Burrese v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Yi-Saeng Ham Burrese
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 9:2020cv00010
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Originals to Plaintiff's representative at clerk's office.) (NOS)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE, #2 PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL PER L.R. 83.8) (APP)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/26/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/26/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/26/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 2/3/2020. (SMD) Modified on 2/12/2020 Copy mailed to Burrese (APP).
January 31, 2020 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number MTX9-14703 (APP)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States of America, filed by Yi-Saeng Ham Burrese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (APP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrese v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yi-Saeng Ham Burrese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?