IN RE: Suboxone (Buprenorphine/Naloxone) Film Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Case Number: MDL NO. 3092
Filed: November 14, 2023
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 45 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Ashlie Case Sletvold, Counsel for Plaintiff Christa Luhman -- Maryland District Court (1:24-cv-00027) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Complaint) (Sletvold, Ashlie) ADDED PARTY TYPE. Modified on 1/10/2024 (CT).
January 2, 2024 Filing 44 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (31 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 31 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 34 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 32 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #41 in MDL No. 3092, 31 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 31 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148) Filed by Randall L. Christian on behalf of Defendants AQUESTIVE THERAPEUTICS INC, #et al.INDIVIOR INC, INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS INC, RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD, RECKITT BENCKISER LLC #[Suppress List] Parties will WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT IF ALL OTHER PARTIES IN THIS MATTER WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT; otherwise the designated attorney shall present oral argument at the Panel hearing session. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (No. 2 Continued), #2 Exhibit B (List of Parties Represented), #3 Exhibit C (Schedule of Actions), #4 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/1:23-cv-02425, OHN/3:23-cv-02148, OHN/4:23-cv-02431 (Christian, Randall)
January 2, 2024 Filing 43 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( #41 in MDL No. 3092, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 33 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026) Filed by Ashlie Case Sletvold on behalf of Plaintiffs Ashley Fitzsimmons, #et al.Keith King, Teresita Badalamenti, Christian Miller, David Sorensen, Jeremy Schie, Thomas Goldner, Santo Pietro, Steve Badalamenti, Haleigh Graham #[Suppress List] Parties will WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT IF ALL OTHER PARTIES IN THIS MATTER WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT; otherwise the designated attorney shall present oral argument at the Panel hearing session. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parties Represented and Short Case Captions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02425, OHN/4:23-cv-02431 (Sletvold, Ashlie)
January 2, 2024 Filing 42 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 2 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Ashlie Case Sletvold, Counsel for Plaintiffs Ashley Fitzsimmons and Thomas Goldner -- Ohio Northern District Court (1:23-cv-02425,4:23-cv-02431) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit A (Complaint - OHN 1:23-02425, #4 Exhibit B (Complaint - OHN 4:23-02431) (Sletvold, Ashlie)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 HEARING ORDER re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 1/25/2024 in Santa Barbara, California. Notices of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument due on or before 1/2/2024.#Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument form (JPML form 9) can be downloaded from our website.Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 12/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Courthouse Advisory) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (RH)
December 14, 2023 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING BRIEFING re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) Briefing in this matter is now closed. The parties to actions on the motion(s) remain under a duty, pursuant to Panel Rules 6.1(f) and 6.2(d), to notify the Clerk of the Panel promptly of potential tag-along actions, as well as any development that moots the motion or fully disposes of any action on the motion. Parties in any potential tag-along action may file an Interested Party response, but must do so promptly, and in any event, no later than the Thursday prior to the hearing session at which the motion for transfer is to be heard by the Panel.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 12/14/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (CT)
December 13, 2023 Filing 39 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092, #31 in MDL No. 3092), ( #33 in MDL No. 3092) Filed by Plaintiffs Keith King, #et al.Teresita Badalamenti, Christian Miller, David Sorensen, Jeremy Schie, Santo Pietro, Steve Badalamenti, Haleigh Graham #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Oral Argument Statement Amended, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026 (Sletvold, Ashlie) ADDED MDL LINK. Modified on 12/13/2023 (CT).
December 12, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.( #13 in MDL No. 3092, #1 in MDL No. 3092) Filed by Timothy J. Becker on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Anderson (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, ILN/1:23-cv-15323 (Becker, Timothy) EDITED EVENT TYPE. Modified on 12/13/2023 (CT). ADDED MDL LINK. Modified on 12/18/2023 (CT).
