Porter et al v. Ringer
Plaintiff: KRP and Jeffrey Craig Porter, Jr.
Defendant: Darby Deputy Marshal John Ringer, Town of Darby, Montana, Darby Marshal Larry Rose, Ravalli County Sheriff's Deputy Daniel Mendonca and Ravalli County Sheriff's Lieutenant Jonathan Moles
Case Number: 9:2020cv00125
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 Mailing of Consent Kathleen L. DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Kris McLean, Maureen H. Lennon, Todd A. Hammer, Tracey Neighbor JohnsonConsent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 10/16/2020. (CDH)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Town of Darby, Montana. (Johnson, Tracey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 Defendants Rose and Ringer's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by John Ringer, Larry Rose. (Hammer, Todd)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 Defendants Deputy Daniel Mendonca and Lieutenant Jonathan Moles' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ravalli County Sheriff's Deputy Daniel Mendonca, Ravalli County Sheriff's Lieutenant Jonathan Moles. (Lennon, Maureen)
September 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines (as to Docs. 5-8): Ravalli County Sheriff's Deputy Daniel Mendonca answer due 9/14/2020; Ravalli County Sheriff's Lieutenant Jonathan Moles answer due 9/14/2020; John Ringer answer due 9/14/2020; Larry Rose answer due 9/23/2020. (NOS)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Town of Darby, Montana answer due 9/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 9/4/2020. (SMD)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer William L. Crowley appearing for Defendant Town of Darby, Montana Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Crowley, William)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, and Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order served on Larry Rose on September 2, 2020, filed by KRP, Jeffrey Craig Porter, Jr. (McLean, Tyson)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, and Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order served on Jonathan Moles on August 24, 2020, filed by KRP, Jeffrey Craig Porter, Jr. (McLean, Tyson)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, and Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order served on Daniel Mendonca on August 24, 2020, filed by KRP, Jeffrey Craig Porter, Jr. (McLean, Tyson)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, and Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order served on John Ringer on August 24, 2020, filed by KRP, Jeffrey Craig Porter, Jr. (McLean, Tyson)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, and Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order served on Town of Darby - Mayor Buck Titus on August 24, 2020, filed by KRP, Jeffrey Craig Porter, Jr. (McLean, Tyson)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ravalli County Sheriff's Deputy Daniel Mendonca, Ravalli County Sheriff's Lieutenant Jonathan Moles, John Ringer, Larry Rose, Town of Darby, Montana. (Attachments: #1 Rose, #2 Moles, #3 Ringer, #4 Mendonca) (APP) Emailed to counsel
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/11/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/11/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/11/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 02:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/19/2020. (SMD)
August 18, 2020 Filing fee received: $400; receipt number 0977-2529107. (NOS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Darby Deputy John Ringer, Darby Marshal Larry Rose, Ravalli County Sheriff's Deputy Daniel Mendonca, Ravalli County Sheriff's Lieutenant Jonathan Moles, Town of Darby, Montana, filed by Jeffrey Craig Porter, Jr, KRP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter et al v. Ringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRP
Represented By: Kris McLean
Represented By: Tyson A. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Craig Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Kris McLean
Represented By: Tyson A. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darby Deputy Marshal John Ringer
Represented By: Todd A. Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Darby, Montana
Represented By: Tracey Neighbor Johnson
Represented By: William L. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darby Marshal Larry Rose
Represented By: Todd A. Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravalli County Sheriff's Deputy Daniel Mendonca
Represented By: Maureen H. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravalli County Sheriff's Lieutenant Jonathan Moles
Represented By: Maureen H. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?