New Madrid County v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: New Madrid County
Defendant: Allergan PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., J.M. Smith Corporation, Novartis Pharamceuticals Corporation, McKesson Corporation, Indivior, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Michael Babich, 1-1000 DOES, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., Watson Pharmaceticals, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Cardinal Health 200, LLC, SPECGX LLC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., John Hunt, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health 201, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Mylan N.V., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Apotex Corp., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 110 LLC, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health 132, LLC, AmeriSource Bergen Corporation, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Watson Pharma, Inc., John Kapoor, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: MOE/4:20-CV-01125
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 HEARING ORDER re: pldg. (6 in ALS/1:20-cv-00438, #8609 in MDL No. 2804), (8 in ALS/1:20-cv-00440, #8642 in MDL No. 2804), (8 in ALS/1:20-cv-00443, #8610 in MDL No. 2804), (31 in CAE/2:20-cv-01824, #8649 in MDL No. 2804), (30 in KYE/7:20-cv-00102, #8343 in MDL No. 2804), ( #8522 in MDL No. 2804, 7 in MSN/3:20-cv-00248), ( #8679 in MDL No. 2804, 18 in MOE/4:20-cv-01252), ( #8556 in MDL No. 2804, 20 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850), ( #8612 in MDL No. 2804, 21 in MOE/4:20-cv-01191, 21 in MOE/4:20-cv-01195), ( #8518 in MDL No. 2804, 26 in MOE/4:20-cv-01121), ( #8547 in MDL No. 2804, 21 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 20 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 19 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150), ( #8429 in MDL No. 2804, 6 in VAE/3:20-cv-00606), ( #8383 in MDL No. 2804, 12 in PAE/2:20-cv-03695) in the following opposition(s) of Plaintiffs and defendant North Mississippi Center in 16 Actions - ALS-3, CAE-1, KYE-1, MSN-1, MOE-7, OKW-1, PAE-1, VAE-1 - SECTION B (DESIGNATED FOR CONSIDERATION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 12/3/2020 in Washington, DC.Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 10/22/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ALS/1:20-cv-00438, ALS/1:20-cv-00440, ALS/1:20-cv-00443, CAE/2:20-cv-01824, KYE/7:20-cv-00102, MOE/4:20-cv-01121, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, MOE/4:20-cv-01191, MOE/4:20-cv-01195, MOE/4:20-cv-01252, MSN/3:20-cv-00248, OKW/5:20-cv-00850, PAE/2:20-cv-03695, VAE/3:20-cv-00606 (RH)
October 15, 2020 Filing 39 Joint RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE CTO (re: pldg.( 8547 in MDL No. 2804)( 8556 in MDL No. 2804) (19 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150), (20 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850) ) (CTO-171) Filed by Defendants Amerisourcebergen Corporation, #et al.Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Mainigi, Enu) Modified on 10/16/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
October 15, 2020 Filing 38 Joint RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE CTO (re: pldg.( 8547 in MDL No. 2804)( 8556 in MDL No. 2804) ( 8461 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850), ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) ) (CTO-171) Filed by Defendants Actavis LLC, #et al.Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Service List) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Reed, Steven) Modified on 10/16/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
October 7, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 8561 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Defendant Apotex Corp. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125 (Matthews, James) Modified on 10/7/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
October 7, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #8559 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Defendant Apotex Corp. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125 (Matthews, James)
September 30, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 8536 in MDL No. 2804), ( 8537 in MDL No. 2804), ( 8532 in MDL No. 2804), ( 8535 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Defendants Actavis PLC, #et al.Actavis, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. #[Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150 (Welch, Donna) Modified on 9/30/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 29, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 8566 in MDL No. 2804, 33 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 30 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 29 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150), ( 8563 in MDL No. 2804, 30 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 27 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 26 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150), ( 8565 in MDL No. 2804, 32 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 29 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 28 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150), ( 8564 in MDL No. 2804, 31 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 28 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 27 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) Filed by Defendants Mallinckodt, PLC, #et al.Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC #[Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150 (O'Connor, Brien) Modified on 9/29/2020 (SM). DELTED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 24, 2020 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8461 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850), ( #8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Mallinckodt, PLC. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (O'Connor, Brien)
September 24, 2020 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8461 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850), ( #8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt, PLC for SPECGX LLC.. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (O'Connor, Brien)
September 24, 2020 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8461 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850), ( #8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt, PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (O'Connor, Brien)
September 24, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-171 re: pldg. ( #8419 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150, 1 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850) Filed by Brien T. O'Connor on behalf of Defendants Mallinckodt, PLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (O'Connor, Brien)
