IN RE: T-Mobile 2022 Customer Data Security Breach Litigation
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Case Number: MDL NO. 3073
Filed: February 8, 2023
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TRANSFER ORDER re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Transferring 10 action(s) to Judge Brian C. Wimes in the W.D. Missouri.Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 6/2/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172 (TF)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CONSENT ORDER re: pldg(s). #1 Consenting to transfer of litigation to Judge Brian C. Wimes in the Missouri Western District Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge, USDC Beth Phillips on 05/31/23. (TF)
May 2, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (10 in FLN/3:23-cv-01220, #30 in MDL No. 3073), (13 in FLN/3:23-cv-01220, #48 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Caitlyn Prichard Miller on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTINE CORTAZAL (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, FLN/3:23-cv-01220 (Miller, Caitlyn)
May 1, 2023 Filing 56 SEE CORRECTED PLDG. #57 in MDL No. 3073 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (14 in CAC/2:23-cv-00477, #48 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Bryan F. Aylstock on behalf of Plaintiff Jennifer Baughman (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477 (Aylstock, Bryan) Modified on 5/3/2023 (RH).
May 1, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (2 in CAS/3:23-cv-00427, #42 in MDL No. 3073), ( #48 in MDL No. 3073, 11 in WAW/2:23-cv-00172) Filed by Anthony Christina on behalf of Plaintiffs Andrea L. Arroyo, Robin Dollson (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAS/3:23-cv-00427, WAW/2:23-cv-00172 (Christina, Anthony)
May 1, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (14 in CAC/2:23-cv-00477, 12 in CAC/2:23-cv-00766, 11 in CAN/3:23-cv-00436, 13 in FLN/3:23-cv-01220, 10 in KS/2:23-cv-02031, #48 in MDL No. 3073, 10 in MOW/4:23-cv-00052, 13 in NJ/2:23-cv-00367, 12 in SC/4:23-cv-00438, 12 in WAW/2:23-cv-00103, 15 in WAW/2:23-cv-00142, 11 in WAW/2:23-cv-00172), (12 in CAC/2:23-cv-00477, 10 in CAC/2:23-cv-00766, 9 in CAN/3:23-cv-00436, 1 in CAS/3:23-cv-00427, 11 in FLN/3:23-cv-01220, 4 in GAN/1:23-cv-00489, 3 in ILN/1:23-cv-01263, 8 in KS/2:23-cv-02031, #41 in MDL No. 3073, 8 in MOW/4:23-cv-00052, 11 in NJ/2:23-cv-00367, 10 in SC/4:23-cv-00438, 9 in WAW/2:23-cv-00103, 12 in WAW/2:23-cv-00142, 9 in WAW/2:23-cv-00172, 2 in WAW/2:23-cv-00188, 5 in WAW/2:23-cv-00211), (9 in CAC/2:23-cv-00766, #40 in MDL No. 3073), (8 in CAN/3:23-cv-00436, #37 in MDL No. 3073), (2 in CAS/3:23-cv-00427, #42 in MDL No. 3073), (10 in FLN/3:23-cv-01220, #30 in MDL No. 3073), (3 in GAN/1:23-cv-00489, #39 in MDL No. 3073), ( #2 in MDL No. 3073), ( #29 in MDL No. 3073, 3 in WAW/2:23-cv-00211), ( #43 in MDL No. 3073, 13 in WAW/2:23-cv-00142), ( #31 in MDL No. 3073, 10 in NJ/2:23-cv-00367), ( #46 in MDL No. 3073, 10 in WAW/2:23-cv-00103), ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Kristine McAlister Brown on behalf of Defendants T-MOBILE US INC, #et al.T-Mobile US, Inc., #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, CAS/3:23-cv-00427, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, GAN/1:23-cv-00489, ILN/1:23-cv-01263, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172, WAW/2:23-cv-00188, WAW/2:23-cv-00211 (Brown, Kristine) Modified on 5/4/2023 (RH). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES NAMES
April 28, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (9 in CAC/2:23-cv-00766, #40 in MDL No. 3073), (12 in CAC/2:23-cv-00766, #48 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by William M Audet on behalf of Plaintiff Oscar Munoz (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00766 (Audet, William)
April 27, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( #48 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Thomas Eric Loeser on behalf of Plaintiffs Jessica Bailey, #et al.Martye Benjamin, Fernando Garcia, Andres Gomez, LaTresa Grantham, Mike Magbaleta #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00211 (Loeser, Thomas)
April 26, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (15 in WAW/2:23-cv-00142), ( #48 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Kim D Stephens on behalf of Plaintiffs Tamara Ferguson, Brian Heinz (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00142 (Stephens, Kim) Modified on 4/27/2023 (RH). ADDED MDL LINK
April 25, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( #48 in MDL No. 3073, 12 in WAW/2:23-cv-00103) Filed by Cari C. Laufenberg on behalf of Plaintiff Stephan Clark Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00103 (Laufenberg, Cari)
April 14, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (13 in NJ/2:23-cv-00367), ( #48 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by James E Cecchi on behalf of Plaintiff FRANKIE J. GONZALEZ (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, NJ/2:23-cv-00367 (Cecchi, James) Modified on 4/14/2023 (RH). ADDED MDL LINK
