Spencer et al v. Black et al
Plaintiff: Catherine Spencer and Kurt Spencer
Defendant: Kathi Hooper, Dr. Brad Black and Lincoln County
Case Number: 9:2020cv00012
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Brad Black, Kathi Hooper, Lincoln County. (Lennon, Maureen)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto (APP)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENTS TO USMJ. (APP)
March 6, 2020 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Catherine Spencer, Kurt Spencer. (Guth, Amy)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice Amy Guth appearing for Plaintiffs Catherine Spencer, Kurt Spencer Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Guth, Amy)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Christensen. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable DeSoto. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/5/2020. (APP)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kurt Spencer, Catherine Spencer. (APP)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT DOCUMENTS (APP) (Additional attachment(s) added: #1 Transfer Receipt) (NOS).
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brad Black, Kathi Hooper, Lincoln County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order & Opinion) (Lennon, Maureen)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brad Black, Kathi Hooper, Lincoln County. (Lennon, Maureen)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Maureen H. Lennon, Amy Guth. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/28/2020. (APP) Copy mailed to Amy Guth
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 CM/ECF REGISTRATION Letter to Amy Guth (APP)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/27/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/27/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/27/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 2/4/2020. (SMD)
January 31, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2436015 (KJL)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Montana Nineteenth Judicial District Court, Lincoln County, case number DV 19-122., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer et al v. Black et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathi Hooper
Represented By: Maureen H. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Brad Black
Represented By: Maureen H. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln County
Represented By: Maureen H. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Spencer
Represented By: Amy Guth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Spencer
Represented By: Amy Guth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?