IN RE: Tepezza Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Case Number: MDL NO. 3079
Filed: March 22, 2023
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Filing 64 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-1) - 3 action(s) re: pldg. (11 in AZ/2:23-cv-00605, 5 in CAE/2:23-cv-00724, #62 in MDL No. 3079, 6 in OHS/2:23-cv-01705) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/14/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605, CAE/2:23-cv-00724, OHS/2:23-cv-01705 (CT)
June 12, 2023 XYZ CASES ENTERED -- 1 related action(s) originating in the transferee district. JPML notified on 6/12/2023 via NEF. -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:23-cv-03568) (LH)
June 9, 2023 XYZ CASES ENTERED -- 1 related action(s) originating in the transferee district. JPML notified on 6/9/2023 via NEF. -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:23-cv-03639) (LH)
June 6, 2023 Filing 63 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CTO AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (CTO-1) re: pldg. (11 in AZ/2:23-cv-00605, 5 in CAE/2:23-cv-00724, #62 in MDL No. 3079, 6 in OHS/2:23-cv-01705) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Oppositions due on or before 6/13/2023. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/6/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605, CAE/2:23-cv-00724, OHS/2:23-cv-01705 (LH)
June 6, 2023 Filing 62 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY (CTO-1) - 3 action(s) Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/6/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605, CAE/2:23-cv-00724, OHS/2:23-cv-01705 (LH)
June 5, 2023 Filing 61 OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/25/2023 before the Panel at Philadelphia, PA. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cherilyn McCollum, 601 Market Street, Room 2609, Philadelphia, PA 19106, Cherilyn_McCollum@paed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the Panel's office or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Redaction due 6/12/2023. Redaction Request due 6/26/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2023.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/5/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (RH)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TRANSFER ORDER re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) Transferring 4 action(s) to Judge Thomas M. Durkin in the N.D. Illinois.Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 6/2/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (LH)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CONSENT ORDER re: pldg(s). #2 , #1 Consenting to transfer of litigation to Judge Thomas M. Durkin in the Illinois Northern District Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge, USDC Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2023. (LH)
May 24, 2023 Filing 58 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3079), ( #20 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Defendant Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605, CAE/2:23-cv-00724, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, ILN/1:23-cv-02160, ILN/1:23-cv-02503, ILN/1:23-cv-02659, ILN/1:23-cv-02662, ILN/1:23-cv-02703, ILN/1:23-cv-02705, ILN/1:23-cv-02708, ILN/1:23-cv-02714, ILN/1:23-cv-02834, ILN/1:23-cv-02863, ILN/1:23-cv-02931, ILN/1:23-cv-02934, ILN/1:23-cv-02940, ILN/1:23-cv-03031, ILN/1:23-cv-03032, ILN/1:23-cv-03033, ILN/1:23-cv-03113, ILN/1:23-cv-03166, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, OHS/2:23-cv-01705, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Riegner, Eric) Modified on 5/25/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 5/31/2023 (LH). ADDED MDL LINKS
May 24, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Eric A. Riegner, Counsel for: Defendant Horizon Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc. -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:23-cv-02659) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Docket Sheet and Complaint) (Riegner, Eric)
May 24, 2023 Filing 56 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: pldg.( #46 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Plaintiffs Denis Swisher, #et al.Traci Lynn Thompson, William Jett, Joseph Ford, Peter Chryssos, Michiko Tra, Shawna Rene, John Gardner, Roxann Kranstover, Robert Barako, Dennis Beach #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Complaint 1:23-cv-03032 , #3 Complaint 1:23-cv-03033, #4 Complaint 1:23-cv-02703, #5 Complaint 1:23-cv-02705, #6 Complaint 1:23-cv-02662, #7 Complaint 1:23-cv-02708, #8 Complaint 1:23-cv-02834, #9 Complaint 1:23-cv-02863, #10 Complaint 1:23-cv-03031, #11 Complaint 1:23-cv-02934, #12 Complaint 1:23-cv-02931) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:23-cv-02662, ILN/1:23-cv-02703, ILN/1:23-cv-02705, ILN/1:23-cv-02708, ILN/1:23-cv-02834, ILN/1:23-cv-02863, ILN/1:23-cv-02931, ILN/1:23-cv-02934, ILN/1:23-cv-03031, ILN/1:23-cv-03032, ILN/1:23-cv-03033 (Hauer, Stacy) Modified on 5/25/2023 (LH). EDITED ATTACHMENT NAMES
