Davis v. PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mitchell Davis
Defendant: PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00180
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:19-cv-00045. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (ASG, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2019 before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Crtrm Administrator: M. Johansen; Pla Counsel: Joseph Mott; Def Counsel: Alissa Bestick and Jeffrey Ballin; Court Reporter: Heather Newman; Recording start and end times: 10:42 a.m. - 11:12 a.m.; Courtroom: Thomas & Mack Moot Court Room at UNLV's Boyd School of Law; The court makes preliminary remarks regarding defendant's motion to dismiss ECF. #10 . Arguments are heard.IT IS ORDERED that this case is transferred to the District of Montana. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this case to the DISTRICT OF MONTANA and CLOSE THIS CASE. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 10/22/2019. Oral argument on defendant PacificSource Health Plan's motion to dismiss #10 will be held on Wednesday, October 30, 2019 on a stacked calendar beginning at 10:00 a.m. in the Thomas & Mack Moot Court Room at UNLV's Boyd School of Law. Each side will be limited to 10 minutes of argument time. Judge Gordon strongly encourages litigants to permit more junior members of the litigation team (especially for this hearing, Boyd Law graduates) to appear for oral argument. Judge Gordon will entertain reasonable requests for a more senior attorney to supplement arguments made by a junior attorney.We have arranged a limited number of reserved parking spaces at UNLV for the lawyers who are arguing cases. Carpooling is encouraged. If you would like to park on campus, please notify my chambers (702-868-4940) as soon as possible so your name can be added to the list of reserved parking spaces. First come, first served.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS) Modified on 10/23/2019 to reflect correct date(MMM). [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT re #10 Motion to Dismiss, filed by PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bestick, Alissa) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #23 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #20 Scheduling Order (First Request). Discovery due by 3/9/2020. Motions due by 4/6/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 23 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery by Defendant PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.. (Bestick, Alissa) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #13 defendant PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.'s unopposed motion to supplement is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a copy of the Policy on or before 8/16/19. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER re #19 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/9/2019. Motions due by 1/7/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Mitchell Davis (Mott, Joseph) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.. (Bestick, Alissa) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #10 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Replies due by 4/23/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #10 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by Defendant PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.. (Bestick, Alissa) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Mitchell Davis. Replies due by 4/16/2019. (Mott, Joseph) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #10 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 4/9/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Motion to Dismiss re #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.. (Bestick, Alissa) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #10 First MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Davis. (Mott, Joseph) Court modified on 3/27/2019 to add docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (TR). [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bestick, Alissa) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.. Responses due by 3/27/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/27/2019. (Bestick, Alissa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #5 Amended Complaint (First Request). PacificSource Health Plans, Inc. answer due 3/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer by Defendant PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.. (Bestick, Alissa) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by PacificSource Health Plans, Inc. on 2/6/2019 executed by Mitchell Davis. (Mott, Joseph) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to PacificSource Health Plans, Inc. re #5 Amended Complaint. (ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Mitchell Davis. Adds and removes parties. Proof of service due by 5/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Mott, Joseph) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/8/2019. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PacificSource Health Plans, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mitchell Davis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mott, Joseph) [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PacificSource Health Plans, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5383561) by Mitchell Davis. Proof of service due by 4/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Mott, Joseph) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 11/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Davis
Represented By: Scott E Lundy
Represented By: Joseph Nathan Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacificSource Health Plans, Inc.
Represented By: Alissa N. Bestick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?