Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association and The
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Lupin Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Lupin Ltd., Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC and Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Case Number: CAN/3:20-CV-04667
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. ( #37 in MDL No. 2966) Filed by Plaintiffs UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, #et al.New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund, Government Employees Health Association, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association #[Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725 (Sobol, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 24 ERRATA - to (21 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 21 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 21 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, 14 in CAN/3:20-cv-04725, #33 in MDL No. 2966) - Filed by Plaintiffs UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, #et al.New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund, Government Employees Health Association, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Corrected Signature of Counsel, #2 Corrected Schedule of Actions) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725 (Sobol, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 23 ERRATA - to (22 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 15 in CAN/3:20-cv-04064, 22 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 22 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, 15 in CAN/3:20-cv-04725, 34 in MDL No. 2966, 22 in NYS/7:20-cv-06003) - Filed by Defendants Hikma Labs Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Hubbard, Heidi) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 9/9/2020 (CMD).
September 8, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2966) ) Filed by Defendants Hikma Labs Inc., #et al. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Hikma Labs Inc., Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Hubbard, Heidi) EDITED EVENT & DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 9/9/2020 (CMD).
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2966) ) Filed by Plaintiffs UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, #et al.New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund, Government Employees Health Association, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725 (Sobol, Thomas) EDITED EVENT TYPE Modified on 9/10/2020 (CMD).
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (5 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 5 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 5 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, #7 in MDL No. 2966, 5 in NYS/7:20-cv-06003), (6 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 6 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 6 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, #8 in MDL No. 2966, 6 in NYS/7:20-cv-06003), (13 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 13 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 13 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, #21 in MDL No. 2966, 15 in NYS/7:20-cv-06003), (14 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 14 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 14 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, #22 in MDL No. 2966, 16 in NYS/7:20-cv-06003) Filed by Defendants Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, #et al.Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. #[Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Allon, Devora)
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (CORRECTED) re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2966, #10 in MDL No. 2961) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Labs Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Roxane Laboratories Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.; Subsidiary Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Subsidary Hikma Labs Inc., f/k/a Roxane Laboratories, Inc, Subsidiary Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. for Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Schedule of Actions, #2 Corrected Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Pace, Jack) EDITED EVENT TYPE, DELETED MDL LINK 2 & DUPLICATE PARTIES AND ADDED SUBSIDIARY Modified on 9/3/2020 (CMD).
September 1, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2966) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc. for Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (MCINTYRE, STEPHEN) DELETED MDL LINK 2 Modified on 9/2/2020 (CMD).
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 2966) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04667 (Sobol, Thomas)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2966) Filed by STEPHEN MCINTYRE on behalf of Defendant Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (MCINTYRE, STEPHEN) DELETED MDL LINK 2 Modified on 9/2/2020 (CMD).
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 2966) Filed by Thomas M. Sobol on behalf of Plaintiffs New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund, #et al.Government Employees Health Association, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Parties Represented & Case Captions, #2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671 (Sobol, Thomas)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 ERRATA - to (6 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 6 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 6 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, #8 in MDL No. 2966, 6 in NYS/7:20-cv-06003) - Filed by Defendants Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, #et al.Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Corrected Corporate Disclosures, #2 Corrected Schedule of Actions, #3 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Allon, Devora)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 ERRATA - to (5 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 5 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 5 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, #7 in MDL No. 2966, 5 in NYS/7:20-cv-06003) - Filed by Defendants Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, #et al.Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Corrected Parties Represented, #2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Allon, Devora)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 ERRATA - to (8 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 6 in CAN/3:20-cv-04064, 8 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 8 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, 6 in CAN/3:20-cv-04725, #10 in MDL No. 2966, 8 in NYS/7:20-cv-06003) - Filed by Defendants Hikma Labs Inc., #et al.Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Eurohealth (USA), Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Corrected Corporate Disclosure Statement Schedule of Actions, #2 Corrected Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Pace, Jack) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 9/3/2020 (CMD).
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 ERRATA - to (7 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 5 in CAN/3:20-cv-04064, 7 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 7 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, 5 in CAN/3:20-cv-04725, #9 in MDL No. 2966, 7 in NYS/7:20-cv-06003) - Filed by Defendants Hikma Labs Inc., #et al.Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Eurohealth (USA), Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Corrected Notice of Appearance Schedule of Actions, #2 Corrected Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Pace, Jack) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 9/2/2020 (CMD).