May 24, 2023 Filing 55 RELATED ACTION -- (re: pldg. #49 ) -- 1 Action(s) -- JPML has identified the following action(s) for potential inclusion in the proposed MDL: Illinois Northern District Court (1:23-cv-03166) (Attachments: #1 Complaint ILN 1:23-3166) (LH)
May 24, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE OF MAJOR DEFICIENCY -- (re: pldg. ( #52 in MDL No. 3079, 2 in OHS/2:23-cv-01705), ( #53 in MDL No. 3079, 3 in OHS/2:23-cv-01705) ) The referenced pleadings have been found DEFICIENT. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 5/24/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605, CAE/2:23-cv-00724, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, ILN/1:23-cv-02160, ILN/1:23-cv-02503, ILN/1:23-cv-02662, ILN/1:23-cv-02703, ILN/1:23-cv-02705, ILN/1:23-cv-02708, ILN/1:23-cv-02714, ILN/1:23-cv-02834, ILN/1:23-cv-02863, ILN/1:23-cv-02931, ILN/1:23-cv-02934, ILN/1:23-cv-02940, ILN/1:23-cv-03031, ILN/1:23-cv-03032, ILN/1:23-cv-03033, ILN/1:23-cv-03113, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, OHS/2:23-cv-01705, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (dld)
May 24, 2023 Filing 53 SEE PLDG. 54NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( #19 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Alyson Steele Beridon on behalf of Plaintiff Zdena McMullen (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, OHS/2:23-cv-01705 (Beridon, Alyson) Modified on 5/24/2023 (dld). ADDED NOTATION
May 24, 2023 Filing 52 SEE PLDG. 54INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) ) Filed by Plaintiff Zdena McMullen (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, OHS/2:23-cv-01705 (Beridon, Alyson) Modified on 5/24/2023 (dld). ADDED NOTATION
May 24, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #50 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Alyson Steele Beridon on behalf of Plaintiff Zdena McMullen (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, OHS/2:23-cv-01705 (Beridon, Alyson)
May 23, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Alyson S. Beridon, counsel for: Plaintiff Zdena McMullen -- Ohio Southern District Court (2:23-cv-01705) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Complaint SDOH 2:23-cv-01705) (Beridon, Alyson) Modified on 5/23/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND ADDED PARTY TYPE
May 23, 2023 Filing 49 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- re: pldg(s). ( #2 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) -- Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Exton. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, NYN/6:23-cv-00282 (Bogle, Brandon)
May 23, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #46 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Stacy Kathryn Hauer on behalf of Plaintiffs Denis Swisher, #et al.Traci Lynn Thompson, William Jett, Joseph Ford, Peter Chryssos, Michiko Tra, Shawna Rene, John Gardner, Roxann Kranstover, Robert Barako, Dennis Beach #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Supplement Parties Represented List, #2 Schedule of Actions Short Case Captions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:23-cv-02662, ILN/1:23-cv-02703, ILN/1:23-cv-02705, ILN/1:23-cv-02708, ILN/1:23-cv-02834, ILN/1:23-cv-02863, ILN/1:23-cv-02931, ILN/1:23-cv-02934, ILN/1:23-cv-03031, ILN/1:23-cv-03032, ILN/1:23-cv-03033 (Hauer, Stacy)
May 22, 2023 Filing 47 RELATED ACTION -- (re: pldg. #43 ) -- 1 Action(s) -- JPML has identified the following action(s) for potential inclusion in the proposed MDL: Illinois Northern District Court (1:23-cv-02714) (Attachments: #1 Complaint ILN 1:23-2714) (LH)
May 22, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS -- 11 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Stacy K. Hauer, counsel for: Plaintiffs Robert Barako, Dennis Beach, Peter Chryssos, Joseph Ford, John Gardner, Shawna Rene, Michiko Tra, Roxann Kranstover, Traci Thompson, William Jett, Denis Swisher -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:23-cv-02931,1:23-cv-03032,1:23-cv-03033,1:23-cv-02703,1:23-cv-02705,1:23-cv-02662, 1:23-cv-02708,1:23-cv-02834,1:23-cv-02863,1:23-cv-03031,1:23-cv-02934) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Complaint ILN 1:23-2931, #4 Complaint ILN 1:23-3032, #5 Complaint ILN 1:23-3033, #6 Complaint ILN 1:23-2703, #7 Complaint ILN 1:23-2705, #8 Complaint ILN 1:23-2662, #9 Complaint ILN 1:23-2708, #10 Complaint ILN 1:23-2834, #11 Complaint ILN 1:23-2863, #12 Complaint ILN 1:23-3031, #13 Complaint ILN 1:23-2934) (Hauer, Stacy) Modified on 5/31/2023 (LH). ADDED PARTY TYPE Modified on 6/7/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME
