IN RE: FTX Cryptocurrency Exchange Collapse Litigation
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Case Number: MDL NO. 3076
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2023 Filing 84 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #3 in MDL No. 3076), ( #77 in MDL No. 3076) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Armanino, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service (Re-filed documents to correct caption)) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:23-cv-20700, NJ/2:23-cv-00389 (Bosher, Matthew) Modified on 4/6/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND ADDED MDL LINK
April 5, 2023 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.( #3 in MDL No. 3076), ( #76 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Matthew P. Bosher on behalf of Defendant Armanino, LLP (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service (Re-filed documents to correct caption)) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:23-cv-20700, NJ/2:23-cv-00389 (Bosher, Matthew) Modified on 4/6/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND ADDED MDL LINK
March 29, 2023 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #79 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Defendant Shohei Ohtani -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:22-cv-23753 (Soto, Edward)
March 24, 2023 Filing 81 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Defendants Silvergate Bank, #et al. Silvergate Capital Corporation, Alan J Lane #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service re The Silvergate Respondents' Reasons Why Oral Argument Should be Heard) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Towill, Polly) Modified on 3/27/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
March 24, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Polly Towill on behalf of Defendant Silvergate Bank (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service re Notice of Appearance of Polly Towill) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Towill, Polly) Modified on 3/24/2023 (LH). REMOVED ATTACHMENT NAME
March 24, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Edward Soto on behalf of Defendant Shohei Ohtani (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:22-cv-23753 (Soto, Edward)
March 24, 2023 Filing 78 FILED IN ERROR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #77 in MDL No. 3076), ( #76 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Defendant Armanino, LLP -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:23-cv-20700, NJ/2:23-cv-00389 (Bosher, Matthew) Modified on 4/6/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 20, 2023 Filing 77 SEE PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #84 in MDL No. 3076) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Armanino, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:23-cv-20700, NJ/2:23-cv-00389 (Bosher, Matthew) Modified on 4/6/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 20, 2023 Filing 76 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #83 in MDL No. 3076)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #3 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Matthew P. Bosher on behalf of Defendant Armanino, LLP (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:23-cv-20700, NJ/2:23-cv-00389 (Bosher, Matthew) Modified on 4/6/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 20, 2023 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (1 in CAN/3:23-cv-00655, 1 in CAN/3:23-cv-00945, 13 in FLS/1:23-cv-20700, #53 in MDL No. 3076), (2 in CAN/3:23-cv-00655, 2 in CAN/3:23-cv-00945, 14 in FLS/1:23-cv-20700, #54 in MDL No. 3076), (3 in CAN/3:23-cv-00655, 3 in CAN/3:23-cv-00945, 15 in FLS/1:23-cv-20700, #55 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Defendant Sequoia Capital Operations, LLC -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00655, CAN/3:23-cv-00945, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Park, Jennifer) Modified on 3/21/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
March 20, 2023 Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING BRIEFING re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076) Briefing in this matter is now closed. The parties to actions on the motion(s) remain under a duty, pursuant to Panel Rules 6.1(f) and 6.2(d), to notify the Clerk of the Panel promptly of potential tag-along actions, as well as any development that moots the motion or fully disposes of any action on the motion. Parties in any potential tag-along action may file an Interested Party response, but must do so promptly, and in any event, no later than the Thursday prior to the hearing session at which the motion for transfer is to be heard by the Panel.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 3/20/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, CAN/3:23-cv-00655, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670, CAN/3:23-cv-00945, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439, FLS/1:23-cv-20700, NJ/2:23-cv-00389, NYS/1:23-cv-00993 (LH)
March 17, 2023 Filing 73 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #50 , #52 , #55 , #56 , #57 , #58 , #59 , #60 , #61 , #64 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Plaintiffs/Consol Plaintiffs Alexander Chernyavsky, #et al.Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, Gregg Podalsky, Edwin Garrison, Shengyun Huang, Michael Livieratos, Michael Norris, Brandon Rowan, Vijeth Shetty, Bo Yang #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, CAN/3:23-cv-00655, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670, CAN/3:23-cv-00945, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439, FLS/1:23-cv-20700, NJ/2:23-cv-00389, NYS/1:23-cv-00993 (Moskowitz, Adam) Modified on 3/20/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 3/22/2023 (LH). ADDED MDL LINKS
