IN RE: Lawrence L. Crawford Litigation
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Case Number: MDL NO. 3116
Filed: April 10, 2024
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2024 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING BRIEFING re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3116) Briefing in this matter is now closed. The parties to actions on the motion(s) remain under a duty, pursuant to Panel Rules 6.1(f) and 6.2(d), to notify the Clerk of the Panel promptly of potential tag-along actions, as well as any development that moots the motion or fully disposes of any action on the motion. Parties in any potential tag-along action may file an Interested Party response, but must do so promptly, and in any event, no later than the Thursday prior to the hearing session at which the motion for transfer is to be heard by the Panel.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 5/20/2024. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424, KYW/3:24-cv-00246, OHS/2:23-cv-02962, PAE/2:24-cv-00659, TXN/4:23-cv-00278 (TF)
May 20, 2024 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- re: pldg(s). ( #1 in MDL No. 3116) -- Filed by Pro Se Plaintiff Lawrence Crawford. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424, KYW/3:24-cv-00246, OHS/2:23-cv-02962, PAE/2:24-cv-00659, TXN/4:23-cv-00278 (TF)
May 6, 2024 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- re: pldg(s). ( #1 in MDL No. 3116) -- Filed by Pro Se Plaintiff Lawrence Crawford. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424, KYW/3:24-cv-00246, OHS/2:23-cv-02962, PAE/2:24-cv-00659, TXN/4:23-cv-00278 (TF)
May 6, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3116) - Filed by Pro Se Plaintiff Lawrence L. Crawford Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424, KYW/3:24-cv-00246, OHS/2:23-cv-02962, PAE/2:24-cv-00659, TXN/4:23-cv-00278 (DLD)
May 3, 2024 Filing 12 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3116) ) Filed by Plaintiff American Alliance for Equal Rights and Defendants Fearless Foundation, Inc., Fearless Fund II, GP, LLC, Fearless Fund II, LP, Fearless Fund Management, LLC Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424 (Norris, Cameron) Modified on 5/6/2024 (TF). MODIFIED EVENT TYPE. ADDED PARTIES.
April 30, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3116) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for American Alliance for Equal Rights. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424 (Norris, Cameron)
April 30, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3116) Filed by Cameron Thomas Norris on behalf of Plaintiff American Alliance for Equal Rights Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424 (Norris, Cameron)
April 26, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3116) -- Identifying Non-Party/Financial Interest General Mills, Inc., Non-Party/Financial Interest Costco Wholesale Corporation, Non-Party/Financial Interest Mastercard Incorporated, Non-Party/Financial Interest Bank of America Corporation Inc. for Fearless Fund II, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424 (Denerstein, Mylan)
April 26, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3116) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Fearless Fund Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424 (Denerstein, Mylan)
April 26, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3116) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Fearless Fund II, GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424 (Denerstein, Mylan)
April 26, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3116) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Fearless Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424 (Denerstein, Mylan)
April 26, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3116) Filed by Mylan L. Denerstein on behalf of Defendants Fearless Foundation, Inc., #et al.Fearless Fund II, GP, LLC, Fearless Fund II, LP, Fearless Fund Management, LLC #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424 (Denerstein, Mylan)
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by Pro Se Plaintiff Lawrence L. Crawford -- Kentucky Western District Court (3:24-cv-00246) (Attachments: #1 Complaint KYW 3:24-246) (TF)
April 12, 2024 Filing 3 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3116) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 4/26/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 4/26/2024. Responses due on or before 5/3/2024. Reply, if any, due on or before 5/10/2024. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Attorneys must be registered to file in the JPML. Please visit our website for #Registration Information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 4/12/2024. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3116, GAN/1:23-cv-03424, OHS/2:23-cv-02962, PAE/2:24-cv-00659, TXN/4:23-cv-00278 (TF)
April 12, 2024 Filing 2 MDL Number 3116 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending No. 38) Associated Cases: Pending No. 38, GAN/1:23-cv-03424, KYW/3:24-cv-00028, OHS/2:23-cv-02962, PAE/2:24-cv-00659, TXN/4:23-cv-00278 (TF)
April 10, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION TO TRANSFER (INITIAL MOTION) with Brief in Support. -- 5 Action(s) -- from Georgia Northern District Court (1:23-cv-03424), Kentucky Western District Court (3:24-cv-00028), Ohio Southern District Court (2:23-cv-02962), Pennsylvania Eastern District Court (2:24-cv-00659), Texas Northern District Court (4:23-cv-00278) Suggested Transferee Court: D. New Jersey Filed by: Pro Se Plaintiff Lawrence L. Crawford (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit - Letter, #3 Schedule of Actions, #4 Complaint GAN/1:23-3424, #5 Complaint KYW/3:24-00028, #6 Complaint OHS/2:23-2962, #7 Complaint PAE/2:24-659, #8 Complaint TXN/4:23-278, #9 Exhibit 1, #10 Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit 3, #12 Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 6, #15 Exhibit 7, #16 Exhibit 8, #17 Exhibit 9, #18 Exhibit 10, #19 Exhibit 11, #20 Exhibit 12, #21 Exhibit 13, #22 Exhibit 14, #23 Exhibit 15, #24 Exhibit 16, #25 Exhibit 17, #26 Exhibit 18, #27 Exhibit 19, #28 Exhibit 20, #29 Exhibit 21, #30 Exhibit 22, #31 Exhibit 23)(TF) Modified on 4/10/2024 (TF). MODIFIED COURT LOCATION. MODIFIED ATTACHMENT DESCRIPTION.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: Lawrence L. Crawford Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liaison Counsel for Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?