West American Insurance Company et al v. MVP Holding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: West American Insurance Company and The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Bjorn Johnson Construction, LLC, Linda Miller and MVP Holding, LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv00059
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet served on MVP Holdings, LLC on 6/15/2020, filed by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company. (Kiess, Jared)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate Ohio Casualty Corporation, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Peerless Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. for The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company.. (Kiess, Jared)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by West American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate Ohio Casualty Corporation, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Peerless Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. for West American Insurance Company.. (Kiess, Jared)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MVP Holding, LLC. Emailed to Plaintiffs' counsel. (NOS)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, West American Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Complaint Summons in a Civil Action. (Kiess, Jared)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Originals mailed to counsel for Plaintiffs (TAG)
May 5, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2476801 (TAG)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by West American Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West American Insurance Company et al v. MVP Holding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jared F. Kiess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jared F. Kiess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bjorn Johnson Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVP Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?