March 17, 2023 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #68 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Defendant PRAGER METIS LLP -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, NJ/2:23-cv-00389 (Travalini, Joanna)
March 17, 2023 Filing 71 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Defendants Thomas Brady, #et al.Kevin O'Leary, David Ortiz, Thomas Brady, Gisele Bundchen, Lawrence Gene David, William Trevor Lawrence, Kevin O'Leary, David Ortiz #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:23-cv-20439 (Clubok, Andrew) Modified on 3/30/2023 (LH). ADDED MDL LINK
March 16, 2023 Filing 70 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #72 in MDL No. 3076)) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #68 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Defendants Prager Metis CPAs, LLC, #et al.Prager Metis CPA's, Prager Metis CPAs, LLC, Prager Metis CPAs, LLC #[Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Travalini, Joanna) Modified on 3/20/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 14, 2023 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #51 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Defendant Sequoia Capital Operations, LLC -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00655, CAN/3:23-cv-00945 (Park, Jennifer) Modified on 3/14/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
March 14, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Joanna R. Travalini, counsel for: Defendant Prager Metis CPAs, LLC -- New Jersey District Court (2:23-cv-00389) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint NJ 2:23-389, #3 Proof of Service) (Travalini, Joanna) Modified on 3/14/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND ATTACHMENT NAME, ADDED PARTY TYPE
March 14, 2023 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) - re: pldg. ( #42 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Plaintiffs Statistica Capital Ltd., Statistica Ltd. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, NYS/1:23-cv-00993 (Fitzgerald, John) Modified on 3/14/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME
March 14, 2023 Filing 66 ERRATA - to ( #59 in MDL No. 3076, 4 in NYS/1:23-cv-00993) - Filed by Plaintiffs Statistica Capital Ltd., Statistica Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, NYS/1:23-cv-00993 (Fitzgerald, John)
March 14, 2023 Filing 65 ERRATA - to ( #42 in MDL No. 3076) - Filed by Plaintiffs Statistica Capital Ltd., Statistica Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Document, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, NYS/1:23-cv-00993 (Fitzgerald, John)
March 10, 2023 Filing 64 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE (JOINT) -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Matson Magleby, Golam Sakline, Soham Bhatia (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669 (Polk, Adam) Modified on 3/13/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND ADDED ADDITIONAL FILING PARTY
March 10, 2023 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Paradigm Operations LP. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00655, CAN/3:23-cv-00945, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Drylewski, Alex)
March 10, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Alex Drylewski on behalf of Defendant Paradigm Operations LP (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00655, CAN/3:23-cv-00945, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Drylewski, Alex)
March 10, 2023 Filing 61 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION (JOINT) -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Russell Hawkins, #et al.Elliott Lam, Julie Papadakis, Movants Michael Elliott Jessup, Stephen T Pierce #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024 (King, Laurence) Modified on 3/14/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME
March 10, 2023 Filing 60 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076), ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) ) Filed by Plaintiff Connor O'Keefe (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Miller, Kerry) Modified on 3/13/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND REMOVED LIAISON COUNSEL
March 10, 2023 Filing 59 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Statistica Capital Ltd., Statistica Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jack Fitzgerald, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, NYS/1:23-cv-00993 (Fitzgerald, John)
March 10, 2023 Filing 58 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076), ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) ) Filed by Defendant Prager Metis CPAs, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Travalini, Joanna)
March 10, 2023 Filing 57 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) ) Filed by Plaintiff Nicole Keane (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00670 (Blood, Timothy)
March 10, 2023 Filing 56 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076), ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) ) Filed by Defendants Thomas Brady, #et al.Kevin O'Leary, David Ortiz, Thomas Brady, Gisele Bundchen, Lawrence Gene David, William Trevor Lawrence, Kevin O'Leary, David Ortiz #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:23-cv-20439 (Clubok, Andrew)
