Howard v. Blackmer et al
Plaintiff: Susan E. Howard
Defendant: Raymond Blackmer and Does I - V
Case Number: 9:2019cv00133
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - RE-SETTING: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/23/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/23/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/23/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/30/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Motions terminated: #6 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by Susan E. Howard. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/4/2019. (dle)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference Samantha P. Travis appearing for Plaintiff Susan E. Howard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Travis, Samantha)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/10/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/10/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/10/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/28/2019. (dle)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Raymond Blackmer. (NOS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Raymond Blackmer, Does I - V filed by Susan E. Howard. (NOS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE (via electronic transfer). (Attachments: #1 Doc. 2 - Waiver of Service of Summons, #2 Doc. 4 - Notice of Filing, #3 Doc. 4.1 - Removal to Fed. Court) (NOS)
August 12, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2351033 (TAG)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 11th Judicial District Court of Flathead County, case number DV-15-2017-0000589-NE, filed by Raymond Blackmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Blackmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan E. Howard
Represented By: Samantha P. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Blackmer
Represented By: Dale R. Cockrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I - V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?