December 6, 2023 Filing 37 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) ) Filed by Plaintiff Ronald Anderson (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, ILN/1:23-cv-15323 (Becker, Timothy)
December 6, 2023 Filing 36 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: pldg.(27 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 27 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 28 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 28 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #33 in MDL No. 3092, 27 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 28 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 28 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 28 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 28 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 28 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 28 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 28 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 28 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 28 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 18 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260, 27 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148), (28 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 28 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 29 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 29 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #34 in MDL No. 3092, 28 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 29 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 29 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 29 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 29 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 29 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 29 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 29 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 29 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 29 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 19 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260, 28 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148), (26 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 26 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 27 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 27 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #32 in MDL No. 3092, 26 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 27 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 27 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 27 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 27 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 27 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 27 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 27 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 27 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 27 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 17 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260, 26 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148), (25 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 25 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 26 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 26 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #31 in MDL No. 3092, 25 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 26 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 26 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 26 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 26 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 26 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 26 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 26 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 26 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 26 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 16 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260, 25 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148) Filed by Defendants Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., #et al.INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS, INC., Indivior Inc., RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD., RECKITT BENCKISER LLC #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 6, 2023 Filing 35 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) ) Filed by Plaintiff Stefanie Zubal (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, OHN/1:23-cv-02081 (Beridon, Alyson)
December 6, 2023 Filing 34 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092), (18 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260) Filed by Defendants RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD., RECKITT BENCKISER LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 6, 2023 Filing 33 RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) ) Filed by Defendants RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD., RECKITT BENCKISER LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 6, 2023 Filing 32 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092), (16 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260) Filed by Defendants Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., #et al.INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS, INC., Indivior Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 6, 2023 Filing 31 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) ) Filed by Defendants Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., #et al.INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS, INC., Indivior Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 4, 2023 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (17 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 17 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 18 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 18 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #23 in MDL No. 3092, 17 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 18 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 18 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 18 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 18 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 18 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 18 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 18 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 18 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 18 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 8 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260, 17 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148) Filed by Defendant RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 4, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (16 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 16 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 17 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 17 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #22 in MDL No. 3092, 16 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 17 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 17 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 17 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 17 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 17 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 17 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 17 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 17 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 17 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 7 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260, 16 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148) Filed by Defendant RECKITT BENCKISER LLC -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 4, 2023 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (15 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 15 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 16 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 16 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #21 in MDL No. 3092, 15 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 16 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 16 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 16 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 16 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 16 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 16 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 16 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 16 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 16 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 6 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260, 15 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148) Filed by Defendant Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 4, 2023 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (14 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 14 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 15 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 15 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #20 in MDL No. 3092, 14 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 15 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 15 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 15 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 15 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 15 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 15 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 15 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 15 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 15 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 5 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260, 14 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148) Filed by Defendant INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS, INC. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 4, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (13 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 13 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 14 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 14 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #19 in MDL No. 3092, 13 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 14 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 14 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 14 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 14 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 14 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 14 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 14 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 14 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 14 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 4 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260, 13 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148) Filed by Defendant INDIVIOR PLC -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 4, 2023 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (12 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 12 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 13 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 13 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #18 in MDL No. 3092, 12 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 13 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 13 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 13 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 13 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 13 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 13 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 13 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 13 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 13 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 3 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260, 12 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148) Filed by Defendant Indivior Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 4, 2023 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (11 in GAM/5:23-cv-00425, 11 in ILN/1:23-cv-15300, 12 in ILN/1:23-cv-15323, 12 in ILS/3:23-cv-03483, #17 in MDL No. 3092, 11 in ND/3:23-cv-00220, 12 in OHN/1:23-cv-01855, 12 in OHN/1:23-cv-01865, 12 in OHN/1:23-cv-01876, 12 in OHN/1:23-cv-01924, 12 in OHN/1:23-cv-02021, 12 in OHN/1:23-cv-02022, 12 in OHN/1:23-cv-02024, 12 in OHN/1:23-cv-02026, 12 in OHN/1:23-cv-02081, 2 in OHN/1:23-cv-02260, 11 in OHN/3:23-cv-02148) Filed by Defendants INDIVIOR PLC, #et al.INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS, INC., Indivior Inc., RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD., RECKITT BENCKISER LLC #[Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
December 1, 2023 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #11 in MDL No. 3092, #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser Group plc, Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser (Health) Holdings Limited for RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Corporate Affiliation, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED MDL LINK. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
December 1, 2023 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #12 in MDL No. 3092, #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser Group plc, Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser USA (2013) LLC for RECKITT BENCKISER LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Corporate Affiliation, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED MDL LINK. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
December 1, 2023 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #10 in MDL No. 3092, #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED MDL LINK. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
December 1, 2023 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #9 in MDL No. 3092, #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Indivior Inc., Corporate Parent Indivior PLC, Corporate Parent Indivior Finance LLC, Corporate Parent Indivior US Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent RBP Global Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Indivior Global Holdings Limited for INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Corporate Affiliation, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED MDL LINK. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
December 1, 2023 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8 in MDL No. 3092, #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for INDIVIOR PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Corporate Affiliation, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED MDL LINK. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
December 1, 2023 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #7 in MDL No. 3092, #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Indivior PLC, Corporate Parent Indivior Finance LLC, Corporate Parent Indivior US Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent RBP Global Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Indivior Global Holdings Limited for Indivior Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Corporate Affiliation, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED MDL LINK. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
December 1, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.( #6 in MDL No. 3092, #1 in MDL No. 3092) Filed by Randall L. Christian on behalf of Defendants Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., #et al.INDIVIOR PLC, INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS, INC., Indivior Inc., RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD., RECKITT BENCKISER LLC #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Parties Represented, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Cases, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) EDITED EVENT TYPE. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT). ADDED MDL LINK. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
December 1, 2023 Filing 16 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: pldg.( #15 in MDL No. 3092) Filed by Defendant Indivior Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/1:23-cv-02260, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall)
November 30, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Randall L. Christian, Counsel for Defendant Indivior Inc. -- Ohio Northern District Court (1:23-cv-02260) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint - OHND 1:23-2260), #2 Proof of Service) (Christian, Randall)
November 29, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3092) Filed by Trent B Miracle on behalf of Plaintiff Kelsie Johnson (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Schedule of Actions) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, ILS/3:23-cv-03483 (Miracle, Trent)
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING NO. 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3092) Filed by Timothy J. Becker on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Anderson (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, ILN/1:23-cv-15323 (Becker, Timothy) ADDED NOTATION. Modified on 12/13/2023 (CT).
