Foos et al v. Permian Resources Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Foos, Matthew E. Foos, Andrew A. Hund, Michael B. Ackerman, Jarrod Johnson and Mackey and Sons, Inc.
Defendant: Permian Resources Corp, Permian Resources Corp., Centennial Resource Development, Inc, Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Continental Resources, Inc., Diamondback Energy, Inc., EOG Resources, Inc., Hess Corporation, Occidental Petroleum Corporation and Pioneer Natural Resources Company
Case Number: NM/1:24-CV-00361
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Presiding Judge: Matthew L Garcia
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 3119, 65 in MDL No. 3119), (30 in NM/1:24-cv-00361) Filed by Warren T Burns on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael B. Ackerman, #et al.Matthew E. Foos, Andrew A. Hund, Jarrod Johnson, Mackey and Sons, Inc., David Guy Overstreet, John Castillo, Castillo Construction and Management, LLC, Southwest Elite Real Estate Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00563, NM/1:24-cv-00583 (Burns, Warren) Modified on 6/12/2024 (JC). ADDED MDL LINK
June 11, 2024 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING BRIEFING re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3119) Briefing in this matter is now closed. The parties to actions on the motion(s) remain under a duty, pursuant to Pa nel Rules 6.1(f) and 6.2(d), to notify the Clerk of the Panel promptly of potential tag-along actions, as well as any development that moots the motion or fully disposes of any action on the motion. Parties in any potential tag-along action may file an Interested Party response, but must do so promptly, and in any event, no later than the Thursday prior to the hearing session at which the motion for transfer is to be heard by the Panel.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/11/2024. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NM/1:24-cv-00563, NM/2:24-cv-00583, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00150, NV/2:24-cv-00164, NV/2:24-cv-00198, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00279, NV/2:24-cv-00298, NV/2:24-cv-00325, NV/2:24-cv-00401 (JC)
June 10, 2024 Filing 30 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. ( #52 in MDL No. 3119, 37 in NV/2:24-cv-00103), ( #53 in MDL No. 3119, 26 in N M/1:24-cv-00361, 27 in NM/1:24-cv-00430, 38 in NV/2:24-cv-00103, 1 in NV/2:24-cv-00150, 1 in NV/2:24-cv-00164, 1 in NV/2:24-cv-00198, 23 in NV/2:24-cv-00253, 1 in NV/2:24-cv-00279, 1 in NV/2:24-cv-00298, 19 in NV/2:24-cv-00325, 1 in NV/2:24-cv-00401), ( #58 in MDL No. 3119, 24 in NV/2:24-cv-00253), ( #56 in MDL No. 3119, 20 in NV/2:24-cv-00325), ( #51 in MDL No. 3119, 26 in NM/1:24-cv-00430), ( #60 in MDL No. 3119, 43 in NV/2:24-cv-00103), ( #54 in MDL No. 3119, 39 in NV/2:24-cv-00103), ( #57 in MDL No. 3119, 41 in NV/2:24-cv-00103), ( #55 in MDL No. 3119, 40 in NV/2:24-cv- 00103), ( #59 in MDL No. 3119, 42 in NV/2:24-cv-00103), ( #1 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by Plaintiffs Michael B. Ackerman, #et al. Matthew E. Foos, Andrew A. Hund, Jarrod Johnson, Mackey and Sons, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV /2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00150, NV/2:24-cv-00164, NV/2:24-cv-00198, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00279, NV/2:24-cv-00298, NV/2:24-cv-00325, NV/2:24-cv-00401 (Burns, Warren)
June 7, 2024 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 38 in MDL No. 3119, 19 in NM/1:24-cv-00361, 18 in NM/1:24-cv-00430, 26 in NV/2:24-cv-00103, 16 in NV/2:24-cv-00253, 14 in NV/2:24-cv-00325), ( 39 in MDL No. 3119, 20 in NM/1:24-cv-00361, 19 in NM/1:24-cv-00430, 27 in NV/2:24-cv-00103, 17 in NV/2:24-cv-00253, 15 in NV/2:24-cv-00325) Filed by Defendant Chesapeake Energy Corporation. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Buterman, Lawrence) Modified on 6/7/2024 (JC). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
June 5, 2024 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #37 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by Defendant EOG Resources, Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24- cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00150, NV/2:24-cv-00164, NV/2:24-cv-00198, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00279, NV/2:24-cv-00298, NV/2:24-cv-00325, NV/2:24-cv-00401 (Taladay, John)
June 5, 2024 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #34 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by Defendant EOG Resources, Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24- cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00150, NV/2:24-cv-00164, NV/2:24-cv-00198, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00279, NV/2:24-cv-00298, NV/2:24-cv-00325, NV/2:24-cv-00401 (Taladay, John)