March 10, 2023 Filing 55 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076), ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) ) Filed by Defendants Paradigm Operations LP, #et al.Sequoia Capital Operations, LLC #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00655, CAN/3:23-cv-00945, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Park, Jennifer) Modified on 3/13/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
March 10, 2023 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Sequoia Capital Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00655, CAN/3:23-cv-00945, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Park, Jennifer) Modified on 3/14/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
March 10, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #51 in MDL No. 3076), ( #8 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Jennifer Kennedy Park on behalf of Defendant Sequoia Capital Operations, LLC (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00655, CAN/3:23-cv-00945, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Park, Jennifer) Modified on 3/14/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
March 10, 2023 Filing 52 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Defendants Silvergate Bank, #et al.Silvergate Capital Corporation, Alan J Lane #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670 (Towill, Polly) Modified on 3/13/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
March 10, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 2 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Jennifer Kennedy Park, Counsel for: Defendant Sequoia Capital Operations, LLC -- California Northern District Court (3:23-cv-00655,3:23-cv-00945) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit A (Complaint - CAN 3:23-655), #4 Exhibit B (Complaint - CAN 3:23-945)) (Park, Jennifer)
March 10, 2023 Filing 50 RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) ) Filed by Defendant Golden State Warriors LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:22-cv-23753 (Kahn, Matthew)
March 10, 2023 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. (11 in FLS/1:23-cv-20700, #48 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Defendant Prager Metis CPAs, LLC -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Travalini, Joanna) Modified on 3/10/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES AND ADDED MDL LINK
March 10, 2023 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp for Prager Metis CPAs, LLC. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Travalini, Joanna) Modified on 3/10/2023 (LH). ADDED NO PARENT CORP AND FILING PARTIES
March 10, 2023 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. (11 in CAN/3:22-cv-07444, 11 in CAN/3:22-cv-07620, 11 in CAN/3:23-cv-00024, 9 in FLS/1:23-cv-20700, #46 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Defendants Prager Metis CPAs, LLC, #et al.Prager Metis CPA's, Prager Metis CPAs, LLC, Prager Metis CPAs, LLC #[Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Travalini, Joanna)
March 10, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #3 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Joanna Rubin Travalini on behalf of Defendant Prager Metis CPAs, LLC Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Travalini, Joanna) Modified on 3/10/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
March 10, 2023 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. (9 in CAN/3:22-cv-07336, 9 in CAN/3:22-cv-07444, 9 in CAN/3:22-cv-07620, 9 in CAN/3:22-cv-07666, 9 in CAN/3:23-cv-00024, 17 in CAN/3:23-cv-00667, 14 in CAN/3:23-cv-00669, 10 in CAN/3:23-cv-00670, 14 in FLS/1:22-cv-23753, 9 in FLS/1:22-cv-23983, 11 in FLS/1:23-cv-20439, 7 in FLS/1:23-cv-20700, #44 in MDL No. 3076, 2 in NYS/1:23-cv-00993) Filed by Defendant Prager Metis CPAs, LLC -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439, FLS/1:23-cv-20700, NYS/1:23-cv-00993 (Yang, Irene)
March 10, 2023 Filing 44 WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE (re: pldg. (4 in CAN/3:22-cv-07336, 4 in CAN/3:22-cv-07444, 4 in CAN/3:22-cv-07620, 4 in CAN/3:22-cv-07666, 4 in CAN/3:23-cv-00024, 2 in CAN/3:23-cv-00667, 2 in CAN/3:23-cv-00669, 9 in FLS/1:22-cv-23753, 4 in FLS/1:22-cv-23983, 6 in FLS/1:23-cv-20439, 2 in FLS/1:23-cv-20700, #24 in MDL No. 3076), ( #25 in MDL No. 3076) ) by Irene Yang, Esq., Defendant Prager Metis CPAs, LLC. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670, CAS/3:22-cv-01901, CAS/3:22-cv-01981, CAS/3:23-cv-00038, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439, FLS/1:23-cv-20700, NYS/1:23-cv-00993 (Yang, Irene) Modified on 3/10/2023 (LH). ADDED MDL LINK
March 9, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #42 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by John Joseph Fitzgerald, IV on behalf of Plaintiffs Statistica Capital Ltd., Statistica Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, NYS/1:23-cv-00993 (Fitzgerald, John)
March 9, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Jack Fitzgerald, Counsel for: Plaintiffs Statistica Capital Ltd. & Statistica Ltd. --New York Southern District Court (1:23-cv-00993) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet & Complaint NYS 1:23-993) (Fitzgerald, John) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH) ADDED PARTY TYPE, ADDED CASE NO. AND EDITED ATTACHMENT NAME (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/10/2023) (LH).
