Offer to Arbitrate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - Copy of Offer to Arbitrate) (Coburn, Torrance)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/19/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/19/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/19/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/24/2019. (dle)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against United Parcel Service, Inc. filed by Travis Brasier. (NOS)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Receipt of State Court File from Missoula County District Court. (Attachments: #1 2 - Summons Issued, #2 3 - Notice of Removal) (NOS)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Gomez, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2332955. (ASG)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service, Inc. (ASG)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number Case No. DV-18-541. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brasier v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle L. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Brasier
Represented By: Torrance Lee Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?