May 22, 2023 Filing 45 ERRATA - to (1 in ILN/1:23-cv-02940, 1 in ILN/1:23-cv-03113, #42 in MDL No. 3079) - Filed by Plaintiffs Susan Guevara, Marsha Jaffe (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:23-cv-02940, ILN/1:23-cv-03113 (Sletvold, Ashlie)
May 22, 2023 Filing 44 ERRATA - to ( #41 in MDL No. 3079) - Filed by Plaintiffs Susan Guevara, Marsha Jaffe (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:23-cv-02940, ILN/1:23-cv-03113 (Sletvold, Ashlie)
May 18, 2023 Filing 43 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Susan Guevara, Marsha Jaffe (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:23-cv-02940, ILN/1:23-cv-03113 (Sletvold, Ashlie) Modified on 5/19/2023 (LH). ADDED MDL LINK
May 18, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #41 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Ashlie Case Sletvold on behalf of Plaintiffs Susan Guevara, Marsha Jaffe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Represented Parties, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:23-cv-02940, ILN/1:23-cv-03113 (Sletvold, Ashlie)
May 18, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 2 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Ashlie Case Sletvold, counsel for: Plaintiffs Marsha Jaffe and Susan Guevara -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:23-cv-02940,1:23-cv-03113) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Complaint ILN 1:23-cv-02940, #4 Exhibit Complaint ILN 1:23-cv-03113) (Sletvold, Ashlie) Modified on 5/19/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND ADDED PARTY TYPE
May 8, 2023 Filing 40 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) ) Filed by Plaintiff Amarilis Polanco (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:23-cv-02503 (Abramowitz, Mark)
May 1, 2023 Filing 39 ERRATA - to (6 in AZ/2:23-cv-00605, #33 in MDL No. 3079), ( #24 in MDL No. 3079) - Filed by Plaintiff Donna Baldwin (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Complaint AZD 2:23-cv-605) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605 (Miracle, Trent)
May 1, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( #19 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Mark Abramowitz on behalf of Plaintiff Amarilis Polanco (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:23-cv-02503 (Abramowitz, Mark)
April 27, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (11 in ILN/1:22-cv-06562, 11 in ILN/1:23-cv-00896, #19 in MDL No. 3079, 11 in WAW/3:23-cv-05221) Filed by Ashlie Case Sletvold on behalf of Plaintiffs Gloria Pledger, #et al.Geri Kanesta-Rychner, Norma Perez Diaz, Deborah Welch Klostermann #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Represented Parties, #2 Supplement List of Case Captions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, ILN/1:23-cv-02160, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Sletvold, Ashlie)
April 27, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (9 in GAM/4:23-cv-00055, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-04518, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-05005, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-06375, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-06718, 10 in ILN/1:22-cv-06747, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-06836, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-06837, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-06838, 9 in ILN/1:23-cv-00069, 9 in ILN/1:23-cv-00803, 9 in ILN/1:23-cv-00805, #19 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Timothy J. Becker on behalf of Plaintiffs Lenda Krone, #et al.Karen Scott, John Ingram, John Fisher, Andrea Leeds, Lisa Christian Nethery, Kimberly Perez, Daniel Weibel, Cynthia Williams, Rachel Snyder, ANGELA SIMPSON, Donna Walker #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Supplement Parties Represented List, #2 Schedule of Actions Short Case Captions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805 (Becker, Timothy)
April 27, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.(8 in ILN/1:22-cv-06718), ( #24 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079), ( #32 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Trent B Miracle on behalf of Plaintiffs Donna Baldwin, #et al.Kimberly Perez, Karen Lucci, Margaret Lukowski #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Other Parties Represented, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-07351 (Miracle, Trent) Modified on 4/28/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND ADDED MDL LINK
April 26, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #27 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Mark Abramowitz on behalf of Plaintiff Amarilis Polanco (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:23-cv-02503 (Abramowitz, Mark)
