Melson v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Eric Melson
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv00042
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (McCann, M. Christy)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant FCA US LLC (McCann, M. Christy)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen A. D'Aunoy. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/15/2020. (NOS)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION Stephen A. D'Aunoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2481570.) M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stephen A. D'Aunoy, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McCann, M. Christy)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer FCA US LLC answer due 5/20/2020. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/7/2020. (ASG)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint M. Christy S. McCann appearing for Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McCann, M. Christy)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC. (McCann, M. Christy)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (Emailed to counsel.) (NOS)
March 27, 2020 Filing fee of $400 received; receipt number 0977-2462523. (NOS)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, filed by Eric Melson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melson v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Melson
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Stephen A. D'Aunoy
Represented By: Leo S. Ward
Represented By: M. Christy S. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?