Montgomery County Ohio et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Montgomery County Ohio, Medina County, City of Parma Heights, Ohio, Valley Fire District, Fayette County, Cuyahoga County, Village of Boston Heights, Ohio, City of Strongsville, Ohio, Portage County (OH), Village of Lakemore, Ohio, Copley Township, Ohio, Painsville Township, Ohio, Springfield Township, Ohio, Harrison County, Cuyahoga Falls, City Of, New Franklin, City of, Munroe Falls, City of, Stark, County of, City of Dayton, Ohio, Aurora, City of, City of Warrensville Heights, Ohio, City of Lorain, Ohio, Kent, City of, Fairlawn Ohio, City of, Jefferson County, Ohio, City of Broadview Heights, Stow, City of, Trumbull County and Norton, City of
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Case Number: OHN/1:21-OP-45037
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Presiding Judge: Dan A Polster
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 80 in MDL No. 2996, 8 in ALN/6:21-cv-00425, 11 in FLS/0:21-cv-60305, 10 in GAN/3:21-cv-00043, 12 in ILS/3:21-cv-00251, 12 in ILS/3:21-cv-00254, 14 in KYW/1:21-cv-00035, 54 in MDL No. 2996, 12 in NYE/2:21-cv-01039, 12 in OHN/1:21-op-45026, 12 in OHN/1:21-op-45027, 13 in OHN/1:21-op-45028, 12 in OHN/1:21-op-45032, 12 in OHN/1:21-op-45033, 12 in OHN/1:21-op-45037, 6 in OHN/1:21-op-45038, 4 in OHN/1:21-op-45043, 12 in OKW/5:21-cv-00170, 12 in OKW/5:21-cv-00174, 12 in OKW/5:21-cv-00176, 8 in TNE/3:21-cv-00105, 12 in WAW/2:21-cv-00221, 12 in WAW/2:21-cv-00226, 11 in WVS/2:21-cv-00079), (16 in FLS/0:21-cv-60305, 22 in ILS/3:21-cv-00251, 22 in ILS/3:21-cv-00254, 19 in KYW/1:21-cv-00035, 80 in MDL No. 2996, 18 in NYE/2:21-cv-01039, 17 in OHN/1:21-op-45026, 17 in OHN/1:21-op-45027, 18 in OHN/1:21-op-45028, 17 in OHN/1:21-op-45032, 17 in OHN/1:21-op-45033, 21 in OHN/1:21-op-45037, 17 in OKW/5:21-cv-00170, 17 in OKW/5:21-cv-00174, 17 in OKW/5:21-cv-00176, 17 in WAW/2:21-cv-00221, 17 in WAW/2:21-cv-00226, 16 in WVS/2:21-cv-00079) Filed by Linda Singer on behalf of Interested Parties Plaintiffs' Executive Committee for MDL 2804, #et al.Plaintiffs' Executive Committee for MDL 2804 #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996 et al. (Singer, Linda) Modified on 4/27/2021 (dld). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
April 21, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 80 in MDL No. 2996, 21 in OHN/1:21-op-45037) Filed by Frank L. Gallucci, III on behalf of Plaintiffs Ashtabula County, #et al.City of Euclid, Ohio, City of Garfield Heights, Ohio, City of North Olmsted, Ohio, City of North Ridgeville, Ohio, City of Olmsted Falls, Ohio, City of Seven Hills, Ohio, City of Warrensville Heights, Ohio, Cuyahoga County, Harrison County, Jefferson County, Ohio, Lake County, Lorain County Ohio, Painsville Township, Ohio, Sandusky County, Ohio, Trumbull County #[Suppress List] Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, OHN/1:21-op-45037 (Gallucci, Frank) Modified on 4/27/2021 (dld). ADDED MDL LINK
April 21, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( #43 in MDL No. 2996, 11 in OHN/1:21-op-45037), ( #80 in MDL No. 2996, 21 in O HN/1:21-op-45037) Filed by Linda Singer on behalf of Plaintiffs Akron, City of, #et al.Alliance, City of, Aurora, City of, Barberton, City of, Boston Township, Ohio, Canton, City of, Copley Township, Ohio, Coventry Township, Ohio, Cuyahoga Falls, City Of, Fairlawn Ohio, City of, Fayette County, Green, City of, Kent, City of, Medina County, Montgomery County Ohio, Munroe Falls, City of, New Franklin, City of, Norton, City of, Portage County (OH), Ravenna, City of, Springfield Township, Ohio, Stark, County of, Stow, City of, Summit, County of, Tallmadge, City of, Valley Fire District, Village of Boston Heights, Ohio, Village of Clinton, Ohio, Village of Lakemore, Ohio, Village of Mogadore, Ohio, Village of Peninsula, Ohio, Village of Richfield, Ohio, Village of Silver Lake, Ohio #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Parties Represented, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: M DL No. 2996, OHN/1:21-op-45037 (Singer, Linda)
