ACS State Healthcare v. Heineman et al
Plaintiff: ACS State Healthcare
Defendant: Jon Bruning, Carlos Castillo, Dave Heineman, Christine Peterson and Steve Sulek
Case Number: 4:2008cv03021
Filed: February 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY EXHIBITS SHOULD NOT BE DESTROYED.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation 275 is approved and adopted; this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 FIFTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The Joint Motion to Amend Fourth Amended Final Progression Order 267 is granted. Discovery deadline set for 3/5/2010. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/26/2010 at 9:30am before Magistrate F.A. Gossett in chambers. Trial is set to commence on 5/10/2010 at 9:00am before the Honorable Lyle E. Strom and a jury. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 FOURTH AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting 264 Motion to Continue ; All discovery, whether or not intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by February 12, 2010; The Final Pretrial Conference is set for April 26, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. befo re Magistrate F. A. Gosssett, in chambers, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Trial is set to commence at 9:00 a.m. on May 10, 2010, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Lyle E. Strom and a jury. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER - The Joint Motion to Extend 262 is granted. The deadline to complete discovery is extended to December 15, 2009; The deadline to file summary judgment motions is extended to December 15, 2009. All other deadlines contained in the third amended final progression order 259 remain in full force and effect. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the stipulated motion to amend protective order 258 . The Court finds the motion should be granted. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that said motion is granted; the protective order is amended in accordance with Addendum A attached hereto. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - ACS's Motion to Compel a discovery response 208 is denied. ACS's Motion to Compel a discovery response 242 is granted to the extent it seeks the production of documents. ACS's request for attorney's fe es and expenses is denied. FourThought shall produce the responsive documents within three days of the date this order is filed. FourThought's motion to dismiss the third amended complaint 227 is denied. ACS's motion to strike certain persons on defendant's non-expert witness list 246 is denied without prejudice. The parties' joint motion to continue the trial date and amend the second amended final progression order 255 is granted. A third amended progression order will be prepared and filed separately. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER - Defendant shall provide all documents that are the subject of plaintiff's Motion to Compel 208 that have not been produced on the grounds of privilege to the Court for in camera inspection within three (3) days. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER approving and adopting the 222 Stipulation. The deadline for filing motions challenging the qualifications of an expert or the admissibility of testimony of an expert witness under Rule 702 (Daubert) is extended to July 17, 2009. Motions fo r summary judgment shall be filed on or before July 31, 2009. A final pretrial conference is scheduled before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett on: Monday, August 10, 2009, at 10 a.m. in his chambers, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse , 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Trial of this matter remains scheduled before the undersigned on: Monday, August 31, 2009, at 9 a.m. Courtroom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - FourThought's motion to strike portions of the Second Amended Complaint 181 is granted to the extent it is in accordance with this memorandum and is denied in all other respects. ACS's motion for leave to file inst anter a sur-reply to FourThought's motion to strike 200 is granted. ACS's motion for a hearing on unresolved objections to deposition subpoenas 202 is denied. ACS shall have until May 29, 2009, to file a Third Amended Complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 SECOND AMENDED FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The Joint Motion to Amend 176 is granted. The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 7/28/09 at 10:00 am before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett in chambers. Trial is scheduled for 8/31/09 at 9:00 am before Judge Lyle E. Strom and a jury. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER regarding Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett set for 2/4/2009 at 9:30 A.M.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (ARL,)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to dismiss state defendants without prejudice and to lift the stay of discovery 160 is granted; counts one and two of the plaintiff's second amended complaint and defendants David Heineman, Jon Bruning, Carlos C astillo, Christine Peterson, and Steve Sulek are dismissed without prejudice; the remaining parties may resume discovery. State defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings 152 is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend 158 is granted; plaintiff shall have until October 24, 2008, to file its brief in opposition to State Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings 152 . Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 154 Motions to Stay Discovery 154 , 155 . Discovery is stayed pending the Court's ruling on the State defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAE, )
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 151 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying as moot 60 objection; denying as moot 73 objection; denying as moot 74 objection, all without prejudice to refiling. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER - The clerk shall file the notice of appeal under seal in view of the outrageous and scurrilous comments contained in the notice which are totally irrelevant to the issues of the principal case. The notice of appeal is deemed filed but not forwarded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit until Jonathan Lee Riches pays the appropriate filingfee. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed to intervor Jonathan Lee Riches) (KBJ)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of Recusal; Request for Reassignment. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (SMS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACS State Healthcare v. Heineman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Bruning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Heineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Sulek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACS State Healthcare
Represented By: Amber A. Furbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?