Leonard v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas Leonard
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: CAN/3:24-CV-02156
Filed: April 10, 2024
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.( #6 in MDL No. 3113), ( 108 in MDL No. 3113) Filed by Cynthia Richman on behalf of Defendant Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (Richman, Cynthia) Modified on 6/6/2024 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND ADDED MDL LINK
May 30, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MAJOR DEFICIENCY -- (re: pldg. (11 in CAN/3:24-cv-02699, #112 in MDL No. 3113) ) The referenced pleading has been found DEFICIENT. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 5/30/2024. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-01796, CAN/3:24-cv-01815, CAN/3:24-cv-01895, CAN/3:24-cv-01988, CAN/3:24-cv-02006, CAN/3:24-cv-02156, CAN/3:24-cv-02199, CAN/3:24-cv-02213, CAN/3:24-cv-02699, CAN/3:24-cv-03135, CAN/4:24-cv-02193, CAN/5:24-cv-01844, ILN/1:24-cv-02694, MN/0:24-cv-01107, NJ/2:24-cv-04055, NJ/2:24-cv-04108, NJ/2:24-cv-04223, NJ/2:24-cv-04232, NJ/2:24-cv-04284, NJ/2:24-cv-04355, NJ/2:24-cv-04445, NJ/2:24-cv-04560, NJ/2:24-cv-04568, NJ/2:24-cv-04827, NJ/2:24-cv-05281, NJ/2:24-cv-05359, NJ/2:24-cv-05541, NJ/2:24-cv-05663, NJ/2:24-cv-05722, NJ/2:24-cv-05727, NJ/2:24-cv-05961, NJ/2:24-cv-06049, NJ/2:24-cv-06131, NJ/2:24-cv-06341, NJ/2:24-cv-06342, NJ/2:24-cv-06343, NJ/2:24-cv-06380, NJ/2:24-cv-06381, NJ/2:24-cv-06397, NJ/2:24-cv-06411, NJ/2:24-cv-06427, PAW/2:24-cv-00639 (DLD)
May 28, 2024 Filing 23 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( 114 in MDL No. 3113)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 107 in MDL No. 3113) Filed by Cynthia Richman on behalf of Defendant APPLE, INC (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (Richman, Cynthia) Modified on 6/6/2024 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
May 28, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MAJOR DEFICIENCY -- (re: pldg. ( #105 in MDL No. 3113, 2 in NJ/2:24-cv-06341, 2 in NJ/2:24-cv-06342, 2 in NJ/2:24-cv-06343, 2 in NJ/2:24-cv-06380, 2 in NJ/2:24-cv-06381, 2 in NJ /2:24-cv-06397, 2 in NJ/2:24-cv-06411, 2 in NJ/2:24-cv-06427) ) The referenced pleading has been found DEFICIENT. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 5/28/2024. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-01796, CAN/3:24-cv-01815, CAN/3:24-cv-01895, CAN/3:24-cv-01988, CAN/3:24-cv-02006, CAN/3:24-cv-02156, CAN/3:24-cv-02199, CAN/4:24-cv-02193, CAN/4:24-cv-02213, CAN/4:24-cv-02699, CAN/5:24-cv-01844, ILN/1:24-cv-02694, MN/0:24-cv-01107, NJ/2:24-cv-04055, NJ/2:24-cv-04108, NJ/2:24-cv-04223, NJ/2:24-cv-04232, NJ/2:24-cv-04284, NJ/2:24-cv-04355, NJ/2:24-cv-04445, NJ/2:24-cv-04560, NJ/2:24-cv-04568, NJ/2:24-cv-04827, NJ/2:24-cv-05281, NJ/2:24-cv-05359, NJ/2:24-cv-05541, NJ/2:24-cv-05663, NJ/2:24-cv-05722, NJ/2:24-cv-05727, NJ/2:24-cv-05961, NJ/2:24-cv-06049, NJ/2:24-cv-06131, NJ/2:24-cv-06341, NJ/2:24-cv-06342, NJ/2:24-cv-06343, NJ/2:24-cv-06380, NJ/2:24-cv-06381, NJ/2:24-cv-06397, NJ/2:24-cv-06411, NJ/2:24-cv-06427, NJ/3:23-cv-06341, NJ/3:23-cv-06342, NJ/3:23-cv-06343, PAW/2:24-cv-00639 (DLD)
May 23, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT (AMENDED) re: pldg. (9 in CAN/3:24-cv-01796, 10 in CAN/3:24-cv-01815, 9 in CAN/3:24-cv-01895, 7 in CAN/3:24-cv-01988, 6 in CAN/3:24-cv-02006, 6 in CAN/5:24-cv-01844, 79 in MDL No. 3113, 9 in NJ/2:24-cv-04108, 6 in NJ/2:24-cv-04232, 6 in NJ/2:24-cv-04284, 8 in NJ/2:24-cv-04355) Julian Kleinbrodt replaces Cynthia Richman and is now designated to present oral argument on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Oral Argument, #2 Schedule of Actions for Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (Richman, Cynthia) Modified on 5/24/2024 (RH). ADDED ATTORNEYS NAMES AND EDITED MDL LINK