April 20, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (16 in FLS/0:21-cv-60305, 22 in ILS/3:21-cv-00251, 22 in ILS/3:21-cv-00254, 19 in KYW/1:21-cv-00035, 80 in MDL No. 2996, 18 in NYE/2:21-cv-01039, 17 in OHN/1:21-op-45026, 17 in OHN/1:21-op-45027, 18 in OHN/1:21-op-45028, 17 in OHN/1:21-op-45032, 17 in OHN/1:21-op-45033, 21 in OHN/1:21-op-45037, 17 in OKW/5:21-cv-00170, 17 in OKW/5:21-cv-00174, 17 in OKW/5:21-cv-00176, 17 in WAW/2:21-cv-00221, 17 in WAW/2:21-cv-00226, 16 in WVS/2:21-cv-00079), ( 1 in MDL No. 2996) Filed by James Lawrence Bernard on behalf of Defendants McKinsey & Company, Inc., #et al.McKinsey & Company Inc United States, McKinsey & Company Inc Washington DC, #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996 et al. (Bernard, James) Modified on 4/21/2021 (dld). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 HEARING ORDER re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 2996) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 5/27/2021 in Washington, DC font>. Notices of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument due on or before 5/3/2021.#Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument form (JPML form 9) can be downloaded from our website.Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 4/15/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (RH)
April 12, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER CLOSING BRIEFING re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 2996) Briefing in this matter is now closed. The parties to actions on the motion(s) remain under a duty, pursuant to Pa nel Rules 6.1(f) and 6.2(d), to notify the Clerk of the Panel promptly of potential tag-along actions, as well as any development that moots the motion or fully disposes of any action on the motion. Parties in any potential tag-along action may file an Interested Party response, but must do so promptly, and in any event, no later than the Thursday prior to the hearing session at which the motion for transfer is to be heard by the Panel.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 4/12/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996 et al. (CMD)
April 9, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2996, 35 in MDL No. 2996, 40 in MDL No. 2996, [42 in MDL No. 2996, 43 in MDL No. 2996, 44 in MDL No. 2996, 46 in MDL No. 2996, 47 in MDL No. 2996, 52 in MDL No. 2996, 54 in MDL No. 2996, 64 in MDL No. 2996, 65 in MDL No. 2996, 73 in MDL No. 2996) Filed by Defendants McKinsey & Company, Inc., #et al. McKinsey & Company Inc United States, McKinsey & Company Inc Washington DC #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of James L. Bernard in Further Support of McKinsey's Motion for Transfer of Actions, #2 Exhibit 1 - Purdue Disclosure Plan, #3 Exhibit 2 - Mallinckrodt Joinder Agreement, #4 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, ALN/6:21-cv-00425, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, GAN/3:21-cv-00043, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OHN/1:21-op-45038, OHN/1:21-op-45043, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, TNE/3:21-cv-00105, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (Bernard, James) ADDED MDL LINKS & DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 4/12/2021 (CMD).
