Tosdal v. NorthWestern Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Tosdal
Defendant: Does 1-5 and NorthWestern Corporation
Case Number: 9:2019cv00205
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 34 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Dana L. Christensen: Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2020 re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NorthWestern Corporation, #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas Tosdal. Thomas Tosdal appearing pro se; J. Jackson and Stephen Bell appearing on behalf of NorthWestern Corporation. Cross motions are argued by Mr. Tosdal and Mr. Jackson. Court takes matter under advisement. In recess. Hearing commenced at 1:31pm and concluded at 3:51pm. (Court Reporter JoAnn Corson.) (Law Clerk: S. Best), (Hearing held in Missoula, MT) (ASG)
February 14, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas Tosdal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (TAG)
February 14, 2020 Filing 32 AMENDED DOCUMENT by NorthWestern Corporation. Amendment to #31 Reply to Response to Motion Certiciate of Word Compliance. (Bell, Stephen)
February 14, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NorthWestern Corporation. (Bell, Stephen)
February 7, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED DOCUMENT by NorthWestern Corporation. Amendment to #28 Response to Motion Certificate of Compliance. (Bell, Stephen)
February 7, 2020 Filing 29 Statement of Disputed Facts re: #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NorthWestern Corporation. (Bell, Stephen)
February 7, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NorthWestern Corporation. (Bell, Stephen)
February 7, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Tosdal re #26 Statement of Disputed Facts, #25 Response to Motion, (TAG)
February 7, 2020 Filing 26 Response/Statement of Disputed Facts re: #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Tosdal. (TAG)
February 7, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Tosdal. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Affidavit, #3 Objection to Evidence, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15) (TAG)
January 17, 2020 Filing 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support and SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (filed as attachment 24-7) re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NorthWestern Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John Hines, #2 Exhibit A, B & C, #3 Affidavit Timothy Olson, #4 Exhibit A & B, #5 Supplement Index of Linked Citations, #6 Supplement Index of Exhibits, #7 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Facts, #8 Text of Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment) (Bell, Stephen) (Modified to add docket text.) (NOS)
January 17, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment Stephen D. Bell appearing for Defendant NorthWestern Corporation (Bell, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Tosdal re #21 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment; MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Submission Emails) (TAG)
January 17, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas Tosdal. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15) (TAG)
January 17, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Thomas Tosdal. (TAG)
January 13, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by NorthWestern Corporation. (Bell, Stephen)
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by NorthWestern Corporation re #16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jackson, J.)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting: Cross Motions due by 1/17/2020. Responses due by 2/7/2020. Replies due by 2/14/2020. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2020 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/8/2020. (dle)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J. David Jackson for NorthWestern Corporation. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/8/2020. (ASG)
January 8, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY: Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana L. Christensen: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/8/2020. (Law Clerk: S. Best), (Hearing held in Missoula) (dle)
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION J David Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX900014627.) Stephen D. Bell appearing for Defendant NorthWestern Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Amended) of J David Jackson) (Bell, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER SETTING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 1:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. The parties will be advised of the dial-in information by separate email. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/7/2020. (dle)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying subject to renewal #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/7/2020. (ASG)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Order/Judgment regarding Motion for Scheduling Order Stephen D. Bell appearing for Defendant NorthWestern Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Bell, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION J David Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX900014627.) Stephen D. Bell appearing for Defendant NorthWestern Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of J David Jackson) (Bell, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D. Bell on behalf of NorthWestern Corporation (Bell, Stephen)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 Proof of Service filed by Thomas Tosdal. Service by Summons on 12/23/19. (TAG)
December 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto no longer assigned to case. (ASG)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief U.S. District Judge Dana L. Christensen for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/23/2019. (ASG)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/23/2019. (TXB)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Complaint (TAG)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail. (TAG)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-mail by Thomas Tosdal. (TAG)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Thomas Tosdal (TAG)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NorthWestern Corporation. (TAG)
December 23, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number MTX9-14572 (TAG)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Tosdal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tosdal v. NorthWestern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthWestern Corporation
Represented By: J. David Jackson
Represented By: Stephen D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tosdal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?