Marion Hospital Corporation et al v. Abbott Laboratories (IL) et al
Plaintiff: Marion Hospital Corporation, Marion Hospital Corporation doing business as Heartland Regional Medical Center, Granite City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Gateway Regional Medical Center, Massac Memorial, LLC doing business as Massac Memorial Hospital, Galesburg Hospital Corporation doing business as Galesburg Cottage Hospital, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc. d/b/a Crossroads Community Hospital, Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Red Bud Regional Hospital, Galesburg Hospital Corporation d/b/a Galesburg Cottage Hospital, Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Metrosouth Medical Center, Massac Memorial, LLC d/b/a Massac Memorial Hospital, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc. doing business as Crossroads Community Hospital, Anna Hospital Corporation doing business as Union County Hospital, Marion Hospital Corporation d/b/a Heartland Regional Medical Center, Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Red Bud Regional Hospital, Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Vista Medical Center East, Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Vista Medical Center East, City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Gateway Regional Medical Center, Anna Hospital Corporation d/b/a Union County Hospital and Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Metrosouth Medical Center
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories (IL), Actavis Pharma, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Actavis LLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DE), CVS Health Corporation (DE), Allergan Sales, LLC (DE), Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (DE), Actavis South Atlantic LLC (DE), Cardinal Health, Inc. (OH), Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (DE), Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (DE), Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (DE), Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. (NY), Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC (DE), AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (DE), Actavis Elizabeth LLC (DE), Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (DE), Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC (DE), Depomed, Inc. (DE), Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. (DE), KVK-Tech, Inc. (PA), H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (DE), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV), Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (DE), Actavis Inc. (DE), SpecGx, LLC (DE), Henry Schein, Inc. (DE), Actavis Totowa LLC (DE), Kroger Limited Partnership I (OH), Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. (PA), Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. f/k/a Depomed, Inc. (DE), H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (DE), Allergan USA, Inc. (DE), Johnson & Johnson (NJ), Allergan Finance, LLC (NV), Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a/ Watson Pharma Inc. (DE), Cephalon, Inc. (DE), Impax Laboratories, LLC f/k/a Impax Laboratories, Inc. (DE), Walgreen Co. (IL), Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. (PA), Watson Pharma Inc. (DE), Walmart, Inc. (DE), Actavis Kadian LLC (DE), Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. (FL), Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., (DE), Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (DE), Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc. (DE), Mallinckrodt, LLC (DE), Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (DE), Impax Laboratories, Inc. (DE), Smith Drug Company (SC), Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AbbVie, Inc. (DE), Kroger Limited Partnership II (OH), Anda, Inc. (FL), The Kroger Co. (OH), Noramco, Inc. (DE) and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI)
Case Number: ILN/1:20-CV-04111
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 52 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION re: pldg. (51 in ALN/2:20-cv-00848, 41 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 47 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8307 in MDL No. 2804, 50 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433, 39 in NYE/2:20-cv-02431, 40 in OKE/6:20-cv-00156, 45 in OKE/6:20-cv-00160, 12 in OKE/6:20-cv-00172, 35 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200, 44 in OKW/5:20-cv-00456), ( #8308 in MDL No. 2804, 104 in TXS/4:18-cv-00490, 83 in TXS/4:19-cv-02181, 84 in TXS/4:19-cv-02256) Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/8/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ALN/2:20-cv-00848, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, NYE/2:20-cv-02431, OKE/6:20-cv-00156, OKE/6:20-cv-00160, OKE/6:20-cv-00172, OKE/6:20-cv-00200, OKW/5:20-cv-00456, TXS/4:18-cv-00490, TXS/4:19-cv-02181, TXS/4:19-cv-02256 (SM)
September 4, 2020 Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING BRIEFING re: pldg. (38 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, #8286 in MDL No. 2804), (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8236 in MDL No. 2804) Briefing in this matter is now closed. The parties to action(s) on the motion(s) remain under a duty, pursuant to Panel Rule 6.1(f), to notify the Clerk of the Panel promptly of any development that would partially or completely moot this matter. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/4/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (SM)
September 2, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE CTO (re: pldg. (3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, #8098 in MDL No. 2804), (38 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, #8286 in MDL No. 2804), (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8236 in MDL No. 2804), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8094 in MDL No. 2804) ) (CTO-165) Filed by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (DE), #et al.Cardinal Health, Inc. (OH), AmerisourceBergen Corporation, McKesson Corporation #[Suppress List] Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (SM)
September 2, 2020 Filing 49 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY***MINUTE ORDER (re: pldg. ( #8416 in MDL No. 2804) ) -- Motion of: Defendants Cardinal Health, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp., AmerisourceBergen Corp., and McKesson Corp. for Leave to File Response -- GRANTED. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/2/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (JN)
September 1, 2020 Filing 48 Joint MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE Brief in Opposition by Cardinal Health, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp., AmerisourceBergen Corp., and McKesson Corp. to Motions to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order 165 (CTO-165) re: pldg. ( 8098 in MDL No. 2804) ( 8094 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Enu Mainigi on behalf of Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (DE), #et al.Cardinal Health, Inc. (OH), AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Mainigi, Enu) Modified on 9/2/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINKS
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 HEARING ORDER re: pldg. (40 in ALN/2:20-cv-00848, #8025 in MDL No. 2804), (38 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, #8286 in MDL No. 2804), (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8236 in MDL No. 2804), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8236 in MDL No. 2804), ( #7833 in MDL No. 2804, 11 in OKW/5:20-cv-00456), ( #8167 in MDL No. 2804, 15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( #7956 in MDL No. 2804, 30 in NYE/2:20-cv-02431), ( #8176 in MDL No. 2804, 13 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200), ( #7977 in MDL No. 2804, 6 in OKE/6:20-cv-00172), ( #7918 in MDL No. 2804, 20 in OKE/6:20-cv-00156, 20 in OKE/6:20-cv-00160) in the following opposition(s) of Plaintiffs 10 Actions - ALN-1, CAC-1, ILN-1, MSS-1, NYE-1, OKE-4, OKW-1 - SECTION B (DESIGNATED FOR CONSIDERATION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 9/24/2020 in Washington, DC.Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 8/18/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ALN/2:20-cv-00848, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, NYE/2:20-cv-02431, OKE/6:20-cv-00156, OKE/6:20-cv-00160, OKE/6:20-cv-00172, OKE/6:20-cv-00200, OKW/5:20-cv-00456 (RH)