April 5, 2021 Filing 18 ERRATA - to ( #69 in MDL No. 2996, 17 in OHN/1:21-op-45037) - Filed by Plaintiffs City of Broadview Heights, #et al.City of Dayton, Ohio, City of Findlay, Ohio, City of Lorain, Ohio, Cit y of Parma Heights, Ohio, City of Parma, Ohio, City of Strongsville, Ohio, City of Toledo, Ohio, City of Warren, Ohio #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2 996, OHN/1:21-op-45037 (Shkolnik, Hunter)
April 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 2996) Filed by Hunter J. Shkolnik on behalf of Plaintiffs City of Broadview Heights, #et al.City of Dayton, Ohio, City of Findlay, Ohio, Ci ty of Lorain, Ohio, City of Parma Heights, Ohio, City of Parma, Ohio, City of Strongsville, Ohio, City of Toledo, Ohio, City of Warren, Ohio #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Errata Parties Represe nted, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, OHN/1:21-op-45037 (Shkolnik, Hunter)
April 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2996) Filed by Frank L. Gallucci, III on behalf of Plaintiffs Ashtabula County, #et al.City of Euclid, Ohio, City of Garfield Heights, Ohio, City of North Olmsted, Ohio, City of North Ridgeville, Ohio, City of Olmsted Falls, Ohio, City of Seven Hills, Ohio, City of Warrensville Heights, Ohio, Cuyahoga County, Harrison County, Jefferson County, Ohio, Lake County, Lorain County Ohio, Painsville Township, Ohio, Sandusky County, Ohio, Trumbull County #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Other Addendum of Parties Represented, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, OHN/1:21-op-45037 (Gallucci, Frank) DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY Modified on 4/5/2021 (CMD).
March 31, 2021 Filing 15 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY***MINUTE ORDER (re: pldg. ( #56 in MDL No. 2996) ) -- Motion of: Defendants McKinsey & Company, Inc., et al. for Extension of Time to Re ply -- GRANTED IN PART. Reply, if any, due on or before 4/9/2021. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 3/31/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, ALN/6:21-cv-00425, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, GAN/3:21-cv-00043, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OHN/1:21-op-45038, OHN/1:21-op-45043, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, TNE/3:21-cv-00105, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (JN)
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2996) Filed by James Lawrence Bernard on behalf of Defendants McKinsey & Company, Inc., #et al. McKinsey & Company Inc United States, McKinsey & Company Inc Washington DC #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, ALN/6:21-cv-00425, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, GAN/3:21-cv-00043, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OHN/1:21-op-45038, OHN/1:21-op-45043, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, TNE/3:21-cv-00105, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (Bernard, James) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 4/1/2021 (CMD).
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 ERRATA - to ( 43 in MDL No. 2996, 11 in OHN/1:21-op-45037) - Filed by Plaintiffs Akron, City of, #et al.Alliance, City of, Ashtabula County, Aurora, City of, Barberton, City of, Boston Township, Ohio, Canton, City of, City of Broadview Heights, City of Dayton, Ohio, City of Euclid, Ohio, City of Findlay, Ohio, City of Garfield Heights, Ohio, City of Lorain, Ohio, City of North Olmsted, Ohio, City of North Ridgeville, Ohio, City of Olmsted Falls, Ohio, City of Parma Heights, Ohio, City of Parma, Ohio, City of Seven Hills, Ohio, City of Strongsville, Ohio, City of Toledo, Ohio, City of Warren, Ohio, City of Warrensville Heights, Ohio, Copley Township, Ohio, Coventry Township, Ohio, Cuyahoga County, Cuyahoga Falls, City Of, Fairlawn Ohio, City of, Fayette County, Green, City of, Harrison County, Jefferson County, Ohio, Kent, City of, Lake County, Lorain County Ohio, Medina County, Montgomery County Ohio, Munroe Falls, City of, New Franklin, City of, Norton, City of, Painsville Township, Ohio, Portage County (OH), Ravenna, City of, Sandusky County, Ohio, Springfield Township, Ohio, Stark, County of, Stow, City of, Summit, County of, Tallmadge, City of, Trumbull County, Valley Fire District, Village of Boston Heights, Ohio, Village of Clinton, Ohio, Village of Lakemore, Ohio, Village of Mogadore, Ohio, Village of Peninsula, Ohio, Village of Richfield, Ohio, Village of Silver Lake, Ohio #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, OHN/1:21-op-45037 (Singer, Linda) ADDED MDL LINK Modified on 4/1/2021 (CMD).
