Anderson v. Haar et al
Plaintiff: Neoma Anderson
Defendant: John Doe Persons and Entities 1 through X, James Haar and Beth Haar
Case Number: 9:2019cv00201
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel: Tessa A. Keller withdrawing from the case, filed by Beth Haar, James Haar (Keller, Tessa)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - RE-SETTING: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/6/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/6/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/6/2020. Preliminary Pretrial Conference RESET for 3/13/2020 at 9:00 AM in Room 201, Alexander Blewett III School of Law, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/7/2020. (dle)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elijah Inabnit on behalf of Beth Haar, James Haar (Inabnit, Elijah)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/7/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/7/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/7/2020. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/8/2020. (dle)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Beth Haar, James Haar, John Doe Persons and Entities 1 through X filed by Neoma Anderson. (NOS)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. (Attachments: #1 2, #2 3, #3 4, #4 5, #5 6, #6 7, #7 8) (File sent via electronic transfer.) (NOS)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Beth Haar, James Haar. (Luck, Bradley) (Modified to link to Complaint.) (NOS)
December 18, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2416706 (APP)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Haar, Beth Haar from Montana Eleventh Judicial District Court, State of Montana, Flathead County, case number DV-17-617. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Proof of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (APP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Haar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Persons and Entities 1 through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Haar
Represented By: Bradley J. Luck
Represented By: Tessa A. Keller
Represented By: Elijah Inabnit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Haar
Represented By: Bradley J. Luck
Represented By: Tessa A. Keller
Represented By: Elijah Inabnit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neoma Anderson
Represented By: L. Jason Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?