March 9, 2023 Filing 41 DUPLICATE PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #42 in MDL No. 3076)) NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Jack Fitzgerald, counsel for: Statistica Capital Ltd. & Statistica Ltd. -- New York Southern District Court (1:23-cv-00993) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit B - Statistica Capital et al. v. Signature Bank Complaint) (Fitzgerald, John) Modified on 3/10/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 9, 2023 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #8 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Plaintiffs/Consol Plaintiffs Alexander Chernyavsky, #et al.Gary Gallant, Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gregg Podalsky, Edwin Garrison, Shengyun Huang, Michael Livieratos, Michael Norris, Brandon Rowan, Vijeth Shetty, Bo Yang #[Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Moskowitz, Adam) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
March 9, 2023 Filing 39 WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (6 in CAN/3:22-cv-07336, 6 in CAN/3:22-cv-07444, 6 in CAN/3:22-cv-07620, 6 in CAN/3:22-cv-07666, 6 in CAN/3:23-cv-00024, 8 in CAN/3:23-cv-00667, 6 in CAN/3:23-cv-00669, 4 in CAN/3:23-cv-00670, 11 in FLS/1:22-cv-23753, 6 in FLS/1:22-cv-23983, 8 in FLS/1:23-cv-20439, 4 in FLS/1:23-cv-20700, #32 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Plaintiffs/Consol Plaintiffs Alexander Chernyavsky, #et al.Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gregg Podalsky, Shengyun Huang, Michael Livieratos, Michael Norris, Brandon Rowan, Vijeth Shetty, Bo Yang #[Suppress List] FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Filed in error. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Moskowitz, Adam) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
March 8, 2023 Filing 38 ERRATA - to ( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #34 in MDL No 3076.) - Filed by Defendants Silvergate Bank, #et al.Silvergate CapitalCorporation, Alan J Lane #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670 (Caseria, Leo) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH). ADDED MDL LINK AND REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES AND ATTACHMENT NAME
March 8, 2023 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #27 in MDL No. 3076) -- Identifying No Parent Corp for Silvergate Capital and Silvergate Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670 (Towill, Polly) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME, ADDED MDL LINK, REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES AND ATTACHMENT NAMES Modified on 3/10/2023 (LH)
March 8, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076) , ( #33 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Polly Towill on behalf of Defendants Silvergate Bank, #et al.Silvergate Capital Corporation, Alan J Lane #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670 (Towill, Polly) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME, ADDED MDL LINK, REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES AND ATTACHMENT NAMES
March 8, 2023 Filing 35 ERRATA - to ( #16 in MDL No. 3076, #31 in MDL No. 3076) - Filed by Plaintiff Soham Bhatia (Attachments: #1 Other, #2 Other) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667 (Kellogg, Jason) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH). ADDED MDL LINK
March 8, 2023 Filing 34 WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re: pldg. ( #26 in MDL No 3076) #et al. Silvergate Capital Corporation, Alan J Lane #[Suppress List]. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669 (Caseria, Leo) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH). ADDED MDL LINK AND REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES AND ATTACHMENT NAME
March 8, 2023 Filing 33 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #36 in MDL No. 3076)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Polly Towill on behalf of Defendants Silvergate Bank, #et al.Silvergate Capital Corporation, Alan J Lane, Silvergate Bank, Silvergate Capital Corporation #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions Schedule of Action, #2 Proof of Service Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669 (Towill, Polly) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 7, 2023 Filing 32 PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( #39 in MDL No. 3076)) MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT re: pldg. ( #8 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Adam M Moskowitz on behalf of Plaintiffs Alexander Chernyavsky, #et al.Gary Gallant, Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gregg Podalsky, Edwin Garrison, Shengyun Huang, Michael Livieratos, Michael Norris, Brandon Rowan, Vijeth Shetty, Bo Yang, Consol Plaintiffs Alexander Chernyavsky, Gary Gallant, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gregg Podalsky #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Corrected Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670, CAS/3:22-cv-01901, CAS/3:22-cv-01981, CAS/3:23-cv-00038, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Moskowitz, Adam) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 7, 2023 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #18 in MDL No. 3076), ( #16 in MDL No. 3076) , ( #28 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Plaintiff Soham Bhatia -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667 (Kellogg, Jason) Modified on 3/7/2023 (LH). ADDED MDL LINK