May 20, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #6 in MDL No. 3113) Filed by Cynthia Richman on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (Richman, Cynthia) Modified on 5/22/2024 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
May 15, 2024 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE -- re: pldg(s). (15 in ILN/1:24-cv-02694, #84 in MDL No. 3113) -- Filed by Defendant Apple Inc. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-01796, CAN/3:24-cv-01895, C AN/3:24-cv-01988, CAN/3:24-cv-02006, CAN/3:24-cv-02156, CAN/3:24-cv-02199, CAN/4:24-cv-01815, CAN/4:24-cv-02193, CAN/4:24-cv-02213, CAN/4:24-cv-02699, CAN/5:24-cv-01844, ILN/1:24-cv-02694, MN/0:24-cv-01107, NJ/2:24-cv-04055, NJ/2:24-cv-04108, NJ/2:24-cv-04223, NJ/2:24-cv-04232, NJ/2:24-cv-04284, NJ/2:24-cv-04355, NJ/2:24-cv-04445, NJ/2:24-cv-04560, NJ/2:24-cv-04568, NJ/2:24-cv-04827, NJ/2:24-cv-05281, NJ/2:24-cv-05359, NJ/2:24-cv-05541, NJ/2:24-cv-05663, NJ/2:24-cv-05722, NJ/2:24-cv-05727, NJ/2:24-cv-05961, PAW/2:24-cv-00639 (DLD)
May 15, 2024 Filing 18 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY***MINUTE ORDER (re: pldg. ( #94 in MDL No. 3113) ) -- Motion of: Defendant Apple, Inc. for Leave to file Supplemental Response -- GRA NTED Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 5/15/2024. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-01796, CAN/3:24-cv-01895, CAN/3:24-cv-01988, CAN/3:24-cv-02006, CAN/3:24-cv-02156, CAN/3:24-cv-02199, CAN/4:24-cv-01815, CAN/4:24-cv-02193, CAN/4:24-cv-02213, CAN/4:24-cv-02699, CAN/5:24-cv-01844, ILN/1:24-cv-02694, MN/0:24-cv-01107, NJ/2:24-cv-04108, NJ/2:24-cv-04223, NJ/2:24-cv-04232, NJ/2:24-cv-04284, NJ/2:24-cv-04355, NJ/2:24-cv-04445, NJ/2:24-cv-04560, NJ/2:24-cv-04568, NJ/2:24-cv-04827, NJ/2:24-cv-05281, NJ/2:24-cv-05359, NJ/2:24-cv-05541, NJ/2:24-cv-05663, NJ/2:24-cv-05722, NJ/2:24-cv-05727, NJ/2:24-cv-05961, NJ/2:24-cv-06049, NJ/2:24-cv-06131, PAW/2:24-cv-00639 (DLD)
May 14, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE Filed by Cynthia Richman on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (Richman, Cynthia) Modified on 5/15/2024 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
May 8, 2024 Filing 16 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( 98 in MDL No. 3113)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 38 in MDL No. 3113), ( 77 in MDL No. 3113), ( 35 in MDL No. 3113), ( 55 in MDL No. 3113) Filed by Cynthia Richman on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-02156, CAN/3:24-cv-02199, CAN/4:24-cv-02193, CAN/4:24-cv-02213, NJ/2:24-cv-04827, NJ/2:24-cv-05281, NJ/2:24-cv-05359, NJ/2:24-cv-05541, NJ/2:24-cv-05663, NJ/2:24-cv-05722, NJ/2:24-cv-05727, PAW/2:24-cv-00639 (Richman, Cynthia) Modified on 5/22/2024 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
May 8, 2024 Filing 15 ERRATA - to ( #77 in MDL No. 3113) - Filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Schedule of Acti ons, #2 Exhibit B - Corrected Exhibit 1, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (Richman, Cynthia)
May 8, 2024 Filing 14 WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (8 in CAN/3:24-cv-02156, #58 in MDL No. 3113) Filed by Plaintiff Lisa Johnston Kane FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Incorrect case number (s) selected. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-02156 (Bottini, Francis)
May 6, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (9 in CAN/3:24-cv-01796, 9 in CAN/3:24-cv-01895, 7 in CAN/3:24-cv-01988, 6 in CAN/3:24-cv-02006, 10 in CAN/4:24-cv-01815, 6 in CAN/5:24-cv-01844, #17 in MDL No. 3113, 9 in NJ/2:24-cv-04108, 6 in NJ/2:24-cv-04232, 6 in NJ/2:24-cv-04284, 8 in NJ/2:24-cv-04355) Filed by Cynthia Richman on behalf of Defendant Apple, Inc. Parties will WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT IF ALL OTHER PARTIES IN THIS MATTER WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT; otherwise the designated attorney shall present oral argument at the Panel hearing session. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (Richman, Cynthia) Modified on 5/7/2024 (RH). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