August 6, 2020 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 8098 in MDL No. 2804), (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8236 in MDL No. 2804), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8094 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC, H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Padgett, William) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
August 6, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. (1 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8039 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by William Edward Padgett on behalf of Defendants H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Padgett, William) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
August 6, 2020 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 8098 in MDL No. 2804), (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8236 in MDL No. 2804), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8094 in MDL No. 2804), ( 8256 in MDL No. 2804, 23 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205), ( 8041 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc. Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (Stern, Jonathan) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
August 6, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. (1 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8039 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) Filed by Jonathan L. Stern on behalf of Defendants #et al.Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo International PLC,. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (Stern, Jonathan) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
August 6, 2020 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (( 8094 in MDL No. 2804) 8044 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. (NY). (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
August 6, 2020 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8094 in MDL No. 2804)( 8098 in MDL No. 2804)( 8044 in MDL No. 2804), ( 8049 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINKS
August 6, 2020 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8094 in MDL No. 2804), ( #8041 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (DE). (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 6, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. (1 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8039 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) Filed by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr on behalf of Defendants Walgreen Co. (IL), #et al.Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. (NY), Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (DE) #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
August 6, 2020 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8094 in MDL No. 2804)(18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for The Kroger Co. (OH). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Harvey, Ronda) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
August 6, 2020 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg.( 8094 in MDL No. 2804) (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111) -- Identifying Corporate Parent THE KROGER CO., LTD for Kroger Limited Partnership II (OH). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Harvey, Ronda) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
August 6, 2020 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg.( 8094 in MDL No. 2804) (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111) -- Identifying Corporate Parent THE KROGER CO., LTD for Kroger Limited Partnership I (OH). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Harvey, Ronda) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
August 6, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. (2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8039 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Ronda L. Harvey on behalf of Defendants Kroger Limited Partnership I (OH), #et al.Kroger Limited Partnership II (OH), The Kroger Co. (OH) #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Harvey, Ronda)
August 6, 2020 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg.( 8094 in MDL NO. 2804)( 8098 in MDL No. 2804) (3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202), (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for SPECGX LLC. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (O'Connor, Brien) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINKS. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
August 6, 2020 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg.( 8094 in MDL No. 2804)( 8098 in MDL No. 2804) (3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202), (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt, LLC. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (O'Connor, Brien) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINKS. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
August 6, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg.( 8039 in MDL No. 2804) (1 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 1 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) Filed by Brien T. O'Connor on behalf of Defendants Mallinckrodt, LLC, #et al.SpecGx, LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC. #[Suppress List] Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (O'Connor, Brien) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
August 6, 2020 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8094 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis Elizabeth LLC (DE), Actavis Kadian LLC (DE), Actavis LLC, Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., (DE), Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. (FL), Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. (DE), Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC (DE), Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a/ Watson Pharma Inc. (DE), Actavis South Atlantic LLC (DE), Actavis Totowa LLC (DE), Cephalon, Inc. (DE), Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (DE), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV). (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Reed, Steven)
August 6, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. (2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8039 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Steven A. Reed on behalf of Defendants Actavis Elizabeth LLC (DE), #et al.Actavis Kadian LLC (DE), Actavis LLC, Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., (DE), Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. (FL), Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. (DE), Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC (DE), Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a/ Watson Pharma Inc. (DE), Actavis South Atlantic LLC (DE), Actavis Totowa LLC (DE), Cephalon, Inc. (DE), Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (DE), Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV) #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Other List of Defendants, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Reed, Steven)
August 6, 2020 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8094 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Assertio Holdings, Inc. for Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. f/k/a Depomed, Inc. (DE). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Sadler, Kevin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. (2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8039 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Kevin Marshall Sadler on behalf of Defendant Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. f/k/a Depomed, Inc. (DE) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Sadler, Kevin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8094 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan USA, Inc. (DE). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Welch, Donna)
August 6, 2020 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8094 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan Sales, LLC (DE). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Welch, Donna)