March 6, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #21 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Timothy Gordon Blood on behalf of Plaintiff Nicole Keane (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00670 (Blood, Timothy)
March 6, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #21 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Plaintiff Nicole Keane -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00670 (Blood, Timothy)
March 6, 2023 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (1 in CAN/3:23-cv-00667, #18 in MDL No. 3076), ( #16 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Plaintiff Soham Bhatia -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667 (Kellogg, Jason)
March 3, 2023 Filing 27 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #37 in MDL No. 3076) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp for Silvergate Capital Corporation, Silvergate Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669 (Caseria, Leo) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 3, 2023 Filing 26 PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( #34 in MDL No. 3076)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Leo D Caseria on behalf of Defendants Silvergate Bank, #et al.Silvergate Capital Corporation, Alan J Lane, Silvergate Bank, Silvergate Capital Corporation #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Tag Along Keane Action (MDL), #2 Other Notice of Dismissal, #3 Proof of Service Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669 (Caseria, Leo) Modified on 3/9/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 3, 2023 Filing 25 PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( #44 in MDL No. 3076)) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp for Prager Metis CPAs, LLC. Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, CAN/3:23-cv-00670, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Yang, Irene) Modified on 3/6/2023 (LH). ADDED NO PARENT CORP AND FILING PARTY Modified on 3/8/2023 (LH). EDITED FILING PARTY Modified on 3/10/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 3, 2023 Filing 24 PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( #44 in MDL No. 3076)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #2 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Irene Yang on behalf of Defendant Prager Metis CPAs, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, CAN/3:23-cv-00667, CAN/3:23-cv-00669, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Yang, Irene) Modified on 3/6/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES Modified on 3/10/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 3, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Matthew S Kahn on behalf of Defendant Golden State Warriors LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:22-cv-23753 (Kahn, Matthew)
March 3, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #8 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Kerry J. Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Connor O'Keefe (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:23-cv-20700 (Miller, Kerry)
March 3, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Timothy G. Blood, counsel for: plaintiff Nicole Keane -- California Northern District Court (3:23-cv-00670) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Complaint 4:23-cv-00670-JD, and docket sheet) (Blood, Timothy) Modified on 3/6/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME
March 3, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by David A Rothstein on behalf of Defendant William Trevor Lawrence (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:22-cv-23753 (Rothstein, David)
March 3, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Andrew B. Clubok on behalf of Defendants Thomas Brady, #et al.Gisele Bundchen, Lawrence Gene David #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:23-cv-20439 (Clubok, Andrew)
March 3, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076), ( #16 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Jason Kenneth Kellogg on behalf of Plaintiff Soham Bhatia (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00667 (Kellogg, Jason)
March 3, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Jeffrey A Neiman on behalf of Defendant Kevin O'Leary (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:22-cv-23753 (Neiman, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Jason Kellogg, Counsel for: Plaintiff Soham Bhatia -- California Northern District Court (3:23-cv-00667) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Complaint ND Cal 3:23-cv-00667) (Kellogg, Jason)
March 3, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Marshal Hoda on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen T Pierce (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07444 (Hoda, Marshal)
March 3, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Christopher Stephen Carver on behalf of Defendant David Ortiz (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:23-cv-20439 (Carver, Christopher)
March 2, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #9 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Adam E. Polk on behalf of Plaintiffs Matson Magleby, Golam Sakline (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00669 (Polk, Adam)
March 2, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Laurence D. King on behalf of Plaintiff Julie Papadakis (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:23-cv-00024 (King, Laurence)
