Doyle et al v. Kalispell Regional Healthcare
Plaintiff: Annette Nevidomsky and Connie Doyle
Defendant: Kalispell Regional Healthcare
Case Number: 9:2019cv00208
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL Brief/Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Failure to State a Claim filed by Kalispell Regional Healthcare in Response to Order, Doc. 17. (Zadick, Gary) (Text modified.) (NOS)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that by February 19, 2020, Kalispell Regional shall file a supplemental brief in support of its motion to dismiss. Response due by March 11, 2020. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/13/2020. (NOS)
February 10, 2020 Filing 16 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Failure to State a Claim filed by Kalispell Regional Healthcare. (Zadick, Gary)
February 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Failure to State a Claim Gary M. Zadick appearing for Defendant Kalispell Regional Healthcare (Zadick, Gary)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion. Defendant may file an 8,000-word brief in support of its anticipated motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs may file an 8,000-word response brief. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/5/2020. (ASG)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION File Overlength Brief Re Motion to Dismiss Gary M. Zadick appearing for Defendant Kalispell Regional Healthcare (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Zadick, Gary)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Connie Doyle, Annette Nevidomsky re #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Klinger, Gary)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk of Court to PHV Counsel Klinger regarding CM/ECF registration. (NEF sent to local counsel.) (NOS)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gary M. Klinger. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/16/2020. (APP)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION Gary M. Klinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2427848.) William A. Rossbach appearing for Plaintiffs Connie Doyle, Annette Nevidomsky (Attachments: #1 PHV Application, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Rossbach, William)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Connie Doyle, Annette Nevidomsky re #7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Mason, Gary)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Gary E. Mason for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/10/2020. Served via CM/ECF on local counsel. (ASG)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 Submission of Proposed Order re: #5 MOTION Gary E. Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2425125.). (Rossbach, William)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION Gary E. Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2425125.) William A. Rossbach appearing for Plaintiffs Connie Doyle, Annette Nevidomsky (Attachments: #1 PHV Application, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Rossbach, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Connie Doyle, Annette Nevidomsky. Kalispell Regional Healthcare served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Rossbach, William)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kalispell Regional Healthcare. Original emailed to counsel (APP)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 Submission of Proposed Summons as to All Defendants, re #1 Complaint (Rossbach, William)
December 24, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2419177. (ASG)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Connie Doyle and Annette Nevidomsky. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle et al v. Kalispell Regional Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Nevidomsky
Represented By: William A. Rossbach
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Doyle
Represented By: William A. Rossbach
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalispell Regional Healthcare
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?