Woods v. Meadowlark Home Care
Plaintiff: Nakeeta Woods
Defendant: Meadowlark Home Care
Case Number: 9:2022cv00028
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Amended complaint due by 3/21/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/7/2022. (APP) Order not mailed due to no mailing address
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 3/21/2022. (APP)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Nakeeta Woods. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (APP)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE) (TAG)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 402 not paid), filed by Natalie Woods. (TAG) Modified on 3/7/2022 to removed "Lodged" from entry (APP).
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Natalie Woods. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Meadowlark Home Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakeeta Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadowlark Home Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?