June 3, 2024 Filing 26 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 3119) ) Filed by Defendants Chesapeake Energy Corporation, #et al.Continental Resources, Inc., Diamondback Energy, Inc., EOG Resources, Inc., Hess Corporation, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Permian Resources Corp., Pioneer Natural Resources Company and Exxon Mobil Corporation #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Diamondback Declaration), #2 Exhibit B (Permian Declaration), #3 Exhibit C (Pioneer Declaration), #4 Exhibit D (EOG Declaration), #5 Exhibit E (Occidental Declation), #6 Exhibit F (Hess Declaration), #7 Exhibit G (Continental Declaration), #8 Exhibit H (Chesapeake Declaration), #9 Schedule of Actions, #10 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00150, NV/2:24-cv-00164, NV/2:24-cv-00198, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00279, NV/2:24-cv-00298, NV/2:24-cv-00325, NV/2:24-cv-00401 (Taladay, John) Modified on 6/4/2024 (JC). EDITED EVENT TYPE, ADDED PARTY NAME
June 3, 2024 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg.( #13 in MDL No. 3119, 6 in NM/1:24-cv-00361) Filed by Plaintiff Mackey and Sons, Inc. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Burns, Warren) Modified on 6/3/2024 (Miller, Ajonee).EDITED EVENT TYPE
May 30, 2024 Filing 24 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: pldg.( #11 in MDL No. 3119, 5 in NM/1:24-cv-00361, 4 in NM/1:24-cv-00430, 4 in NV/2:24-cv-00103, 5 in NV/2:24-cv-00253, 4 in NV/2:24-cv-00325) Filed by Defendant Diamondback Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Walsh, Thomas) Modified on 5/31/2024 (Miller, Ajonee). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES
May 30, 2024 Filing 23 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: pldg.( #9 in MDL No. 3119, 4 in NM/1:24-cv-00361, 3 in NM/1:24-cv-00430, 3 in NV/2:24-cv-00103, 3 in NV/2:24-cv-00253, 3 in NV/2:24-cv-00325) Filed by Defendant Diamondback Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Walsh, Thomas) Modified on 5/31/2024 (Miller, Ajonee). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES
May 30, 2024 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 3119)( #23 in MDL No. 3119) -- Identifying Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Occidential Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253 (Allon, Devora) Modified on 5/31/2024 (TF). ADDED MDL LINK.
May 30, 2024 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #22 in MDL No. 3119, 11 in NM/1:24-cv-00361, 9 in NM/1:24-cv-00430, 13 in NV/2:24-cv-00103, 8 in NV/2:24-cv-00253) Filed by Defendant Occide ntial Petroleum Corporation -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253 (Allon, Devora)
May 28, 2024 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 3119) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Chesapeake Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Buterman, Lawrence) Modified on 5/30/2024 (SM). ADDED CORPORATE PARENT Modified on 5/31/2024 (SM). EDITED DOCKET TEXT
May 28, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by Lawrence E. Buterman on behalf of Defendant Chesapeake Energy Corporation (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00 325 (Buterman, Lawrence)
May 28, 2024 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3119) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for EOG Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:2 4-cv-00325 (Taladay, John)
May 28, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by John Taladay on behalf of Defendant EOG Resources, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Taladay, John )
May 28, 2024 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3119) -- Identifying Corporate Parent EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION for Pioneer Natural Resources Company. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV /2:24-cv-00325 (Bershteyn, Boris)
May 28, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by Boris Bershteyn on behalf of Defendant Pioneer Natural Resources Company (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Bershteyn, Bor is)
May 28, 2024 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 3119) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Permian Resources Corp. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Scarborough, Michael) Modified on 5/30/2024 (TF). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES.
May 28, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by Michael Scarborough on behalf of Defendant Permian Resources Corp. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Scarborough, Michael) Modified on 5/30/2024 (TF). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES.
May 28, 2024 Filing 12 SEE CORRECTED PLEADING 45 IN MDL NO. 3119 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 3119) -- Identifying Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Occidental Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253 (Allon, Devora) Modified on 5/31/2024 (TF).
