-DLP Davis et al v. Gunter et al
Plaintiff: Stan Davis and Richard Rayes
Defendant: Florence Beitler, Harold W. Clarke, Frank O. Gunter and Arlene Murray
Case Number: 4:1988cv00462
Filed: November 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: David L. Piester
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 43 "Motion for Hearing for Appointment of Attorney," "Motion for Emergency Tempory (sic) Restraining Order & Motion for Immediate Hearing Res Ipsa Loquitur Appointment of Attorney." Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(EJL)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 40 Motion for Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(EJL)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS- The defendants' Motions to Terminate Consent Decree and Dismiss Case (filing no. 31 ) are denied. Plaintiff Richard Rayes' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (filing no. 26 ) and Motion for Dis covery (filing no. 27 ) are denied without prejudice to reassertion in the proper forum. The defendants' Objection to Motion for Discovery (filing no. 34 ) is granted. Plaintiff Richard Rayes' Motion for Leave to Submit Exhibits (filing no. 38 ) is granted to the extent that the court has accepted these documents for filing. To the extent it seeks any other relief, the motion is denied. The clerk of the court is directed to return all exhibits maintained in the clerk's office to Plaintiff Richard Rayes. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(Exhibits referred to in filings 29 and 38 returned as ordered to Plaintiff Richard Rayes) (GJG)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The clerk of the court shall send a copy of this Memorandum and Order, along with a copy of plaintiff Richard Rayes' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (filing no. 26 ) and Motion for Discovery (filing no. 27 ), to N ebraska Attorney General Jon Bruning via United States mail. The clerk of the court shall also send a copy of these three filings via United States mail to Linda Willard in the Nebraska Attorney General's office. The defendants shall file a res ponse to the pending motions no later thanDecember 20, 2010. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management in this case with the following text: December 20, 2010: deadline for Defendants to respond to pending motions. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copies mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: -DLP Davis et al v. Gunter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence Beitler
Represented By: Robert M. Spire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold W. Clarke
Represented By: Robert M. Spire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank O. Gunter
Represented By: Robert M. Spire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Murray
Represented By: Robert M. Spire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?