May 6, 2024 Filing 12 ERRATA - to (16 in CAN/3:24-cv-01796, 16 in CAN/3:24-cv-01895, 15 in CAN/3:24-cv-01988, 13 in CAN/3:24-cv-02006, 9 in CAN/3:24-cv-02156, 9 in CAN/3:24-cv-02199, 18 in CAN/4:24-cv-01815, 6 in CAN/4:24-cv-02193, 7 in CAN/4:24-cv-02213, 15 in CAN/5:24-cv-01844, 9 in ILN/1:24-cv-02694, #61 in MDL No. 3113, 10 in MN/0:24-cv-01107, 17 in NJ/2:24-cv-04108, 9 in NJ/2:24-cv-04223, 15 in NJ/2:24-cv-04232, 13 in NJ/2:24-cv-04284, 19 in NJ/2:24-c v-04355, 9 in NJ/2:24-cv-04445, 9 in NJ/2:24-cv-04560, 12 in NJ/2:24-cv-04568, 6 in NJ/2:24-cv-04827, 6 in NJ/2:24-cv-05281, 8 in NJ/2:24-cv-05359, 5 in NJ/2:24-cv-05541, 6 in NJ/2:24-cv-05663) - Filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer B. Chiuchiarelli, #et al.Richard K. Hopper, Kiyomi Ishii, April H. Yamaichi #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Corrected Signature Block) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (Swope, Karin)
May 6, 2024 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING BRIEFING re: pldg. (3 in CAN/3:24-cv-01796, 3 in CAN/3:24-cv-01895, 3 in CAN/4:24-cv-01815, #6 in MDL No. 3113, 3 in NJ/2:24-cv-04108), ( #1 in MDL No. 3113), ( #2 in MDL No. 3113), ( #3 in MDL No. 3113) Briefing in this mat ter is now closed. The parties to actions on the motion(s) remain under a duty, pursuant to Panel Rules 6.1(f) and 6.2(d), to notify the Clerk of the Panel promptly of potential tag-along actions, as well as any development that moots the motion or fully disposes of any action on the motion. Parties in any potential tag-along action may file an Interested Party response, but must do so promptly, and in any event, no later than the Thursday prior to the hearing session at which the motion for transfer is to be heard by the Panel.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 5/6/2024. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (LH)
May 3, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (3 in CAN/3:24-cv-01796, 3 in CAN/3:24-cv-01895, 3 in CAN/4:24-cv-01815, #6 in MDL No. 3113, 3 in NJ/2:24-cv-04108), ( #1 in MDL No. 3113), ( #17 in MDL No. 313) Filed by Karin Swope on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer B. Chiuchiarelli, #et al.Richard K. Hopper, Kiyomi Ishii, April H. Yamaichi #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (Swope, Karin) Modified on 5/6/2024 (RH). ADDED MDL LINK
May 3, 2024 Filing 9 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. (3 in CAN/3:24-cv-01796, 3 in CAN/3:24-cv-01895, 3 in CAN/4:24-cv-01815, #6 in MDL No. 3113, 3 in NJ/2:24-cv-04108), ( #1 in MDL No. 3113) Filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer B. Chiuchiarelli, #et al.Richard K. Hopper, Kiyomi Ishii, April H. Yamaichi #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (Swope, Karin)
May 3, 2024 Filing 8 PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 86 in MDL No. 3113)) INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3113), ( #2 in MDL No. 3113), ( #3 in MDL No. 3113), ( #6 in MDL No. 3113) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Lisa Johnston Kane, Lisa Johnston Kane Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-02156 (Bottini, Francis) Modified on 5/9/2024 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (9 in CAN/3:24-cv-01796, 9 in CAN/3:24-cv-01895, 7 in CAN/3:24-cv-01988, 6 in CAN/3:24-cv-02006, 10 in CAN/4:24-cv-01815, 6 in CAN/5:24-cv-01844, #17 in MDL No. 3113, 9 in NJ/2:24-cv-04108, 6 in NJ/2:24-cv-04232, 6 in NJ/2:24-cv-04284, 8 in NJ/2:24-cv-04355) Filed by William J. Ban on behalf of Plaintiff LOUIS LEVINE (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113 et al. (Ban, William)
