Center for Biological Diversity et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Yaak Valley Forest Council and Wildearth Guardians
Defendant: United States Forest Service, Keith Lannom and Chad Benson
Case Number: 9:2022cv00114
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint motion to set deadlines, (Doc. #16 ), is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint by September 9, 2022, and Defendants' response to such amended complaint shall be due by October 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/23/2022. (NOS)
August 18, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Furlong on behalf of All Defendants (Furlong, Erika)
August 17, 2022 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Set Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response Hayley A. Carpenter appearing for Defendants Chad Benson, Keith Lannom, United States Forest Service (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Carpenter, Hayley)
August 3, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Wildearth Guardians, Yaak Valley Forest Council. (Flannery, Ronni)
August 3, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Center for Biological Diversity, Wildearth Guardians, Yaak Valley Forest Council (Flannery, Ronni)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The parties shall file a proposed case management plan on or before October 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/25/2022. (NOS)
July 19, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Hayley A. Carpenter on behalf of Chad Benson, Keith Lannom, United States Forest Service (Carpenter, Hayley)
July 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Center for Biological Diversity, Wildearth Guardians, Yaak Valley Forest Council re #7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Zukoski, Edward)
July 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Wildearth Guardians (Fox, Marla)
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Center for Biological Diversity, Wildearth Guardians, Yaak Valley Forest Council (Zaccardi, Andrea)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrea Zaccardi for Plaintiffs. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/6/2022. (NOS)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward B. Zukowski. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/6/2022.NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (NOS)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marla Fox for Plaintiffs. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/6/2022. (NOS)
July 1, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION Andrea Zaccardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-2897616.) Sarah K. McMillan appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Wildearth Guardians, Yaak Valley Forest Council (Attachments: #1 Declaration support PHV) (McMillan, Sarah)
July 1, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION Edward Zukoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-2897485.) Sarah K. McMillan appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Wildearth Guardians, Yaak Valley Forest Council (Attachments: #1 Declaration support PHV) (McMillan, Sarah)
July 1, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION Marla Fox to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-2897483.) Sarah K. McMillan appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Wildearth Guardians, Yaak Valley Forest Council (Attachments: #1 Declaration support PHV) (McMillan, Sarah)
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chad Benson, Keith Lannom, United States Forest Service. (Summons may be downloaded and printed by Plaintiffs' Counsel for service.) (APP)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Yaak Valley Forest Council, Wildearth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (APP)
June 30, 2022 Filing fee paid: $ 402.00, receipt number AMTDC-2896692 (APP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Sarah K. McMillan
Represented By: Ronni M. Flannery
Represented By: Andrea Zaccardi
Represented By: Edward B. Zukoski
Represented By: Marla Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaak Valley Forest Council
Represented By: Sarah K. McMillan
Represented By: Ronni M. Flannery
Represented By: Andrea Zaccardi
Represented By: Edward B. Zukoski
Represented By: Marla Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildearth Guardians
Represented By: Sarah K. McMillan
Represented By: Ronni M. Flannery
Represented By: Andrea Zaccardi
Represented By: Edward B. Zukoski
Represented By: Marla Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Erika Furlong
Represented By: Hayley A. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Lannom
Represented By: Erika Furlong
Represented By: Hayley A. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Benson
Represented By: Erika Furlong
Represented By: Hayley A. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?