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 HEARING ORDER re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 5/25/2023 in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania. Notices of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument due on or before 5/1/2023.#Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument form (JPML form 9) can be downloaded from our website.Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 4/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Courthouse Advisory) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172 (RH)
March 24, 2023 Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING BRIEFING re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Briefing in this matter is now closed. The parties to actions on the motion(s) remain under a duty, pursuant to Panel Rules 6.1(f) and 6.2(d), to notify the Clerk of the Panel promptly of potential tag-along actions, as well as any development that moots the motion or fully disposes of any action on the motion. Parties in any potential tag-along action may file an Interested Party response, but must do so promptly, and in any event, no later than the Thursday prior to the hearing session at which the motion for transfer is to be heard by the Panel.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 3/24/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, CAS/3:23-cv-00427, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, GAN/1:23-cv-00489, ILN/1:23-cv-01263, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172, WAW/2:23-cv-00188, WAW/2:23-cv-00211 (TF)
March 23, 2023 Filing 46 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 3073), ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Plaintiff Stephan Clark (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00103 (Laufenberg, Cari)
March 23, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.(1 in CAS/3:23-cv-00427), (2 in CAS/3:23-cv-00427), ( #36 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Kristine McAlister Brown on behalf of Defendants T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAS/3:23-cv-00427 (Brown, Kristine)
March 17, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldgs.(2 in CAS/3:23-cv-00427, #42 in MDL No. 3073), ( #2 in MDL No. 3073), ( #36 in MDL No. 3073), ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Alexis Marie Wood on behalf of Plaintiffs Andrea L. Arroyo, #et al.Benjamin Atwell, Nicole Baez, Spencer Berggren, Antonio Bodacoloffi, Joseph Burka, Bonnie Dawson, Stacy Dutill, Alaine Egeler, Colleen Evola, Brandy Foster, Michael W. Gliko, IV, Chanta Graham, Lauren Grover, Alba P. Haro, Jesus Hernandez, Sally Tami Hernandez, Nicole Hinds, Heather Hosfeld, Melissa Johnson, Jonathan Keller, Ken Knutson, Brandon Kruse, Charles Layman, Johnathan Limberger, Carmen V. Lopez, Kirti Mandal, Natalia Maya, Patrick Melton, Brian Mills, Tina Mitchell, Francis Osorio, Jennifer Padilla, Helene Gayle Pry, Greg Seth Resnick, Jeremy Robbins, Terri Rodgers, Jesica Rostine, Cindy Salcedo, Gerry Schettini, Elizabeth Shoemaker, Patricia Torres, Joseph Valdez, Gabrielle D. Vann, Brendan Williams, Isaac Wilson #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAS/3:23-cv-00427 (Wood, Alexis) Modified on 3/20/2023 (TF).
March 17, 2023 Filing 43 RESPONSE (JOINT) IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldgs. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073, #2 in MDL No. 3073) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Tamara Ferguson, Brian Heinz (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service S. Hart) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00142 (Boyd, Kaleigh) Modified on 3/17/2023 (TF). ADDED MDL LINK.
March 16, 2023 Filing 42 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldgs. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073, #2 in MDL No. 3073) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Andrea L. Arroyo, #et al.Benjamin Atwell, Nicole Baez, Spencer Berggren, Antonio Bodacoloffi, Joseph Burka, Bonnie Dawson, Stacy Dutill, Alaine Egeler, Colleen Evola, Brandy Foster, Michael W. Gliko, IV, Chanta Graham, Lauren Grover, Alba P. Haro, Jesus Hernandez, Sally Tami Hernandez, Nicole Hinds, Heather Hosfeld, Melissa Johnson, Jonathan Keller, Ken Knutson, Brandon Kruse, Charles Layman, Johnathan Limberger, Carmen V. Lopez, Kirti Mandal, Natalia Maya, Patrick Melton, Brian Mills, Tina Mitchell, Francis Osorio, Jennifer Padilla, Helene Gayle Pry, Greg Seth Resnick, Jeremy Robbins, Terri Rodgers, Jesica Rostine, Cindy Salcedo, Gerry Schettini, Elizabeth Shoemaker, Patricia Torres, Joseph Valdez, Gabrielle D. Vann, Brendan Williams, Isaac Wilson #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAS/3:23-cv-00427 (Wood, Alexis) Modified on 3/20/2023 (TF).