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING NO. 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser USA (2013) LLC, Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser Group plc for RECKITT BENCKISER LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Corporate Affiliation, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED NOTATION. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING NO. 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser Group plc, Corporate Parent Reckitt Benckiser (Health) Holdings Limited for RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Corporate Affiliation, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED NOTATION. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING NO. 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED NOTATION. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING NO. 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Indivior Inc., Corporate Parent Indivior PLC, Corporate Parent Indivior Finance LLC, Corporate Parent Indivior US Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent RBP Global Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Indivior Global Holdings Limited for INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Corporate Affiliation, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED NOTATION. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING NO. 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for INDIVIOR PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Corporate Affiliation, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED NOTATION. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING NO. 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Indivior PLC, Corporate Parent Indivior US Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent RBP Global Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Indivior Global Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Indivior Finance LLC for Indivior Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Corporate Affiliation, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED NOTATION. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING NO. 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3092) Filed by Randall L. Christian on behalf of Defendants Aquestive Therapeutics, Inc., #et al.INDIVIOR PLC, INDIVIOR SOLUTIONS, INC., Indivior Inc., RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LTD., RECKITT BENCKISER LLC #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Parties Represented, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Cases, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (Christian, Randall) ADDED NOTATION. Modified on 12/4/2023 (CT).
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3092) Filed by Alyson Steele Beridon on behalf of Plaintiff Stefanie Zubal (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, OHN/1:23-cv-02081 (Beridon, Alyson)
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3092) Filed by Ashlie Case Sletvold on behalf of Plaintiffs Keith King, #et al.Teresita Badalamenti, Christian Miller, David Sorensen, Jeremy Schie, Santo Pietro, Steve Badalamenti, Haleigh Graham #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026 (Sletvold, Ashlie)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3092) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 11/29/2023. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 11/29/2023. Responses due on or before 12/6/2023. Reply, if any, due on or before 12/13/2023. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Attorneys must be registered to file in the JPML. Please visit our website for #Registration Information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 11/15/2023. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3092, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (SM)
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 MDL Number 3092 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending No. 35) Associated Cases: Pending No. 35, GAM/5:23-cv-00425, ILN/1:23-cv-15300, ILN/1:23-cv-15323, ILS/3:23-cv-03483, ND/3:23-cv-00220, OHN/1:23-cv-01855, OHN/1:23-cv-01865, OHN/1:23-cv-01876, OHN/1:23-cv-01924, OHN/1:23-cv-02021, OHN/1:23-cv-02022, OHN/1:23-cv-02024, OHN/1:23-cv-02026, OHN/1:23-cv-02081, OHN/3:23-cv-02148 (SM)
November 14, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION TO TRANSFER (INITIAL MOTION) with Brief in Support. -- 15 Action(s) -- from Georgia Middle District Court (5:23-cv-00425), Illinois Northern District Court (1:23-cv-15300,1:23-cv-15323), Illinois Southern District Court (3:23-cv-03483), North Dakota District Court (3:23-cv-00220), Ohio Northern District Court (1:23-cv-01855,1:23-cv-01865,1:23-cv-01876,1:23-cv-01924,1:23-cv-02021,1:23-cv-02022, 1:23-cv-02024,1:23-cv-02026,1:23-cv-02081,3:23-cv-02148) Suggested Transferee Court: N.D. Ohio Filed by: Plaintiffs Jeremy Schie, David Sorensen, Haleigh Graham, Teresita Badalamenti, Keith King, Santo Pietro, Steve Badalamenti, and Christian Miller (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Transfer, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Oral Argument Statement Requesting Oral Argument in Support of Motion for Transfer, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit A-1 Complaint MDGA 5:23-00425, #6 Exhibit A-2 Complaint NDIL 1:23-15300, #7 Exhibit A-3 Complaint NDIL 1:23-15323, #8 Exhibit A-4 Complaint SDIL 3:23-03483, #9 Exhibit A-5 Complaint DND 3:23-00220, #10 Exhibit A-6 Complaint NDOH 1:23-01855, #11 Exhibit A-7 Complaint NDOH 1:23-01865, #12 Exhibit A-8 Complaint NDOH 1:23-01876, #13 Exhibit A-9 Complaint NDOH 1:23-01924, #14 Exhibit A-10 Complaint NDOH 1:23-02021, #15 Exhibit A-11 Complaint NDOH 1:23-02022, #16 Exhibit A-12 Complaint NDOH 1:23-02024, #17 Exhibit A-13 Complaint NDOH 1:23-02026, #18 Exhibit A-14 Complaint NDOH 1:23-02081, #19 Exhibit A-15 Complaint NDOH 3:23-02148)(Sletvold, Ashlie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: Suboxone (Buprenorphine/Naloxone) Film Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?