Kayser v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Sheelah Kayser
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Company, Allstate Property & Vehicle Insurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Northbrook Indemnity Company and Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2021cv00086
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate as Presiding Judge. Mailed via NEF to Counsel Stephanie A. Oblander, Kaitlyn J. Mitcham, Kai Puhrmann, and Matthew B. Lowy. (NOS)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES re: Stipulation of Dismissal #5 filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Company. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/31/2021. (ASG)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Allstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Stipulation) (Oblander, Stephanie)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 STATE COURT DOCUMENTS (APP)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sheelah Kayser. (APP)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/12/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/12/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/12/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2021 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 7/30/2021. (TXB)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-32-2021-0000548. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
July 29, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2704461 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kayser v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheelah Kayser
Represented By: Kai Puhrmann
Represented By: Matthew B. Lowy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaitlyn J. Mitcham
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kaitlyn J. Mitcham
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaitlyn J. Mitcham
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Kaitlyn J. Mitcham
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Vehicle Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaitlyn J. Mitcham
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaitlyn J. Mitcham
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northbrook Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kaitlyn J. Mitcham
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaitlyn J. Mitcham
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?