March 2, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by William M Audet on behalf of Plaintiff Elliott Lam (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336 (Audet, William)
March 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Adam M Moskowitz on behalf of Plaintiffs/Consol Plaintiffs Alexander Chernyavsky, #et al.Gary Gallant, Edwin Garrison, Sunil Kavuri, Skyler Lindeen, David Nicol, Gregg Podalsky, Shengyun Huang, Michael Livieratos, Michael Norris, Brandon Rowan, Vijeth Shetty, Bo Yang, Edwin Garrison #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Other List of Parties Represented, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439 (Moskowitz, Adam) Modified on 3/3/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
March 2, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Adam E. Polk, counsel for: Plaintiffs Matson Magleby and Golam Sakline -- California Northern District Court (3:23-cv-00669) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Complaint ND Cal 3:23-cv-00669) (Polk, Adam) Modified on 3/2/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME
March 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Adam M. Moskowitz, counsel for: Petitioners, Edwin Garrison, Gregg Podalsky, Skyler Lindeen, Alexander Chernyavksy, Sunil Kavuri, Gary Gallant, and David Nicol -- Florida Southern District Court (1:23-cv-20700) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Complaint S.D. Fla 1:23-cv-20700) (Moskowitz, Adam) Modified on 3/2/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME
March 1, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Christopher Tourek on behalf of Plaintiff Russell Hawkins (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07620 (Tourek, Christopher)
February 24, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) Filed by Yaman Salahi on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Elliott Jessup (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07666 (Salahi, Yaman)
February 17, 2023 Filing 5 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3076), ( #2 in MDL No. 3076), ( #3 in MDL No. 3076) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 3/3/2023. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 3/3/2023. Responses due on or before 3/10/2023. Reply, if any, due on or before 3/17/2023. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 2/17/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3076, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439 (LH)
February 17, 2023 Filing 4 MDL Number 3076 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending No. 4), ( #2 in Pending No. 4), ( #3 in Pending No. 4) Associated Cases: Pending No. 4, CAN/3:22-cv-07336, CAN/3:22-cv-07444, CAN/3:22-cv-07620, CAN/3:22-cv-07666, CAN/3:23-cv-00024, FLS/1:22-cv-23753, FLS/1:22-cv-23983, FLS/1:23-cv-20439 (LH)
February 16, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION TO TRANSFER (CORRECTED) -- (re: pldg. #2 , #1 ) Correcting the following items: Proof of service, -- Filed by: Plaintiffs Edwin Garrison, Gregg Podalsky, Skyler Lindeen, Alexander Chernyavksy, Sunil Kavuri, Gary Gallant, David Nicol (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Moskowitz, Adam) Modified on 2/17/2023 (LH).
February 15, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION TO TRANSFER (CORRECTED) -- (re: pldg. #1 ) Correcting the following items: Proof of service, Docket Sheets and Complaints -- Filed by: Plaintiffs Edwin Garrison, Gregg Podalsky, Skyler Lindeen, Alexander Chernyavksy, Sunil Kavuri, Gary Gallant, David Nicol (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Complaint S.D. Fla. 1:22-CV-23753, #3 Complaint S.D. Fla. 1:22-cv-23983, #4 Complaint S.D. Fla. 1:23-CV-20439, #5 Complaint N.D. Cal. 3:22-cv-07666, #6 Complaint N.D.Cal. 3:22-CV-07620, #7 Complaint N.D. Cal. 3:22-CV-07444, #8 Complaint N.D. Cal. 3:22-CV-07336, #9 Complaint N.D. Cal. 3:23-CV-00024, #10 Complaint S.D. Cal. 3:22-CV-01981,, #11 Complaint S.D. Cal. 3:22-CV-01901, #12 Complaint S.D. Cal. 3:23-CV-00038)(Moskowitz, Adam) Modified on 2/16/2023 (LH). Modified on 2/17/2023 (LH). ADDED ADDITIONAL ITEM
February 10, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION TO TRANSFER (INITIAL MOTION) with Brief in Support. -- 11 Action(s) -- from Florida Southern District Court (1:22-cv-23753,1:23-cv-20439,1:22-cv-23983), California Northern District Court (3:23-cv-00024,3:22-cv-07666,3:22-cv-07620,3:22-cv-07444,3:22-cv-07336), California Southern District Court (3:22-cv-01981 (closed),3:22-cv-01901 (closed),3:23-cv-00038 (closed)) - Suggested Transferee Court: Southern District of Florida - Filed by: Plaintiffs Edwin Garrison, Gregg Podalsky, Skyler Lindeen, Alexander Chernyavksy, Sunil Kavuri, Gary Gallant, David Nicol (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Complaint S.D. Fla. 1:22-cv-23753, #5 Complaint S.D. Fla. 1:22-cv-23983, #6 Complaint S.D. Fla. 1:23-cv-20439, #7 Complaint N.D. Cal. 3:22-cv-07666, #8 Complaint N.D. Cal. 3:22-cv-07620, #9 Complaint N.D. Cal. 3:22-cv-07444, #10 Complaint N.D. Cal. 3:22-cv-07336, #11 Complaint N.D. Cal. 3:23-cv-00024, #12 Complaint S.D. Cal. 3:22-cv-01981, #13 Complaint S.D. Cal. 3:22-cv-01901, #14 Complaint S.D. Cal. 3:23-cv-00038)(Moskowitz, Adam) Modified on 2/16/2023 (LH). EDITED NO. OF ACTIONS Modified on 2/21/2023 (LH). EDITED NO. OF ACTIONS CAS 22-1981, 22-1901 & 23-38 PREVIOUSLY CLOSED IN CAS

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: FTX Cryptocurrency Exchange Collapse Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?