March 16, 2023 Filing 41 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) ) Filed by Defendants T-MOBILE US, INC., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Terms & Conditions, #2 Oral Argument Statement, #3 Schedule of Actions, #4 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, CAS/3:23-cv-00427, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, GAN/1:23-cv-00489, ILN/1:23-cv-01263, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172, WAW/2:23-cv-00188, WAW/2:23-cv-00211 (Brown, Kristine) Modified on 3/17/2023 (TF). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES.
March 16, 2023 Filing 40 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) ) Filed by Plaintiff Oscar Munoz (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00766 (Audet, William)
March 16, 2023 Filing 39 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldgs. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073, #2 in MDL No. 3073) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Edward Polhill, Steven Vash (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, GAN/1:23-cv-00489 (Herman, John) Modified on 3/17/2023 (TF). ADDED MDL LINK.
March 16, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #33 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by John C. Herman on behalf of Plaintiffs Edward Polhill, Steven Vash (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, GAN/1:23-cv-00489 (Herman, John)
March 14, 2023 Filing 37 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) ) Filed by Pro Se Plaintiff Stephen S. Hart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAN/3:23-cv-00436 (TF)
March 13, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Alexis M. Wood, Counsel for: Plaintiffs Elizabeth Shoemaker, Andrea L. Arroyo, Benjamin Atwell, Nicole Baez, Spencer Berggren, Antonio Bodacoloffi, Joseph Burka, Bonnie Dawson, Stacy Dutill, Alaina Egeler, Colleen Evola, Brandy Foster, Michael W. Gliko IV, Chanta Graham, Lauren Grover, Alba P. Haro, Jesus Hernandez, Sally Tami Hernandez, Nicole Hinds, Heather Hosfeld, Melissa Johnson, Jonathan Keller, Ken Knutson, Brandon Kruse, Charles Layman, Johnathan Limberger, Carmen V. Lopez, Kirti Mandal, Natalia Maya, Patrick Melton, Brian Mills, Tina Mitchell, Francis Osorio, Jennifer Padilla, Helene Gayle Pry, Greg Seth Resnick, Jeremy Robbins, Terri Rodgers, Jessica Rostine, Cindy Salcedo, Gary Schettini, Patricia Torres, Joseph Valdez, Gabrielle D. Vann, Brendan Williams, and Isaac Wilson -- California Southern District Court (3:23-cv-00247) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Complaint CAS 3:23-00427) (Wood, Alexis) (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/14/2023) (TF). Modified on 3/14/2023 (TF). ADDED PARTY TYPE.
March 7, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #33 in MDL No. 3073), ( #22 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Kristine McAlister Brown on behalf of Defendants T-Mobile USA Inc, T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, GAN/1:23-cv-00489, ILN/1:23-cv-01263, WAW/2:23-cv-00188, WAW/2:23-cv-00211 (Brown, Kristine) Modified on 3/7/2023 (TF). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES.
March 7, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Bryan Thompson on behalf of Plaintiffs Jerome Cascio, David Lopez (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Appearance) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, ILN/1:23-cv-01263 (Thompson, Bryan) Modified on 3/7/2023 (TF). MODIFIED ATTACHMENT DESCRIPTION.
March 6, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 3 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Kristine M. Brown, Counsel for: Defendants T-Mobile USA, Inc. and T-Mobile US, Inc. -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:23-cv-01263), Georgia Northern District Court (1:23-cv-00489), Washington Western District Court (2:23-cv-00188) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit A (Complaint - ILN 1:23-01263), #4 Exhibit B (Complaint - GAN 1:23-00489), #5 Exhibit C (Complaint - WAW 2:23-00188)) (Brown, Kristine)
March 1, 2023 Filing 32 WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE (re: pldg. (10 in CAC/2:23-cv-00477, #27 in MDL No. 3073) ) by Kiley L. Grombacher, Esq., Plaintiff Jennifer Baughman. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477 (Grombacher, Kiley)
March 1, 2023 Filing 31 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT Filed by Plaintiff FRANKIE J. GONZALEZ (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, NJ/2:23-cv-00367 (Cecchi, James)
March 1, 2023 Filing 30 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) ) Filed by Plaintiff CHRISTINE CORTAZAL (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, FLN/3:23-cv-01220 (Miller, Caitlyn)
March 1, 2023 Filing 29 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073), ( #2 in MDL No. 3073) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Jessica Bailey, #et al.Martye Benjamin, Fernando Garcia, Andres Gomez, LaTresa Grantham, Mike Magbaleta #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00211 (Loeser, Thomas)
February 24, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #22 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Thomas Eric Loeser on behalf of Plaintiffs Jessica Bailey, #et al.Martye Benjamin, Fernando Garcia, Andres Gomez, LaTresa Grantham, Mike Magbaleta #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00211 (Loeser, Thomas)
February 23, 2023 Filing 27 APPEARANCE WITHDRAWN. SEE PLEADING 32 IN MDL 3073 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Kiley Grombacher on behalf of Plaintiff Jennifer Baughman (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477 (Grombacher, Kiley) ADDED NOTATION. Modified on 3/2/2023 (CT).
