Rattler Holdings, LLC v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rattler Holdings, LLC d/b/a/ Planetary designs
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc. and UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv00117
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens or Alternatively Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Rattler Holdings, LLC. (Rogers, Martin)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Rogers on behalf of Rattler Holdings, LLC (Rogers, Martin)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens or Alternatively Rule 12(b)(6). Response due 9/22/2020. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/1/2020. (ASG)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens or Alternatively Rule 12(b)(6) Dana L. Hupp appearing for Plaintiff Rattler Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hupp, Dana)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens or Alternatively Rule 12(b)(6) (Wanda Pacheco) filed by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Logistics Services Agreement) (Condra, Philip)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens or Alternatively Rule 12(b)(6) filed by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Condra, Philip)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Under the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens or Alternatively Rule 12(b)(6) Philip B. Condra appearing for Defendants UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc. (Condra, Philip)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rattler Holdings, LLC. (Hupp, Dana)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Rattler Holdings, LLC NOTICE OF FILING ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR UPS SUPPLY CHAIN SOLUTIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgment and Waiver of Service of Summons for UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc) (Hupp, Dana)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Rattler Holdings, LLC NOTICE OF FILING ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknoweldgment and Waiver of Service of Summons for United Parcel Service, Inc.) (Hupp, Dana)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Rattler Holdings, LLC in state court on 2/26/2020. (ASG)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of state court documents (via file share program). (Attachments: #1 Doc 2, #2 Doc 3, #3 Doc 4) (ASG)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc., Other Affiliate UPS SCS (China) Limited for UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc... (Condra, Philip)
August 4, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2521499 (TAG)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc. from Montana Fourth Judicial District, Missoula County, case number DV-20-259. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rattler Holdings, LLC v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Philip B. Condra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Philip B. Condra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rattler Holdings, LLC d/b/a/ Planetary designs
Represented By: Dana L. Hupp
Represented By: Jori Lydia Quinlan
Represented By: Martin Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?