Schulz v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Schulz
Defendant: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company, John Does 1-5, Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company, Western Farm Bureau Service Company, Inc., ABC Corporations 1-5 and Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2020cv00088
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Dana L. Christensen: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 7/30/2020. (Law Clerk: K. Luther), (Hearing held in Missoula, MT) (ASG)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 02:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2020. Discovery due by 6/4/2021. Motions due by 6/2/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/12/2021. Additional deadlines in Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/30/2020. (TAG) Modified on 7/30/2020 to correct pretrial order date (TAG).
July 23, 2020 Filing 24 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Danielle Schulz. (Williams, Jason)
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Griffin, Robert)
July 23, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Danielle Schulz. (Williams, Jason)
July 23, 2020 Filing 21 Statement of Stipulated Facts Pursuant to L.R. 16.2(b)(3) by Danielle Schulz. (Williams, Jason) (NOS)
July 23, 2020 Filing 20 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Western Farm Bureau Service Company, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Counts III, VI, and VII are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/20/2020. (NOS)
July 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John Mark Semmens on behalf of Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company (Semmens, John)
July 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company re #16 Reply to Response to Motion, #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM - CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE (Griffin, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Griffin, Robert)
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Western Farm Bureau Service Company, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent FBL Financial Group, Inc. for Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company.. (Griffin, Robert)
July 3, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Danielle Schulz. (Williams, Jason)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 Answer, Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand by Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Griffin, Robert)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 Joinder in MOTION re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company's Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Griffin, Robert)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/23/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/23/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/23/2020. Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 1:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/26/2020. (dle)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Western Farm Bureau Service Company, Inc. re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Cave, Bradley)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley T. Cave for Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Bradley T. Cave for Western Farm Bureau Service Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/22/2020. (ASG)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company, Western Farm Bureau Service Company, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION Bradley T. Cave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2498315.) Brianne C. McClafferty appearing for Defendants Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company, Western Farm Bureau Service Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration) of Brad Cave, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (McClafferty, Brianne)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed by Danielle Schulz in state court on 04/24/2020. (ASG)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company, Western Farm Bureau Service Company, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of state court documents (via file sharing program). (Attachments: #1 doc 2, #2 doc 3, #3 doc 4) (ASG)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Brianne C. McClafferty appearing for Defendants Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company, Western Farm Bureau Service Company, Inc. (McClafferty, Brianne)
June 18, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2497872 (TAG)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company, Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schulz v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Schulz
Represented By: Jason A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance Company
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Represented By: Robert C. Griffin
Represented By: John Mark Semmens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Farm Bureau Service Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Represented By: Bradley T. Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brianne C. McClafferty
Represented By: Bradley T. Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?