Leitner v. Johnson Restaurant Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gregory Leitner, Jr.
Defendant: Johnson Restaurant Group, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00122
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #5 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, C. J. Johnson appearing for Plaintiff Gregory Leitner, Jr (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Johnson, C.)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/4/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/4/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/4/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 1:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/28/2019. (dle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Johnson Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Faure, Jean)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Proof of Service filed by Gregory Leitner, Jr. Service by Process Server on July 25, 2019. (Johnson, C.)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Johnson Restaurant Group, Inc. Original mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (NOS)
July 23, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2341527. (NOS)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson Restaurant Group, Inc. d/b/a Old Chicago Pizza & Taproom filed by Gregory Leitner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leitner v. Johnson Restaurant Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Leitner, Jr.
Represented By: C. J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Restaurant Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jean E. Faure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?