February 23, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #22 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Plaintiffs Jessica Bailey, #et al.Martye Benjamin, Fernando Garcia, Andres Gomez, LaTresa Grantham, Mike Magbaleta #[Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00211 (Loeser, Thomas)
February 23, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #2 in MDL No. 3073), ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Alexis Marie Wood on behalf of Plaintiffs Robin Dollson, #et al.Leonardo Figueroa, Candy Howard #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00172 (Wood, Alexis)
February 23, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by William M Audet on behalf of Plaintiff Oscar Munoz (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00766 (Audet, William)
February 23, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #2 in MDL No. 3073), ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Cari C. Laufenberg on behalf of Plaintiff Stephan Clark (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00103 (Laufenberg, Cari)
February 23, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Thomas E. Loeser, Counsel for: Plaintiffs Jessica Bailey, Martye Benjamin, Fernando Garcia, Andres Gomez, Latresa Grantham, and Mike Magbaleta -- Washington Western District Court (2:23-cv-00211) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Complaint WAW 2:23-00211) (Loeser, Thomas)
February 22, 2023 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073), ( #2 in MDL No. 3073) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V., Corporate Parent SoftBank Group Corp., Corporate Parent T-MOBILE US, INC., Corporate Parent Delaware Project 6 L.L.C., Corporate Parent Masayoshi Son for T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172 (Brown, Kristine) REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES. Modified on 2/23/2023 (CT).
February 22, 2023 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073), ( #2 in MDL No. 3073) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V., Corporate Parent SoftBank Group Corp., Corporate Parent Delaware Project 6 L.L.C., Corporate Parent Masayoshi Son for T-MOBILE US, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172 (Brown, Kristine) REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES. Modified on 2/23/2023 (CT).
February 22, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3073, 5 in CAC/2:23-cv-00477, 3 in CAC/2:23-cv-00766, 3 in CAN/3:23-cv-00436, 5 in FLN/3:23-cv-01220, 3 in KS/2:23-cv-02031, #17 in MDL No. 3073, 3 in MOW/4:23-cv-00052, 5 in NJ/2:23-cv-00367, 5 in SC/4:23-cv-00438, 3 in WAW/2:23-cv-00103, 7 in WAW/2:23-cv-00142, 3 in WAW/2:23-cv-00172), ( #2 in MDL No. 3073), ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Kristine McAlister Brown on behalf of Defendants T-Mobile US, Inc. and T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172 (Brown, Kristine) ADDED MDL LINK. Modified on 2/22/2023 (CT). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES. Modified on 2/22/2023 (CT).
February 21, 2023 Filing 18 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY***MINUTE ORDER (re: pldg. ( #17 in MDL No. 3073) ) Motion of Pro Se Plaintiff Stephen S. Hart for Extension of Time to File Response -- GRANTED TO ALL PARTIES. Responses due on or before 3/16/2023. Reply, if any, due on or before 3/23/2023. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 2/21/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172 (JN)
February 21, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Pro Se Plaintiff Stephen S Hart. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172 (CT)
February 21, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3073, #14 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Caitlyn Prichard Miller on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTINE CORTAZAL (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, FLN/3:23-cv-01220 (Miller, Caitlyn) ADDED MDL LINK AND MODIFIED EVENT TYPE. Modified on 2/22/2023 (CT). Modified on 2/22/2023 (CT).
February 21, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3073, #2 in MDL No. 3073, #13 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Bryan F. Aylstock on behalf of Plaintiff Jennifer Baughman (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477 (Aylstock, Bryan) ADDED MDL LINK MODIFIED EVENT TYPE. Modified on 2/22/2023 (CT).
