Sturdevant et al v. National Western Life Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Rowena Sturdevant and James Dean Sturdevant
Defendant: National Western Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 9:2020cv00118
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by National Western Life Insurance Co.. (Auerbach, Daniel)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by James Dean Sturdevant, Rowena Sturdevant. (Adolphson, Todd)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by James Dean Sturdevant, Rowena Sturdevant. (Adolphson, Todd)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by James Dean Sturdevant, Rowena Sturdevant. (Adolphson, Todd)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against National Western Life Insurance Co., filed by Rowena Sturdevant, James Dean Sturdevant. (APP)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT DOCUMENTS (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Service, #3 Notice of Removal) (APP)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Western Life Insurance Co.. (Auerbach, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by National Western Life Insurance Co.. (Auerbach, Daniel)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Daniel J. Auerbach, Kasey R. Kimball, Nicholas D. Kovarik. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/24/2020. (APP)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/29/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/29/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/4/2020. (TXB)
August 4, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2521561 (TAG)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Western Life Insurance Co. from Montana Fourth Judicial District, Missoula County, case number DV-20-645. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturdevant et al v. National Western Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Western Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Kasey R. Kimball
Represented By: Daniel J. Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowena Sturdevant
Represented By: Nicholas D. Kovarik
Represented By: Todd J. Adolphson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dean Sturdevant
Represented By: Nicholas D. Kovarik
Represented By: Todd J. Adolphson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?