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 ERRATA - to (4 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 4 in CAN/3:20-cv-04064, 4 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 4 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, 4 in CAN/3:20-cv-04725, #6 in MDL No. 2966, 4 in NYS/7:20-cv-06003) - Filed by Defendants Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, #et al. Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Corrected Schedule of Actions, #2 Corrected Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Hubbard, Heidi) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 9/2/2020 (CMD).
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 ERRATA - to (3 in CAN/3:20-cv-04056, 3 in CAN/3:20-cv-04064, 3 in CAN/3:20-cv-04667, 3 in CAN/3:20-cv-04671, 3 in CAN/3:20-cv-04725, #5 in MDL No. 2966, 3 in NYS/7:20-cv-06003) - Filed by Defendants Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, #et al.Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Corrected Schedule of Actions, #2 Corrected Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Hubbard, Heidi) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 9/2/2020 (CMD).
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 SEE CORRECTED PLDG. 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2966) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Labs Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp..(Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Pace, Jack) DELETED MDL LINK 2 & DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 9/2/2020 (CMD). Modified on 9/3/2020 (CMD).
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2966) Filed by Jack E. Pace, III on behalf of Defendants Hikma Labs Inc., #et al.Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Eurohealth (USA), Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Pace, Jack) DELETED MDL LINK 2 & DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 9/2/2020 (CMD).
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 2966), ( #1 in MDL No. 2966) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd. for Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Other Affiliate Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (DE), Other Affiliate Fosun International Limited, Other Affiliate TPG Global, LLC for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Attachments: #1 MDL 2966 Disclosure, #2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Allon, Devora)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #2 in MDL No. 2966), ( #1 in MDL No. 2966) Filed by Devora Whitman Allon on behalf of Defendants Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, #et al.Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 MDL Parties Represented, #2 MDL 2966 Actions, #3 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Allon, Devora)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2966) -- Identifying Subsidiary Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Subsidiary Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited for Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC; Corporate Parent Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC for Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Hubbard, Heidi) DELETED MDL LINK 2 & DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES Modified on 9/2/2020 (CMD).
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2966) Filed by Heidi Hubbard on behalf of Defendants Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, #et al.Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (Hubbard, Heidi) DELETED MDL LINK 2 & DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 9/2/2020 (CMD).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 2966) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 9/1/2020. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 9/1/2020. Responses due on or before 9/8/2020. Reply, if any, due on or before 9/15/2020. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/18/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2966, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (CMD)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 MDL Number 2966 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending No. 124) Associated Cases: Pending No. 124, CAN/3:20-cv-04056, CAN/3:20-cv-04064, CAN/3:20-cv-04667, CAN/3:20-cv-04671, CAN/3:20-cv-04725, NYS/7:20-cv-06003 (CMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association
Represented By: MARK DENTON FISCHER
Represented By: Lauren G Barnes
Represented By: Brendan G. Stuhan
Represented By: Robert C. Griffith
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Bradley J. Vettraino
Represented By: Christina H. Sharp
Represented By: Jeffrey Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The
Represented By: MARK DENTON FISCHER
Represented By: Lauren G Barnes
Represented By: Brendan G. Stuhan
Represented By: Robert C. Griffith
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Represented By: Bradley J. Vettraino
Represented By: Christina H. Sharp
Represented By: Jeffrey Swann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Shipley
Represented By: Devora Whitman Allon
Represented By: Jay P Lefkowitz
Represented By: Gilad Bendheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxane Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Represented By: Kathryn Jordan Mims
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Represented By: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen D. Andrews
Represented By: Heidi Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurohealth (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Represented By: Kathryn Jordan Mims
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Shipley
Represented By: Devora Whitman Allon
Represented By: Jay P Lefkowitz
Represented By: Gilad Bendheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Represented By: Kathryn Jordan Mims
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin G Bradshaw
Represented By: Brett Johnston Williamson
Represented By: STEPHEN MCINTYRE
Represented By: Monsura A. Sirajee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Represented By: Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Represented By: Heidi Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Michael John Shipley
Represented By: Devora Whitman Allon
Represented By: Jay P Lefkowitz
Represented By: Gilad Bendheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Represented By: Stephen D. Andrews
Represented By: Heidi Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?