April 26, 2023 Filing 33 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #39 in MDL No. 3079) ERRATA - to ( #24 in MDL No. 3079) - Filed by Plaintiff Donna Baldwin (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Complaint AZD 2:23-cv-605) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605 (Miracle, Trent) Modified on 5/2/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
April 25, 2023 Filing 32 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #35 in MDL No. 3079)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) - (1 in AZ/2:23-cv-00605, 9 in CAN/5:23-cv-01159, 12 in ILN/1:22-cv-06718, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-07351, #25 in MDL No. 3079) - Filed by Plaintiffs Donna Baldwin, #et al.Kimberly Perez, Karen Lucci, Margaret Lukowski #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Other List of Parties, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-07351 (Miracle, Trent) Modified on 4/26/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME Modified on 4/28/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
April 25, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( #19 in MDL No. 3079, 9 in NYN/6:23-cv-00282) Filed by Brandon Bogle on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Exton (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, NYN/6:23-cv-00282 (Bogle, Brandon)
April 24, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (7 in CAN/5:23-cv-01159, 9 in GAM/4:23-cv-00055, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-04518, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-05005, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-06375, 11 in ILN/1:22-cv-06562, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-06718, 10 in ILN/1:22-cv-06747, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-06836, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-06837, 9 in ILN/1:22-cv-06838, 7 in ILN/1:22-cv-07351, 9 in ILN/1:23-cv-00069, 9 in ILN/1:23-cv-00803, 9 in ILN/1:23-cv-00805, 11 in ILN/1:23-cv-00896, #19 in MDL No. 3079, 9 in NYN/6:23-cv-00282, 11 in WAW/3:23-cv-05221) Filed by Eric A. Riegner on behalf of Defendant Horizon Therapeutics USA Inc, (Attachments: #1 List of Cases, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605, CAE/2:23-cv-00724, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, ILN/1:23-cv-02160, ILN/1:23-cv-02503, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Riegner, Eric) Modified on 4/27/2023 (RH). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES NAMES
April 24, 2023 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING BRIEFING re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) Briefing in this matter is now closed. The parties to actions on the motion(s) remain under a duty, pursuant to Panel Rules 6.1(f) and 6.2(d), to notify the Clerk of the Panel promptly of potential tag-along actions, as well as any development that moots the motion or fully disposes of any action on the motion. Parties in any potential tag-along action may file an Interested Party response, but must do so promptly, and in any event, no later than the Thursday prior to the hearing session at which the motion for transfer is to be heard by the Panel.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 4/24/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605, CAE/2:23-cv-00724, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, ILN/1:23-cv-02160, ILN/1:23-cv-02503, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (LH)
April 24, 2023 Filing 28 RELATED ACTION -- (re: pldg. #26 ) -- 1 Action(s) -- JPML has identified the following action(s) for potential inclusion in the proposed MDL: California Eastern District Court (2:23-cv-00724) (Attachments: #1 Complaint CAE 2:23-724) (LH)
April 21, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Mark Abramowitz, counsel for: Plaintiff Amarilis Polanco -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:23-cv-02503) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit ILN 1:23-2503) (Abramowitz, Mark) Modified on 4/24/2023 (LH). ADDED PARTY TYPE AND EDITED ATTACHMENT NAME
April 21, 2023 Filing 26 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. (8 in CAN/5:23-cv-01159, 10 in GAM/4:23-cv-00055, 10 in ILN/1:22-cv-04518, 10 in ILN/1:22-cv-05005, 10 in ILN/1:22-cv-06375, 12 in ILN/1:22-cv-06562, 10 in ILN/1:22-cv-06718, 11 in ILN/1:22-cv-06747, 10 in ILN/1:22-cv-06836, 10 in ILN/1:22-cv-06837, 10 in ILN/1:22-cv-06838, 8 in ILN/1:22-cv-07351, 10 in ILN/1:23-cv-00069, 10 in ILN/1:23-cv-00803, 10 in ILN/1:23-cv-00805, 12 in ILN/1:23-cv-00896, 5 in ILN/1:23-cv-02160, #20 in MDL No. 3079, 10 in NYN/6:23-cv-00282, 12 in WAW/3:23-cv-05221), ( #2 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079), ( #15 in MDL No. 3079), ( #16 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Exton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, ILN/1:23-cv-02160, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Bogle, Brandon) Modified on 4/24/2023 (LH). ADDED MDL LINKS
