Seger, et al v. USA, et al
Plaintiff: Douglas W. Matschullat, Helen Sue Matschullat, David Schwaninger, Karen M. Seger, Paul F. Seger and Dewane Spilker
Defendant: Rails-to-Trails and United States of America
Intervenor: William Schneider
Case Number: 4:1999cv03056
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER that said motions are granted. Stuart C. Gillespie is deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for the United States. Member Cases: 8:99-cv-00315-LES-MDN, 4:99-cv-03056-LES-MDN, 4:99-cv-03153-LES-MDN, 4:99-cv-03154-LES-MDN. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER - Filing No. 402 in 8:99CV315 and Filing No. 403 in 8:99CV315 are denied as moot. Filing No. 381 in 4:99CV3056; Filing No. 304 in 4:99CV3153; and Filing No. 357 in 4:99CV3154 are granted. Samual D. Heins is deemed withdrawn, and th e clerk of court shall remove his name from CM/ECF. Filing No. 382 in 4:99CV3056; Filing No. 305 in 4:99CV3153; and Filing No. 358 in 4:99CV3154 are granted. Stacey L. Mills is deemed withdrawn, and the clerk of court shall remove her name from CM/ECF. Member Cases: 8:99-cv-00315-LES-FG3, 4:99-cv-03056-LES-FG3, 4:99-cv-03153-LES-FG3, 4:99-cv-03154-LES-FG3 Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed)(MKR)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney Stacey L. Mills is directed to pay the $20.00 biennial assessment or show cause why she is unable to pay this fee, on or before March 18, 2016. Show Cause Deadline set for 3/18/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed) (MKR)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER that Attorney Cecilia Fex has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Ms. Fex is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why she is unable to do so. Show Cause Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MTB)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER that the parties shall file a status report by 5/27/2010. Member Cases: 8:99-cv-00315-LES-FG3, 4:99-cv-03056-LES-FG3, 4:99-cv-03153-LES-FG3, 4:99-cv-03154-LES-FG3 Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER - At the request of the parties, IT IS ORDERED that they shall have until February 26, 2010, to file a status report as to whether these case should be scheduled for trial or whether motions will be filed and they will be submitted on briefs.( Status Report due by 2/26/2010.) Member Cases: 8:99-cv-00315-LES-FG3, 4:99-cv-03056-LES-FG3, 4:99-cv-03153-LES- FG3, 4:99-cv-03154-LES-FG3 Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed) (MKR) Modified on 2/10/2010 to reflect Copies mailed.(MKR, ).
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER - The parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 12, 2010, as to whether these case should be scheduled for trial or whether motions will be filed and they will be submitted on briefs. Member Cases: 8:99-cv-00315-LES-FG3, 4:99-cv-03056-LES-FG3, 4:99-cv-03153-LES-FG3, 4:99-cv-03154-LES-FG3. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seger, et al v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas W. Matschullat
Represented By: Max W. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Sue Matschullat
Represented By: Max W. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schwaninger
Represented By: Andrew W. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M. Seger
Represented By: Max W. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul F. Seger
Represented By: Max W. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewane Spilker
Represented By: Andrew W. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rails-to-Trails
Represented By: Richard A. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mark S. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: William Schneider
Represented By: Cecilia Fex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?