Mountain View Orchards et al v. Northwest Wholesale, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mountain View Orchards and Charles L. Swanson
Defendant: John Does I through V, Northwest Wholesale, Inc. and Westbridge Agricultural
Case Number: 9:2019cv00172
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply brief due 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/10/2019. (ASG)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Response to Motion, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Northwest Wholesale's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Northwest Wholesales's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Patrick M. Sullivan appearing for Defendant Northwest Wholesale, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Sullivan, Patrick)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #8 Response to Motion by Mountain View Orchards, Charles L. Swanson. (Dailey, Timothy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Northwest Wholesale's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Mountain View Orchards, Charles L. Swanson. (Dailey, Timothy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Westbridge Agricultural Products ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Westbridge Agricultural. (Hammer, Todd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #5 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Northwest Wholesale's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Affidavit of Ken Knappert by Northwest Wholesale, Inc.. (Sullivan, Patrick)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Northwest Wholesale's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Northwest Wholesale, Inc.. (Sullivan, Patrick)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Northwest Wholesale's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Patrick M. Sullivan appearing for Defendant Northwest Wholesale, Inc. (Sullivan, Patrick)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in state court on September 12, 2019. (ASG)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of state court docket sheet and complaint. Original placed on shelf in Clerk's Office. (ASG)
October 17, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2384395 (APP)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Westbridge Agricultural from Twenty-First Judicial District, Ravalli County, case number DV-19-341. (Attachments: #1 State Court Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (APP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain View Orchards et al v. Northwest Wholesale, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain View Orchards
Represented By: Timothy E. Dailey
Represented By: Rachel H. Parkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L. Swanson
Represented By: Timothy E. Dailey
Represented By: Rachel H. Parkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I through V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Wholesale, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westbridge Agricultural
Represented By: Todd A. Hammer
Represented By: Marcel A. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?