May 28, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by Devora Whitman Allon on behalf of Defendant Occidental Petroleum Corporation (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253 (Allon, Dev ora)
May 28, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3119) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corporation for Continental Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv -00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Ondeck, Christopher)
May 28, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by Christopher E. Ondeck on behalf of Defendant Continental Resources, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-003 25 (Ondeck, Christopher)
May 28, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3119) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Hess Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103 (Schwartz, Kevin)
May 28, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by Kevin S. Schwartz on behalf of Defendant Hess Corporation (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103 (Schwartz, Kevin)
May 28, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3119) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Mackey and Sons, Inc.. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24- cv-00361 (Burns, Warren)
May 24, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 3119) -- Identifying Non-Party/Financial Interest The Vanguard Group for Diamondback Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service ) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Walsh, Thomas) Modified on 5/29/2024 (Miller, Ajonee). DELETED DUPLICATED ATTACHMENT NAMES
May 24, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by Thomas B. Walsh, IV on behalf of Defendant Diamondback Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Walsh, Thomas) Modified on 5/28/2024 (Miller, Ajonee). DELETED DUPLICATE NAMES
May 22, 2024 Filing 3 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 3119) Filed by Plaintiffs Michael B. Ackerman, #et al.Matthew E. Foos, Andrew A. Hund, Jarrod Johnson, Mackey and Sons, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachmen ts: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361 (Burns, Warren)
May 13, 2024 Filing 2 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3119) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS:< br< Notices of Appearance due on or before 5/28/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 5/28/2024. Responses due on or before 6/3/2024. Reply, if any, due on or before 6/10/2024. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines < Forms page of our website for additional information.Attorneys must be registered to file in the JPML. Please visit our website for #Registration Information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 5/13/2024. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3119, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv-00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Miller, Ajonee)
May 13, 2024 Filing 1 MDL Number 3119 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending No. 40) Associated Cases: Pending No. 40, NM/1:24-cv-00361, NM/1:24-cv-00430, NV/2:24-cv- 00103, NV/2:24-cv-00253, NV/2:24-cv-00325 (Miller, Ajonee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foos et al v. Permian Resources Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew E. Foos
Represented By: Brandon C. Landt
Represented By: Greg W. Wright
Represented By: Hammons P Hepner
Represented By: Isaac Diel
Represented By: Kai'Ree K Howard
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Daniel H. Charest
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew A. Hund
Represented By: Brandon C. Landt
Represented By: Greg W. Wright
Represented By: Hammons P Hepner
Represented By: Isaac Diel
Represented By: Kai'Ree K Howard
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Daniel H. Charest
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Ackerman
Represented By: Brandon C. Landt
Represented By: Greg W. Wright
Represented By: Hammons P Hepner
Represented By: Isaac Diel
Represented By: Kai'Ree K Howard
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Daniel H. Charest
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod Johnson
Represented By: Brandon C. Landt
Represented By: Greg W. Wright
Represented By: Hammons P Hepner
Represented By: Isaac Diel
Represented By: Kai'Ree K Howard
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Daniel H. Charest
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mackey and Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon C. Landt
Represented By: Greg W. Wright
Represented By: Hammons P Hepner
Represented By: Isaac Diel
Represented By: Kai'Ree K Howard
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Daniel H. Charest
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Permian Resources Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Permian Resources Corp.
Represented By: Craig P. Seebald
Represented By: Dylan I. Ballard
Represented By: Stephen M. Medlock
Represented By: Permian Resources Corporation
Represented By: Michael Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centennial Resource Development, Inc
Represented By: Craig P. Seebald
Represented By: Dylan I. Ballard
Represented By: Stephen M. Medlock
Represented By: Permian Resources Corporation
Represented By: Michael Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Marguerite M Sullivan
Represented By: Morgan L. Maddox
Represented By: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Represented By: Marguerite Sullivan
Represented By: Morgan Maddoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher E. Ondeck
Represented By: Kyle A. Casazza
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Stephen R Chuk
Represented By: Continental Resources Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamondback Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Represented By: Jeffrey J Amato
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Thomas M. Melsheimer
Represented By: Diamondback Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas B. Walsh, IV
Represented By: Billy Trabaudo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Ben Feuchter
Represented By: Christopher Wilson
Represented By: James J Pisanelli
Represented By: John Taladay
Represented By: Kelsey Ann Paine
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Tankel
Represented By: Thomas C. Bird
Represented By: EOG Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin F Feuchter
Represented By: John M Taladay
Represented By: Kelsey Paine
Represented By: Megan Tankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corporation
Represented By: David Alexander Papirnik
Represented By: Kevin S. Schwartz
Represented By: Hess Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin E Thomas
Represented By: David A. Papirnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Akhil Kumar Gola
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Represented By: Devora Whitman Allon
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Zeiger
Represented By: Earl E. DeBrine, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Natural Resources Company
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Represented By: Jay Srinivasan
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Michael H. Menitove
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Represented By: Stephen C. Whittaker
Represented By: W. West Allen
Represented By: Zachary C. Siegler
Represented By: Pioneer Natural Resources Company
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Represented By: Karen M Lent
Represented By: Zachary Charles David Siegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?