Talbot et al v. United States Department of Agriculture, Forest Service
Plaintiff: Nancy Talbot and Harry Richards
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Forest Service
Case Number: 9:2020cv00129
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Agriculture, Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (TAG)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for the Clerk to issue summons. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/16/2020. (APP) Copy mailed to Talbot/Richards
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 , #4 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/14/2020. Mailed to Plaintiffs (TAG)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Nancy Talbot (TAG)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Harry Richards (TAG)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Plaintiffs with docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE, #2 PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL) (TAG)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER against United States Department of Agriculture, Forest Service (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Nancy Talbot, Harry Richards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG) Modified on 9/14/2020: complaint deemed filed (TAG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talbot et al v. United States Department of Agriculture, Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?