March 31, 2021 Filing 12 INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION (INTEREST IN MDL) -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2996)) Filed by Interested Party Plaintiffs' Executive Committee for MDL 2804 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, ALN/6:21-cv-00425, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, GAN/3:21-cv-00043, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OHN/1:21-op-45038, OHN/1:21-op-45043, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, TNE/3:21-cv-00105, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (Weinberger, Peter) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME Modified on 3/31/2021 (CMD).
March 30, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 2996) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Akron, City of, #et al.Alliance, City of, Ashtabula County, Aurora, City of, Barberton, City of, Boston Township, Ohio, Canton, City of, City of Broadview Heights, City of Dayton, Ohio, City of Euclid, Ohio, City of Findlay, Ohio, City of Garfield Heights, Ohio, City of Lorain, Ohio, City of North Olmsted, Ohio, City of North Ridgeville, Ohio, City of Olmsted Falls, Ohio, City of Parma Heights, Ohio, City of Parma, Ohio, City of Seven Hills, Ohio, City of Strongsville, Ohio, City of Toledo, Ohio, City of Warren, Ohio, City of Warrensville Heights, Ohio, Copley Township, Ohio, Coventry Township, Ohio, Cuyahoga County, Cuyahoga Falls, City Of, Fairlawn Ohio, City of, Fayette County, Green, City of, Harrison County, Jefferson County, Ohio, Kent, City of, Lake County, Lorain County Ohio, Medina County, Montgomery County Ohio, Munroe Falls, City of, New Franklin, City of, Norton, City of, Painsville Township, Ohio, Portage County (OH), Ravenna, City of, Sandusky County, Ohio, Springfield Township, Ohio, Stark, County of, Stow, City of, Summit, County of, Tallmadge, City of, Trumbull County, Valley Fire District, Village of Boston Heights, Ohio, Village of Clinton, Ohio, Village of Lakemore, Ohio, Village of Mogadore, Ohio, Village of Peninsula, Ohio, Village of Richfield, Ohio, Village of Silver Lake, Ohio #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, OHN/1:21-op-45037 (Singer, Linda)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2996) Filed by Peter Henry Weinberger on behalf of Interested Parties Plaintiffs' Executive Committee for MDL 2804 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OHN/1:21-op-45038, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (Weinberger, Peter) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME Modified on 3/24/2021 (CMD).
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #1 in MDL No. 2996) Filed by Linda Singer on behalf of Plaintiffs Akron, City of, #et al.Alliance, City of, Aurora, City of, Barberton, City of, Boston T ownship, Ohio, Canton, City of, Copley Township, Ohio, Coventry Township, Ohio, Cuyahoga Falls, City Of, Fairlawn Ohio, City of, Fayette County, Green, City of, Kent, City of, Medina County, Montgomery County Ohio, Munroe Falls, City of, New Franklin, City of, Norton, City of, Portage County (OH), Ravenna, City of, Springfield Township, Ohio, Stark, County of, Stow, City of, Summit, County of, Tallmadge, City of, Valley Fire District, Village of Boston Heights, Ohio, Village of Clinton, Ohio, Village of Lakemore, Ohio, Village of Mogadore, Ohio, Village of Peninsula, Ohio, Village of Richfield, Ohio, Village of Silver Lake, Ohio #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Plaintiffs, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, OHN/1:21-op-45037 (Singer, Linda)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2996, #9 in MDL No. 2996) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for McKinsey & Company Inc, McKinsey & Company Inc United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OHN/1:21-op-45038, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (Bernard, James) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES & ADDED MDL LINK 9 Modified on 3/17/2021 (CMD).
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( #9 in MDL No. 2996), ( 1 in MDL No. 2996) Filed by James Lawrence Bernard on behalf of Defendants McKinsey & Company, Inc., #et al.McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OHN/1:21-op-45038, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (Bernard, James) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 3/17/2021 (CMD).
