Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Folkman et al
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Defendant: Does 1-10, John Kuelbs, State Farm Fire and Casualty Co., Slopeside Condominium Association, Inc., Matthew Folkman and AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv00189
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Matthew Folkman. Original mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (NOS)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Matthew Folkman, re #1 Complaint (Carlson, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. John Kuelbs waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020; State Farm Fire and Casualty Co. waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Carlson, Robert)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Slopeside Condominium Association, Inc. waiver sent on 11/25/2019, answer due 1/24/2020. (Carlson, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Co. Original mailed to Plaintiff's Counsel. (NOS)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Carlson, Robert)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Submission of Proposed Summons as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Co., re #1 Complaint (Carlson, Robert)
November 21, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2403704 (KJL)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Folkman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kuelbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slopeside Condominium Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Folkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Marshal L. Mickelson
Represented By: Robert M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?