August 6, 2020 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8094 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan Finance, LLC (NV). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Welch, Donna)
August 6, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. (2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8039 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Donna Marie Welch on behalf of Defendants Allergan Finance, LLC (NV), #et al.Allergan Sales, LLC (DE), Allergan USA, Inc. (DE) #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Welch, Donna)
August 6, 2020 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg.( 8094 in MDL No. 2804) (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Quorum Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Granite City Hospital Corporation for Granite City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Gateway Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Barrett, John (Don)) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
August 6, 2020 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8041 in MDL No. 2804)( 8094 in MDL No. 2804)( 8098 in MDL No. 2804)(3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111), (3 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Cardinal Health, Inc. Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Cardinal Health 110, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (Mainigi, Enu) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINKS. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
August 6, 2020 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg.( 8094 in MDL No. 2804) (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp for Massac Memorial, LLC d/b/a Massac Memorial Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Barrett, John (Don)) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME. ADDED MDL LINK
August 6, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8094 in MDL No. 2804) (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Quorum Health Corporation for Anna Hospital Corporation d/b/a Union County Hospital, Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Metrosouth Medical Center, Galesburg Hospital Corporation d/b/a Galesburg Cottage Hospital, Marion Hospital Corporation d/b/a Heartland Regional Medical Center, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc. d/b/a Crossroads Community Hospital, Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Red Bud Regional Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Barrett, John (Don)) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
August 6, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. ( 8039 in MDL No. 2804)(1 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 1 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) Filed by Enu Mainigi on behalf of Defendants #et al. Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (Mainigi, Enu) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME. ADDED MDL LINK
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION TO VACATE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER WITH BRIEF IN SUPPORT (CTO-165) re: pldg.( 8094 in MDL No. 2804) (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111), (6 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111) Filed by Plaintiffs #et al.Anna Hospital Corporation d/b/a Union County Hospital, Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Metrosouth Medical Center, City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC, Galesburg Hospital Corporation d/b/a Galesburg Cottage Hospital, Granite City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Gateway Regional Medical Center, Marion Hospital Corporation d/b/a Heartland Regional Medical Center, Massac Memorial, LLC d/b/a Massac Memorial Hospital, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc. d/b/a Crossroads Community Hospital, Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Red Bud Regional Hospital, Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Vista Medical Center East #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Barrett, John (Don)) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES. ADDED MDL LINK
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8041 in MDL No. 2804)( 8094 in MDL No. 2804)( 8098 in MDL No. 2804) (3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111), (3 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance Holdings LLC for AmerisourceBergen Corporation; Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (DE). (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (Nicholas, Robert) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINKS. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. ( 8039 in MDL No. 2804) (1 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 1 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) Filed by Robert Arthur Nicholas on behalf of Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (DE), #et al.AmerisourceBergen Corporation #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (Nicholas, Robert) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 8098 in MDL No. 2804), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8094 in MDL No. 2804), ( 8041 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (Lifland, Charles) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8094 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Abbott Laboratories for Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (DE). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (McCauley, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8094 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Abbott Laboratories (IL). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (McCauley, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. (2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8039 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by John A. McCauley on behalf of Defendants Abbott Laboratories (IL), #et al.Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (DE) #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (McCauley, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 8098 in MDL No. 2804), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8094 in MDL No. 2804), ( 8041 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (Lifland, Charles) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. (1 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8039 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) Filed by Charles Coleman Lifland on behalf of Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #et al. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (Lifland, Charles) Modified on 8/10/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 8098 in MDL No. 2804), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8094 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Delinsky, Eric) Modified on 8/5/2020 (SM). EDITED PARTY NAME
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. (3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 8098 in MDL No. 2804), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8094 in MDL No. 2804) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for CVS Health Corporation. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Delinsky, Eric) Modified on 8/5/2020 (SM).EDITED PARTY NAME
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. (1 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 8039 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Eric Delinsky on behalf of Defendants CVS Health Corporation , CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Delinsky, Eric) Modified on 8/5/2020 (SM). EDITED PARTY NAMES
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF MULTIPLE FILED OPPOSITION TO CTO-165 AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. (3 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, #8098 in MDL No. 2804), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8094 in MDL No. 2804), ( #8041 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 8/6/2020. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 8/6/2020. Motion to Vacate with Brief in Support due on or before 8/6/2020. Consolidated Responses due on or before 8/27/2020. Reply, if any, due on or before 9/3/2020. #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/23/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (SM)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-165) - 1 action(s) - re: pldg. (2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8039 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Plaintiffs Anna Hospital Corporation d/b/a Union County Hospital, #et al.Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Metrosouth Medical Center, Galesburg Hospital Corporation d/b/a Galesburg Cottage Hospital, Granite City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Gateway Regional Medical Center, Marion Hospital Corporation d/b/a Heartland Regional Medical Center, Massac Memorial, LLC d/b/a Massac Memorial Hospital, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc. d/b/a Crossroads Community Hospital, Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Red Bud Regional Hospital, Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Vista Medical Center East #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Barrett, John (Don))