September 24, 2020 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8461 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850), ( 8556 in MDL No. 2804, 20 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850), ( 8547 in MDL No. 2804, 21 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 20 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 19 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150), ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Stern, Jonathan) Modified on 9/28/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 24, 2020 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125), (21 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125) -- Identifying Corporate Parent APOTEX HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent APOSHERM DELAWARE HOLDINGS CORPORATION for Apotex Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125 (Matthews, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-171 re: pldg. ( 8419 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150, 1 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850) Filed by Jonathan L. Stern on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., #et al.Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Stern, Jonathan) Modified on 9/29/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 24, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-171 re: pldg. ( #8419 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125) Filed by James W. Matthews on behalf of Defendant Apotex Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125 (Matthews, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804) ( 8461 in MDL No. 2804)(4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150), (3 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Cardinal Health 100, Inc. Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC. Corporate Parent Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC for Cardinal Health 132, LLC. Corporate Parent Allegiance Corp. for Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 201, Inc. Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 110, LLC for Cardinal Health 113, LLC. Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Cardinal Health Inc. Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 121, LLC for Cardinal Health 122, LLC. Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 100, Inc. for Cardinal Health 414, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Mainigi, Enu) Modified on 9/28/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-171 re: pldg. ( 8419 in MDL No. 2804) (2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150, 1 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850) Filed by Enu Mainigi on behalf of Defendants Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 201, Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 201, Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Mainigi, Enu) Modified on 9/28/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 24, 2020 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8461 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850), ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Jessee, Russell) Modified on 9/28/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
September 24, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-171 re: pldg. ( 8419 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150, 1 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850) Filed by Russell David Jessee on behalf of Defendants McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Jessee, Russell) Modified on 9/28/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
September 24, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION TO VACATE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER WITH BRIEF IN SUPPORT (CTO-171) re: pldg. ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804) (4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) Filed by Plaintiff Adair County, Andrew County, New Madrid County. (Attachments: #1 Other Request for Judicial Notice) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150 (Ainsworth, Cheryl) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM). ADDED PARTY NAME. ADDED MDL LINK
September 24, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-171 re: pldg. ( 8419 in MDL No. 2804) (2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) Filed by Cheryl Priest Ainsworth on behalf of Plaintiffs Adair County, Andrew County, New Madrid County. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150 (Ainsworth, Cheryl) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM).ADDED PARTY NAMES. ADDED MDL LINK
September 24, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150 (Ahmad, Scott) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-171 re: pldg. ( 8419 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) Filed by Scott M Ahmad on behalf of Defendants Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150 (Ahmad, Scott) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8461 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850), ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Lifland, Charles) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8461 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850), ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Jannsen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Lifland, Charles) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150 (Welch, Donna) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Actavis PLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150 (Welch, Donna) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Actavis, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150 (Welch, Donna) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-171 re: pldg. ( 8419 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150, 1 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850) Filed by Charles Coleman Lifland on behalf of Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., #et al.Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Jannsen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Lifland, Charles) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-171 re: pldg. ( 8419 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) Filed by Donna Marie Welch on behalf of Defendants Actavis PLC, #et al.Actavis, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150 (Welch, Donna) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804, ( 8461 in MDL No. 2804), 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Supplement, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Service List) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Reed, Steven) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-171 re: pldg. ( 8419 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150, 1 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850) Filed by Steven A. Reed on behalf of Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Service List) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Reed, Steven) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8424 in MDL No. 2804) ( 8461 in MDL No. 2804) (4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150), (3 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp. Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance Holdings LLC for AmeriSource Bergen Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Nicholas, Robert) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINKS. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES.