April 20, 2023 Filing 25 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #35 in MDL No. 3079)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.(8 in CAN/5:23-cv-01159, 8 in ILN/1:22-cv-07351), (8 in ILN/1:22-cv-06718), ( #24 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Trent B Miracle on behalf of Plaintiffs Donna Baldwin, #et al.Kimberly Perez, Karen Lucci, Margaret Lukowski #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Other Parties Represented, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, AZ/2:23-cv-00605, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-07351 (Miracle, Trent) Modified on 4/28/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
April 20, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Trent Miracle, Counsel for: Plaintiff Donna Baldwin -- Arizona District Court (2:23-cv-00605) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Complaint AZD 2:23-cv-605) (Miracle, Trent) Modified on 4/21/2023 (LH). ADDED FILING PARTY AND CORRECTED CASE NO.
April 18, 2023 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics Finance SARL, Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics Capital, Ltd., Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics PLC for Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:23-cv-02160 (Riegner, Eric)
April 18, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #13 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Eric A. Riegner on behalf of Defendant Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:23-cv-02160 (Riegner, Eric)
April 14, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3079), ( #10 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Timothy J. Becker on behalf of Plaintiffs Lenda Krone, #et al.Karen Scott, John Ingram, John Fisher, Andrea Leeds, Lisa Christian Nethery, Kimberly Perez, Daniel Weibel, Cynthia Williams, Rachel Snyder, ANGELA SIMPSON, Donna Walker #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parties Represented List, #2 Schedule of Actions Short Case Captions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805 (Becker, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND ADDED MDL LINK
April 14, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) ) Filed by Defendant Horizon Therapeutics USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Horizons Objection and Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Relate and Reassign Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - FDA-Approved labeling for TEPEZZA, #3 Exhibit 3 - FDA Transcript Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 4 - Table of Plaintiffs' Treatment Dates, #5 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, ILN/1:23-cv-02160, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Riegner, Eric) Modified on 4/17/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 HEARING ORDER re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 5/25/2023 in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania. Notices of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument due on or before 5/1/2023.#Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument form (JPML form 9) can be downloaded from our website.Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 4/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Courthouse Advisory) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (RH)
April 13, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.(8 in ILN/1:22-cv-06562, 8 in ILN/1:23-cv-00896, 2 in ILN/1:23-cv-02160, #16 in MDL No. 3079, 8 in WAW/3:23-cv-05221), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) , ( #14 in MDL No. 3079), ( #17 in MDL No. 30479) Filed by Ashlie Case Sletvold on behalf of Plaintiffs Gloria Pledger, #et al.Geri Kanesta-Rychner, Norma Perez Diaz, Deborah Welch Klostermann #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit list of represented parties, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, ILN/1:23-cv-02160, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Sletvold, Ashlie) Modified on 4/13/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME AND ADDED MDL LINKS
April 12, 2023 Filing 17 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #18 in MDL No. 3079)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.(8 in ILN/1:22-cv-06562, 8 in ILN/1:23-cv-00896, 2 in ILN/1:23-cv-02160, #16 in MDL No. 3079, 8 in WAW/3:23-cv-05221) Filed by Ashlie Case Sletvold on behalf of Plaintiffs Gloria Pledger, #et al.Geri Kanesta-Rychner, Norma Perez Diaz, Deborah Welch Klostermann #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of represented parties, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, ILN/1:23-cv-02160, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Sletvold, Ashlie) Modified on 4/13/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