February 21, 2023 Filing 14 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING NO. 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Caitlyn Prichard Miller on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTINE CORTAZAL (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, FLN/3:23-cv-01220 (Miller, Caitlyn) ADDED NOTATION. Modified on 2/22/2023 (CT).
February 17, 2023 Filing 13 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING NO. 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #2 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Bryan F. Aylstock on behalf of Plaintiff Jennifer Baughman (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477 (Aylstock, Bryan) ADDED NOTATION Modified on 2/22/2023 (CT).
February 15, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. ( #9 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Plaintiff Brian Heinz -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00142 (Stephens, Kim) Modified on 2/15/2023 (TF). ADDED MDL LINK.
February 15, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. ( #8 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Plaintiff Tamara Ferguson -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00142 (Boyd, Kaleigh)
February 15, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #7 in MDL No. 3073, 3 in SC/4:23-cv-00438) Filed by Plaintiff Lisa Frierson -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, SC/4:23-cv-00438 (Doolittle, Paul)
February 14, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldgs. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073), ( #2 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Kim D Stephens on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Heinz Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00142 (Stephens, Kim) Modified on 2/15/2023 (TF). ADDED MDL LINK.
February 14, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldgs. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073), ( #2 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Kaleigh Boyd on behalf of Plaintiff Tamara Ferguson Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, WAW/2:23-cv-00142 (Boyd, Kaleigh) Modified on 2/15/2023 (TF). ADDED MDL LINK.
February 14, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #2 in MDL No. 3073), ( #1 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by Paul Doolittle on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa Frierson (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, SC/4:23-cv-00438 (Doolittle, Paul)
February 13, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #5 in MDL No. 3073, 3 in NJ/2:23-cv-00367) Filed by Plaintiff FRANKIE J. GONZALEZ -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, NJ/2:23-cv-00367 (Cecchi, James)
February 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldgs. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073), ( #2 in MDL No. 3073) Filed by James E Cecchi on behalf of Plaintiff FRANKIE J. GONZALEZ Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, NJ/2:23-cv-00367 (Cecchi, James) Modified on 2/13/2023 (TF). ADDED MDL LINK.
February 9, 2023 Filing 4 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3073), ( #2 in MDL No. 3073) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 2/23/2023. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 2/23/2023. Responses due on or before 3/2/2023. Reply, if any, due on or before 3/9/2023. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 2/9/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3073, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172 (SM)
February 9, 2023 Filing 3 MDL Number 3073 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending No. 3), ( #2 in Pending No. 3) Associated Cases: Pending No. 3, CAC/2:23-cv-00477, CAC/2:23-cv-00766, CAN/3:23-cv-00436, FLN/3:23-cv-01220, KS/2:23-cv-02031, MOW/4:23-cv-00052, NJ/2:23-cv-00367, SC/4:23-cv-00438, WAW/2:23-cv-00103, WAW/2:23-cv-00142, WAW/2:23-cv-00172 (SM)
February 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION TO TRANSFER (CORRECTED) -- (re: pldg. #1 ) Correcting the following items: Signature block, Proof of service, Docket Sheets & Complaints, -- Filed by: Plaintiff Stephan Clark (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Complaint CDCA 23-cv-00477)(Laufenberg, Cari)
February 8, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION TO TRANSFER (INITIAL MOTION) with Brief in Support. -- 11 Action(s) -- from Florida Northern District Court (3:23-cv-01220), California Central District Court (2:23-cv-00477,2:23-cv-00766), New Jersey District Court (2:23-cv-00367), Missouri Western District Court (4:23-cv-00052), Kansas District Court (2:23-cv-02031), California Northern District Court (3:23-cv-00436), South Carolina District Court (4:23-cv-00438), Washington Western District Court (2:23-cv-00103,2:23-cv-00142,2:23-cv-00172) - Suggested Transferee Court: W.D. Wash. - Filed by: Plaintiff Stephan Clark (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Complaint N.D. Fla. 23-cv-01220, #5 Complaint C.D. Cal. 23-cv-00477, #6 Complaint D.N.J. 23-cv-00367, #7 Complaint W.D. Mo. 23-cv-00052, #8 Complaint D. Kan. 23-cv-02031, #9 Complaint W.D. Wash. 23-cv-00103, #10 Complaint W.D. Wash. 23-cv-00142, #11 Complaint N.D. Cal. 23-cv-00436, #12 Complaint D.S.C. 23-cv-00438, #13 Complaint C.D. Cal. 23-cv-00766, #14 Complaint W.D. Wash. 23-cv-00172)(Laufenberg, Cari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: T-Mobile 2022 Customer Data Security Breach Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?