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-171 re: pldg.( 8419 in MDL No. 2804) (2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150, 1 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850) Filed by Robert Arthur Nicholas on behalf of Defendants Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (Nicholas, Robert) Modified on 9/25/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF MULTIPLE FILED OPPOSITIONS TO CTO-171 AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( #8461 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850), ( #8424 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 4 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 3 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 9/24/2020. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 9/24/2020. Motion to Vacate with Brief in Support due on or before 9/24/2020. Consolidated Responses due on or before 10/15/2020. Reply, if any, due on or before 10/22/2020. #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/10/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850 (SM)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #8424 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Plaintiff New Madrid County -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125 (Ainsworth, Cheryl)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-171) - 3 action(s) - re: pldg.( 8419 in MDL No. 2804) (2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150) Filed by Plaintiffs Andrew County, Missouri, #et al.New Madrid County, Adair County #[Suppress List] Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150 (Ainsworth, Cheryl) Modified on 9/10/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CTO AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (CTO-171) re: pldg. (1 in GAN/1:20-cv-03442, #8419 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01125, 2 in MOE/4:20-cv-01136, 1 in MOE/4:20-cv-01150, 1 in OKW/5:20-cv-00850, 1 in OKW/5:20-cv-00852) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Oppositions due on or before 9/9/2020. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/2/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, GAN/1:20-cv-03442, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850, OKW/5:20-cv-00852 (SM)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY (CTO-171) - 6 action(s) Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/2/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, GAN/1:20-cv-03442, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136, MOE/4:20-cv-01150, OKW/5:20-cv-00850, OKW/5:20-cv-00852 (SM)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #8357 in MDL No. 2804) Filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MOE/4:20-cv-01125, MOE/4:20-cv-01136 (O'Connor, Brien)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Madrid County v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Madrid County
Represented By: Terry L. Pabst
Represented By: Michael R. Owens
Represented By: Kevin Royer
Represented By: Anne Andrews
Represented By: Cheryl Priest Ainsworth
Represented By: Jeffrey H Reeves
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Karl Stampfl
Represented By: Michael Finnegan LeFevour
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Zachary A Ciullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan T. Barton
Represented By: Christopher B. Essig
Represented By: Scott M Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Matthew Ambrose Martin
Represented By: Robert T Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Smith Corporation
Represented By: J M Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharamceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Sara K. Thompson
Represented By: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation f/k/a Sandoz,
Represented By: Julia Covey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Russell David Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Represented By: Indivior, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Amy Malone
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Represented By: Richard Gallagher
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Represented By: J. Sedwick Sollers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-1000 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional, Inc.
Represented By: Adam K. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceticals, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Karl Stampfl
Represented By: Michael Finnegan LeFevour
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Zachary A Ciullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Karl Stampfl
Represented By: Michael Finnegan LeFevour
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Zachary A Ciullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC.
Represented By: Amy Malone
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Represented By: Richard Gallagher
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Matthew Ambrose Martin
Represented By: Robert T Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hunt
Represented By: John Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Matthew Ambrose Martin
Represented By: Robert T Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Represented By: Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.
Represented By: E Christopher Beeler
Represented By: Grant Ford
Represented By: John Lombardo
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 201, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Matthew Ambrose Martin
Represented By: Robert T Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Karl Stampfl
Represented By: Michael Finnegan LeFevour
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Zachary A Ciullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Harmon
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Represented By: Anita Maria Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Represented By: Adam K. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Matthew Ambrose Martin
Represented By: Robert T Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Matthew Ambrose Martin
Represented By: Robert T Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Represented By: Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.
Represented By: E Christopher Beeler
Represented By: Grant Ford
Represented By: John Lombardo
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: J M Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Kaleb Nathaniel Berhe
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Represented By: Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.
Represented By: E Christopher Beeler
Represented By: Grant Ford
Represented By: John Lombardo
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Represented By: Sandra J. Wunderlich
Represented By: Matthew J. Smock
Represented By: Esteban Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110 LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Represented By: Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.
Represented By: E Christopher Beeler
Represented By: Grant Ford
Represented By: John Lombardo
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Robert Arthur Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Adam K. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriSource Bergen Corporation
Represented By: Robert Arthur Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Jonathan T. Barton
Represented By: Christopher B. Essig
Represented By: Scott M Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Matthew Ambrose Martin
Represented By: Robert T Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Represented By: Kurt Michael Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Represented By: Sandra J. Wunderlich
Represented By: Matthew J. Smock
Represented By: Esteban Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 113, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Represented By: Sandra J. Wunderlich
Represented By: Matthew J. Smock
Represented By: Esteban Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Sara K. Thompson
Represented By: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation f/k/a Sandoz,
Represented By: Julia Covey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?