Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Outback Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: D. Shameen Cochrell, Outback Construction, Inc., Tanner Cochrell and Shameen Cochrell
Case Number: 9:2020cv00004
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Quentin M. Rhoades, Susan G. Ridgeway, Jan D. Sokol. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/19/2020. (APP)
February 27, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Outback Construction, Inc. (NOS)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default of Outback Construction, Inc. Susan G. Ridgeway appearing for Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Ridgeway, Susan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet of Outback Construction, Inc. served on Outback COnstruction, Inc. on 1/17/20, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Ridgeway, Susan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet of D. Shameen Cochrell served on D Shameen Cochrell on 1/17/20, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Ridgeway, Susan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet on Tanner Cochrell served on Tanner Cochrell on 1/17/20, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Ridgeway, Susan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by D. Shameen Cochrell, Tanner Cochrell. (Rhoades, Quentin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company re #6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Sokol, Jan)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jan D. Sokol for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/17/2020. (APP)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.. (Ridgeway, Susan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Jan D. Sokol to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2429480.) Susan G. Ridgeway appearing for Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Ridgeway, Susan)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/9/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/9/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/9/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/15/2020. (TXB)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Originals mailed to plaintiff's counsel. (KJL)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 General Indemnity Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Outback Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Shameen Cochrell
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outback Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanner Cochrell
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shameen Cochrell
Represented By: Quentin M. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan G. Ridgeway
Represented By: Jan D. Sokol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?