April 12, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT WITH INTERESTED PARTIES -- (re: pldg. ( #2 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Gloria Pledger, #et al.Geri Kanesta-Rychner, Norma Perez Diaz, Deborah Welch Klostermann #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Klostermann Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of Motion to Relate and Reassign Cases, #3 Exhibit Perez Diazs Joinder in Motion to Relate and Reassign Cases, #4 Exhibit Horizon Therapeutics Form 10-K, p. 75, #5 Exhibit Horizon Opposition to coordination, #6 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, ILN/1:23-cv-02160, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Sletvold, Ashlie) Modified on 4/12/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME
April 11, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Plaintiffs Lenda Krone, Karen Scott, John Ingram, John Fisher, Andrea Leeds, Lisa Christian Nethery, Kimberly Perez, Daniel Weibel, Cynthia Williams, Rachel Snyder, ANGELA SIMPSON, Donna Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805 (Becker, Timothy) Modified on 4/12/2023 (LH). ADDED ADDITIONAL PARTY NAMES AND MDL LINK
April 7, 2023 Filing 14 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #18 in MDL No. 3079)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #13 in MDL No. 3079), ( #2 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Ashlie Case Sletvold on behalf of Plaintiffs Gloria Pledger, #et al.Geri Kanesta-Rychner, Norma Perez Diaz, Deborah Welch Klostermann #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Represented parties, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, ILN/1:23-cv-02160, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Sletvold, Ashlie) Modified on 4/13/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
April 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Ashlie Case Sletvold, Counsel for: Plaintiff Deborah Welch Klostermann -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:23-cv-02160) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Complaint NDIL 1:23-cv-02160) (Sletvold, Ashlie) Modified on 4/7/2023 (LH). EDITED CASE NO.
April 6, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) - re: pldg. (4 in CAN/5:23-cv-01159, 4 in GAM/4:23-cv-00055, 4 in ILN/1:22-cv-04518, 4 in ILN/1:22-cv-05005, 4 in ILN/1:22-cv-06375, 4 in ILN/1:22-cv-06562, 4 in ILN/1:22-cv-06718, 5 in ILN/1:22-cv-06747, 4 in ILN/1:22-cv-06836, 4 in ILN/1:22-cv-06837, 4 in ILN/1:22-cv-06838, 4 in ILN/1:22-cv-07351, 4 in ILN/1:23-cv-00069, 4 in ILN/1:23-cv-00803, 4 in ILN/1:23-cv-00805, 4 in ILN/1:23-cv-00896, #9 in MDL No. 3079, 6 in NYN/6:23-cv-00282, 4 in WAW/3:23-cv-05221) Identifying Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics Finance SARL, Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics Capital, Ltd., Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics PLC for Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Riegner, Eric) Modified on 4/6/2023 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
April 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3079), ( #8 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Eric A. Riegner on behalf of Defendant Horizon Therapeutics USA (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Riegner, Eric) Modified on 4/6/2023 (LH). EDITED EVENT NAME, ADDED MDL LINK AND REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
April 5, 2023 Filing 10 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #21 in MDL No. 3079)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #2 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Timothy J. Becker on behalf of Plaintiffs Lenda Krone, #et al.Karen Scott, John Ingram, John Fisher, Andrea Leeds, Lisa Christian Nethery, Kimberly Perez, Daniel Weibel, Cynthia Williams, Rachel Snyder, ANGELA SIMPSON, Donna Walker #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parties Represented List, #2 Schedule of Actions Short Case Captions) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805 (Becker, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
April 3, 2023 Filing 9 SEE PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #12 in MDL No. 3079)) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics Finance SARL, Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics Capital, Ltd., Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics PLC for HORIZON THERAPEUTICS USA INC, Horizon Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Horizon Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Horizon Therapeutics USA Inc, Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Riegner, Eric) Modified on 4/6/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