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (3 in FLS/0:21-cv-60305, 3 in ILS/3:21-cv-00251, 3 in ILS/3:21-cv-00254, 5 in KYW/1:21-cv-00035, #6 in MDL No. 2996, 3 in NYE/2:21-cv-01039, 3 in OHN/1:21-op-45026, 3 in OHN/1:21-op-45027, 3 in OHN/1:21-op-45028, 3 in OHN/1:21-op-45032, 3 in OHN/1:21-op-45033, 3 in OHN/1:21-op-45037, 3 in OKW/5:21-cv-00170, 3 in OKW/5:21-cv-00174, 3 in OKW/5:21-cv-00176, 3 in WAW/2:21-cv-00221, 3 in WAW/2:21-cv-00226, 3 in WVS/2:21-cv-00079), (4 in FLS/0:21-cv-60305, 4 in ILS/3:21-cv-00251, 4 in ILS/3:21-cv-00254, 6 in KYW/1:21-cv-00035, #7 in MDL No. 2996, 4 in NYE/2:21-cv-01039, 4 in OHN/1:21-op-45026, 4 in OHN/1:21-op-45027, 4 in OHN/1:21-op-45028, 4 in OHN/1:21-op-45032, 4 in OHN/1:21-op-45033, 4 in OHN/1:21-op-45037, 4 in OKW/5:21-cv-00170, 4 in OKW/5:21-cv-00174, 4 in OKW/5:21-cv-00176, 4 in WAW/2:21-cv-00221, 4 in WAW/2:21-cv-00226, 4 in WVS/2:21-cv-00079) Filed by Defendants McKinsey & Company, Inc., #et al.McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C. #[Suppress List] FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Other. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (Bernard, James) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 3/17/2021 (CMD).
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2996) Filed by Defendants McKinsey & Company, Inc., #et al.McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (Bernard, James) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 3/16/2021 (CMD).
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. #13 in MDL No. 2996) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2996) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for McKinsey & Company Inc, McKinsey & Company Inc United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (Bernard, James) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 3/16/2021 (CMD). Modified on 3/17/2021 (CMD).
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. #12 in MDL No. 2996) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2996) Filed by James Lawrence Bernard on behalf of Defendants McKinsey & Company, Inc., #et al.McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (Bernard, James) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES Modified on 3/16/2021 (CMD). Modified on 3/17/2021 (CMD).
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 2996) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS:< br< Notices of Appearance due on or before 3/23/2021. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 3/23/2021. Responses due on or before 3/30/2021. Reply, if any, due on or before 4/6/2021. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines < Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 3/9/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2996, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21-cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (LAH)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 MDL Number 2996 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending No. 15) Associated Cases: Pending No. 15, FLS/0:21-cv-60305, ILS/3:21-cv-00251, ILS/3:21- cv-00254, KYW/1:21-cv-00035, NYE/2:21-cv-01039, OHN/1:21-op-45026, OHN/1:21-op-45027, OHN/1:21-op-45028, OHN/1:21-op-45032, OHN/1:21-op-45033, OHN/1:21-op-45037, OKW/5:21-cv-00170, OKW/5:21-cv-00174, OKW/5:21-cv-00176, WAW/2:21-cv-00221, WAW/2:21-cv-00226, WVS/2:21-cv-00079 (LAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery County Ohio et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montgomery County Ohio
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medina County
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Parma Heights, Ohio
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Fire District
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fayette County
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuyahoga County
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Boston Heights, Ohio
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Strongsville, Ohio
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portage County (OH)
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Lakemore, Ohio
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Lisa Marie Saltzburg
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Copley Township, Ohio
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painsville Township, Ohio
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springfield Township, Ohio
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison County
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuyahoga Falls, City Of
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Franklin, City of
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Munroe Falls, City of
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stark, County of
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Dayton, Ohio
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora, City of
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Warrensville Heights, Ohio
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Lorain, Ohio
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent, City of
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairlawn Ohio, City of
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson County, Ohio
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Broadview Heights
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stow, City of
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trumbull County
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Represented By: Linda Singer
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norton, City of
Represented By: Lisa M. Saltzburg
Represented By: Joseph J. Ciaccio
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Represented By: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: SCOTT D. SIMPKINS
Represented By: Frank L. Gallucci, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Represented By: James Lawrence Bernard
Represented By: David M. Cheifetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?