Bartell v. State of Montana
Petitioner: Wesley Joseph Bartell
Respondent: State of Montana
Case Number: 9:2021cv00116
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number MTX9-16650 (TAG)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 Brief/Response (3 pgs.) to #4 Order filed by Wesley Joseph Bartell. (TAG)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION (5 pgs.)to Compel by Petitioner Wesley Joseph Bartell. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits (6 pgs.)) (TAG)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Fee/IFP due by 11/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 11/2/2021. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT (styled 2255 Motion) re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wesley Joseph Bartell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit) (TAG)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Letter re Fee/IFP, #2 IFP Form)Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 not paid), filed by Wesley Joseph Bartell. (Attachments: #1 State Notice of Appeal) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartell v. State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wesley Joseph Bartell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?