Hufstedler v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Diane Hufstedler
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 9:2019cv00158
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Setting: Dismissal Papers due by 12/16/2019. The preliminary pretrial conference set for 11/14/2019 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/14/2019. (dle)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Vacate #6 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, and Notice of Settlement Ryan T. Heuwinkel appearing for Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Diane Hufstedler. (Joos, Brian)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Diane Hufstedler. (Joos, Brian)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Diane Hufstedler. (Joos, Brian)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/7/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/7/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/7/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/8/2019. (dle)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Bohyer, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed in state court on 3/11/2019 against Safeco Insurance Company of America. (ASG)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of state court file (via file share program). (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Order for Change of Venue, #3 Transfer Receipt, #4 Notice of Record Received, #5 Summons, #6 Notice of Removal) (ASG)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (APP) Modified on 9/20/2019 to reflect change in filing date (CDH).
September 19, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2369745 (APP) Modified on 9/20/2019 to reflect change in filing date (CDH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hufstedler v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Ryan T. Heuwinkel
Represented By: John E. Bohyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hufstedler
Represented By: Brian Joos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?