Beardsley v. Motion and Flow Control Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Albert Beardsley
Defendant: Motion and Flow Control Products, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00174
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Beardsley. Motion and Flow Control Products, Inc. served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Service of Process) (Kovacich, Mark)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Resetting Initial Conference for 1/28/2020 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto.Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 11/5/2019. (SMD)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 10/28/2019. (SMD)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Motion and Flow Control Products, Inc. Originals mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (KJL)
October 25, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2389635 (KJL)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Motion and Flow Control Products, Inc., filed by Albert Beardsley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beardsley v. Motion and Flow Control Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Beardsley
Represented By: Paul D. Odegaard
Represented By: Mark Kovacich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion and Flow Control Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?