IN THE MATTER OF: MARGARET M. NOYCE 1976 TRUST
Petitioner: Margaret M. Noyce
Trustee: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00178
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #9 BRIEF ADDRESSING FEDERAL JURISDICTION AND TRUST PROCEDURE filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Etchart, Mark) (Modified to link to brief.) (NOS)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Leave to File responsive briefs. Bank of America may file a responsive brief within 7 days of this Order. Noyce may file a reply brief, if any, within 10 days of the responsive brief's filing. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/23/2019. (dle)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Briefs Mark D. Etchart appearing for Trustee Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Responsive Briefs) (Etchart, Mark)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #7 Order BRIEF ADDRESSING FEDERAL JURISDICTION AND TRUST PROCEDURE filed by Margaret M. Noyce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Order to Terminate Trust, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - 1976 Trust Agreement) (Hupp, Dana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #7 Order re Removal filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Etchart, Mark)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Margaret M. Noyce: On or before 12/17/2019, the parties shall file separate briefs. See Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/3/2019. (dle)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay Dana L. Hupp appearing for Petitioner Margaret M. Noyce (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hupp, Dana)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Verified Petition to Compel Distribution and Remove Trustee. (NOS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Receipt of State Court File from Missoula County District Court. (Attachments: #1 2 - Motion for Extension, #2 3 - Order granting Motion) File received through electronic file transfer system. (NOS)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Verified Response ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) to Verified Petition to Compel Distribution and Remove Trustee by Bank of America, N.A.. (Etchart, Mark)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A.. (Etchart, Mark)
November 5, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2393976 (TAG)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A. from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DP-19-214. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN THE MATTER OF: MARGARET M. NOYCE 1976 TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Mark D. Etchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Margaret M. Noyce
Represented By: Dana L. Hupp
Represented By: Natalie L. Black
Represented By: William E. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?