Pierce Flooring, Inc. v. Armstrong Flooring, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pierce Flooring, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Armstrong Flooring, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Valley Flooring, LCC
Case Number: 9:2020cv00049
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Brown, Bradford)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Brown, Bradford)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Brown, Bradford)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Brown, Bradford)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Pierce Flooring, Inc.. (Varnes, Kelly)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of receipt of state court file via file sharing program. (Attachments: #1 Doc 3, #2 Doc 4, #3 Doc 5, #4 Doc 6, #5 Doc 6.1) (ASG)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT filed by Pierce Flooring, Inc. in state court on 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (ASG)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Valley Flooring, LCC. Original sent via email to Counsel Fain. (ASG)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Valley Flooring, LCC, re #4 Third Party Complaint (Fain, Bruce)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (Fain, Bruce)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/18/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/18/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/18/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 02:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/24/2020. (TXB)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Page 2 of Notice of Removal) (Fain, Bruce)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Armstrong Flooring, Inc. from Montana Fourth Judicial District, Missoula County, case number DV-20-351. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
April 23, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2472887 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce Flooring, Inc. v. Armstrong Flooring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Armstrong Flooring, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Bradford James Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierce Flooring, Inc.
Represented By: Cody O. Atkins
Represented By: Daniel O.C. Ball
Represented By: Kelly J. Varnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Valley Flooring, LCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?