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #29 in MDL No. 3113) Filed by Michael Rubin on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas Leonard (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-02156 (Rubin, Michael)
April 26, 2024 Filing 5 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( #6 in MDL No. 3113), ( 29 in MDL No. 3113) ) Filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-01796, CAN/3:24-cv-01895, CAN/3:24-cv-01988, CAN/3:24-cv-02006, CAN/3:24-cv-02156, CAN/3:24-cv-02199, CAN/4:24-cv-01815, CAN/4:24-cv-02193, CAN/4:24-cv-02213, CAN/5:24-cv-01844, ILN/1:24-cv-02694, MN/0:24-cv-01107, NJ/2:24-cv-04108, NJ/2:24-cv-04223, NJ/2:24-cv-04232, NJ/2:24-cv-04284, NJ/2:24-cv-04355, NJ/2:24-cv-04445, NJ/2:24-cv-04560, NJ/2:24-cv-04568, NJ/2:24-cv-04827, NJ/2:24-cv-05281, NJ/2:24-cv-05359, NJ/2:24-cv-05541 (Richman, Cynthia) Modified on 4/30/2024 (LH). ADDED MDL LINK
April 26, 2024 Filing 4 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION WITH INTERESTED PARTIES -- (re: pldg. ( #6 in MDL No. 3113), ( #1 in MDL No. 3113), ( #12 in MDL No. 3113) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Deborah Collins, #et al.Hunter Collins, Henry Morales, SHOSHI GOLDFUS, ULTRA HOME SET, LLC, Richard Dwyer, Aimen Halim #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-01796, CAN/3:24-cv-01895, CAN/3:24-cv-01988, CAN/3:24-cv-02006, CAN/3:24-cv-02156, CAN/3:24-cv-02199, CAN/4:24-cv-01815, CAN/4:24-cv-02193, CAN/4:24-cv-02213, CAN/5:24-cv-01844, ILN/1:24-cv-02694, MN/0:24-cv-01107, NJ/2:24-cv-04108, NJ/2:24-cv-04223, NJ/2:24-cv-04232, NJ/2:24-cv-04284, NJ/2:24-cv-04355, NJ/2:24-cv-04445, NJ/2:24-cv-04560, NJ/2:24-cv-04568, NJ/2:24-cv-04827, NJ/2:24-cv-05281, NJ/2:24-cv-05359, NJ/2:24-cv-05541 (Coolidge, Melinda) Modified on 4/30/2024 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND ADDED MDL LINKS
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3113), ( #6 in MDL No. 3113) ) Filed by Plaintiff LOUIS LEVINE (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-01796, CAN/3:24-cv-01895, CAN/3:24-cv-01988, CAN/3:24-cv-02006, CAN/3:24-cv-02156, CAN/3:24-cv-02199, CAN/4:24-cv-01815, CAN/4:24-cv-02193, CAN/4:24-cv-02213, CAN/5:24-cv-01844, ILN/1:24-cv-02694, MN/0:24-cv-01107, NJ/2:24-cv-04108, NJ/2:24-cv-04223, NJ/2:24-cv-04232, NJ/2:24-cv-04284, NJ/2:24-cv-04355, NJ/2:24-cv-04445, NJ/2:24-cv-04560, NJ/2:24-cv-04568, NJ/2:24-cv-04827, NJ/2:24-cv-05281, NJ/2:24-cv-05359 (Ban, William) Modified on 4/29/2024 (LH). ADDED MDL LINK
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 29 in MDL No. 3113) ) Filed by Plaintiff Thomas Leonard Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-02156 (Rubin, Michael) Modified on 4/25/2024 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND MDL LINK
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #6 in MDL No. 3113) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3113, CAN/3:24-cv-01796, CAN/3:24-cv-01895, CAN/3:24-cv-01988, CAN/3:24-cv-02006, CAN/3:24-cv-02156, CAN/3:24-cv-02199, CAN/4:24-cv-01815, CAN/4:24-cv-02193, CAN/4:24-cv-02213, CAN/5:24-cv-01844, ILN/1:24-cv-02694, MN/0:24-cv-01107, NJ/2:24-cv-04108, NJ/2:24-cv-04223, NJ/2:24-cv-04232, NJ/2:24-cv-04284, NJ/2:24-cv-04355, NJ/2:24-cv-04445, NJ/2:24-cv-04560, NJ/2:24-cv-04568, NJ/2:24-cv-04827, NJ/2:24-cv-05281, NJ/2:24-cv-05359 (Richman, Cynthia) Modified on 4/24/2024 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Leonard
Represented By: Corinne F Johnson
Represented By: James M. Finberg
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Richman
Represented By: Daniel Glen Swanson
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?