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-165 re: pldg. (2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8039 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by John (Don) W. Barrett on behalf of Plaintiffs Anna Hospital Corporation d/b/a Union County Hospital, #et al.Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Metrosouth Medical Center, Galesburg Hospital Corporation d/b/a Galesburg Cottage Hospital, Granite City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Gateway Regional Medical Center, Marion Hospital Corporation d/b/a Heartland Regional Medical Center, Massac Memorial, LLC d/b/a Massac Memorial Hospital, National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc. d/b/a Crossroads Community Hospital, Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Red Bud Regional Hospital, Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Vista Medical Center East #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Barrett, John (Don))
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CTO AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (CTO-165) re: pldg. (1 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, 2 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, 1 in LAE/2:20-cv-01942, #8039 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSN/3:20-cv-00205) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Oppositions due on or before 7/22/2020. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/15/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, LAE/2:20-cv-01942, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (SM)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY (CTO-165) - 4 action(s) Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/15/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, LAE/2:20-cv-01942, MSN/3:20-cv-00205 (SM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 ERRATA - to ( #8037 in MDL No. 2804) - Filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation (DE), CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ILN/1:20-cv-04111 (Delinsky, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marion Hospital Corporation et al v. Abbott Laboratories (IL) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories (IL)
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Represented By: Brittany Lynne Weiss
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DE)
Represented By: Christopher J Lovrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation (DE)
Represented By: Eric Delinsky
Represented By: Alexandra W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc. (OH)
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Sarah E. Harmon
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Represented By: Anita Maria Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: James W. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. (NY)
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC (DE)
Represented By: James W. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (DE)
Represented By: Robert Arthur Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed, Inc. (DE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc. (PA)
Represented By: Jessica B Cozart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (DE)
Represented By: William Edward Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc. (NV)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (DE)
Represented By: James W. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx, LLC (DE)
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I (OH)
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. (PA)
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. f/k/a Depomed, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Represented By: Kevin Marshall Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. (DE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson (NJ)
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Represented By: Brittany Lynne Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC (NV)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a/ Watson Pharma Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC f/k/a Impax Laboratories, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Charles Zachary Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co. (IL)
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. (PA)
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Represented By: Brittany Lynne Weiss
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Christopher J Lovrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. (FL)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc., (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC (DE)
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc. (DE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company (SC)
Represented By: John Joseph Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sherry A. Knutson
Represented By: Brittany Lynne Weiss
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Stephanie E Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II (OH)
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc. (FL)
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co. (OH)
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc. (DE)
Represented By: Daniel Jarcho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (RI)
Represented By: Eric Delinsky
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Andrea Verney
Represented By: Steven Todd Whitmer
Represented By: Alexandra W. Miller
Represented By: Sky Anne Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Hospital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Hospital Corporation doing business as Heartland Regional Medical Center
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Gateway Regional Medical Center
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massac Memorial, LLC doing business as Massac Memorial Hospital
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galesburg Hospital Corporation doing business as Galesburg Cottage Hospital
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc. d/b/a Crossroads Community Hospital
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Red Bud Regional Hospital
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galesburg Hospital Corporation d/b/a Galesburg Cottage Hospital
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Metrosouth Medical Center
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massac Memorial, LLC d/b/a Massac Memorial Hospital
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc. doing business as Crossroads Community Hospital
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Hospital Corporation doing business as Union County Hospital
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Hospital Corporation d/b/a Heartland Regional Medical Center
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Bud Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Red Bud Regional Hospital
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Vista Medical Center East
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waukegan Illinois Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Vista Medical Center East
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Illinois Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Gateway Regional Medical Center
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Hospital Corporation d/b/a Union County Hospital
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Island Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Metrosouth Medical Center
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?