Ivey v. Gibson
Petitioner: David Ivey
Respondent: William R. Gibson
Case Number: 4:2007cv03242
Filed: October 1, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The request of the Petitioner, David Ivey, for a certificate of appealability 71 is granted with respect to the following issues: whether Ivey exhausted his remedies, in that he was held under an adjudication of a mental heal th board that was upheld by a state court's judgment; and, if not, whether the district court should have stayed his motion filed under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 pending exhaustion of his remedies. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this memorandum and order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals and to process this appeal. The Petitioner, David Ivey, may proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAE, )
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner David Ivey's Motion for Summary Judgment 58 is denied. Petitioner David Ivey's Motion for Hearing 60 is denied. Respondents' Motion for Summary Judgment 62 is granted. Respondents' Motion to Strike Brief 67 is denied. Petitioner David Ivey's Petition for Habeas Corpus is dismissed without prejudice; and A separate Judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KBJ)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 53 Motion for Leave to file a second amended answer is granted and the second amended answer shall be filed forthwith. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (CAR)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is denied; The petitioner is granted until November 13, 2007 to pay the $5.00 filing fee. The petitioner is warned that if the fee is not paid as required , the court may dismiss this case, without further notice; The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: November 13, 2007: deadline for petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee; and No further review of this case shall take place until the filing fee is paid. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 11/13/2007-deadline for petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR) Copy mailed to petitioner
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivey v. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William R. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?