Sararo et al v. Paws Up Ranch, LLC
Plaintiff: Alfredo Sararo and Meghan Kellam
Defendant: Paws Up Ranch, LLC d/b/a Resort at Paws Up
Case Number: 9:2024cv00072
Filed: May 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2024 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Meghan Kellam. Paws Up Ranch, LLC waiver sent on 6/6/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (Koester, Edmond)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/20/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/20/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/20/2024. Zoom Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2024 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/24/2024. (APP) NEED to send out Zoom info
May 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paws Up Ranch, LLC, filed by Alfredo Sararo, Meghan Kellam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)
May 23, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3267203 (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sararo et al v. Paws Up Ranch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paws Up Ranch, LLC d/b/a Resort at Paws Up
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Sararo
Represented By: Edmond E Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Kellam
Represented By: Edmond E Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?