April 3, 2023 Filing 8 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING (re: pldg. ( #11 in MDL No. 3079)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Eric A. Riegner on behalf of Defendants Horizon Therapeutics USA Inc, #et al.Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Liaison Counsel for Defendants, Horizon Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., HORIZON THERAPEUTICS USA INC, Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (Riegner, Eric) Modified on 4/6/2023 (LH). ADDED NOTATION
March 31, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. ( #5 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Exton -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, NYN/6:23-cv-00282 (Bogle, Brandon)
March 31, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Mark Abramowitz on behalf of Plaintiff Rachel Snyder (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, ILN/1:22-cv-06747 (Abramowitz, Mark)
March 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #2 in MDL No. 3079), ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) Filed by Brandon Bogle on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Exton Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, NYN/6:23-cv-00282 (Bogle, Brandon)
March 24, 2023 Filing 4 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3079) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 4/7/2023. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 4/7/2023. Responses due on or before 4/14/2023. Reply, if any, due on or before 4/21/2023. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 3/24/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3079, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (SM)
March 24, 2023 Filing 3 MDL Number 3079 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending No. 11) Associated Cases: Pending No. 11, CAN/5:23-cv-01159, GAM/4:23-cv-00055, ILN/1:22-cv-04518, ILN/1:22-cv-05005, ILN/1:22-cv-06375, ILN/1:22-cv-06562, ILN/1:22-cv-06718, ILN/1:22-cv-06747, ILN/1:22-cv-06836, ILN/1:22-cv-06837, ILN/1:22-cv-06838, ILN/1:22-cv-07351, ILN/1:23-cv-00069, ILN/1:23-cv-00803, ILN/1:23-cv-00805, ILN/1:23-cv-00896, NYN/6:23-cv-00282, WAW/3:23-cv-05221 (SM)
March 23, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION TO TRANSFER (CORRECTED) -- (re: pldg. #1 ) Correcting the following items: Signature block, Schedule of Actions, Proof of service, -- Filed by: Plaintiff Kimberly Exton (Attachments: #1 Brief Corrected signature page, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Oral Argument Statement Corrected signature page, #4 Proof of Service)(Bogle, Brandon)
March 22, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION TO TRANSFER (INITIAL MOTION) with Brief in Support. -- 18 Action(s) -- from Illinois Northern District Court (1:22-cv-04518,1:22-cv-05005,1:22-cv-06375,1:22-cv-06562,1:22-cv-06718,1:22-cv-06747, 1:22-cv-06836,1:22-cv-06837,1:22-cv-06838,1:22-cv-07351,1:23-cv-00069,1:23-cv-00803, 1:23-cv-00805,1:23-cv-00896), California Northern District Court (5:23-cv-01159), New York Northern District Court (6:23-cv-00282), Washington Western District Court (3:23-cv-05221), Georgia Middle District Court (4:23-cv-00055) - Suggested Transferee Court: N.D. California - Filed by: Plaintiff Kimberly Exton (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Oral Argument Statement, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit A-1 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:22-04518), #6 Exhibit A-2 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:22-05005), #7 Exhibit A-3 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:22-06375), #8 Exhibit A-4 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:22-06562), #9 Exhibit A-5 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:22-06718), #10 Exhibit A-6 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:22-06747), #11 Exhibit A-7 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:22-06836), #12 Exhibit A-8 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:22-06837), #13 Exhibit A-9 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:22-06838), #14 Exhibit A-10 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:22-07351), #15 Exhibit A-11 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:23-00069), #16 Exhibit A-12 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:23-00803), #17 Exhibit A-13 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:23-00805), #18 Exhibit A-14 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDIL 1:23-00896), #19 Exhibit A-15 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDCA 5:23-01159), #20 Exhibit A-16 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - NDNY 6:23-00282), #21 Exhibit A-17 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - WDWA 3:23-05221), #22 Exhibit A-18 (Docket Sheet, Complaint - MDGA 4:23-00055))(Bogle, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: Tepezza Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?