Nebraska Association of School Boards v. Strategic Governmental Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Nebraska Association of School Boards
Defendant: Strategic Governmental Solutions and MeccaTech
Case Number: 4:2008cv03052
Filed: March 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: David L. Piester
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1335 Interpleader Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED ORDER RELEASING FUNDS that the Joint Motion for Release of Funds 53 is granted; the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska is directed to release the $607,426.63 deposited by Interpleader Plaintiff Nebr aska Association of School Boards ("NASB") and all accrued interest, via check, to the Chapter 7 bankruptcy estate of Strategic Governmental Solutions, Inc., No. 08-11047 (Bkrtcy. N.D.N.Y) administered by Philip J. Danaher, Chapter 7 Trustee of Strategic Governmental Solutions, Inc. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (copy to financial specialist) (ADB, ) Modified on 8/21/2009 to create link. (JAE, ).
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RELEASING FUNDS - The Joint Motion for Release of Funds 53 is granted; and Pursuant to the agreement of the parties and the Order Approving Settlement entered by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of New York, the Cl erk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska is directed to release the $607,426.63 deposited by Interpleader Plaintiff Nebraska Association of School Boards (NASB) and all accrued interest, via check, to Philip J Danaher, U.S. Trustee, 252 Broadway, Rensselaer, New York 12144. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy to Financial Administrator) (KBJ)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 48 Motion to Dismiss Nebraska Association of School Boards. The Clerk shall continue to hold the funds deposited by NASB in the amount of $607,426.63 in the registry of the Court until further notice. Defendants Strategic Governmental Solutions, Inc., MeccaTech, Inc., Educational Services & Products, LLC and Fifth Third Bank are restrained and enjoined from instituting or prosecuting any action against NASB in any state or federal court for the recovery of t he funds or otherwise affecting the funds at issue in this case. NASB is granted leave to submit an application for costs and attorneys' fees incurred in connection with this interpleader action. NASB will serve copies of this Order on all parties and on the bankruptcy trustees for SGS and file proof of service within 10 days of this Order. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The court will terminate the appearance of Laura R. Hegge as counsel for the Nebraska Association of School Boards and will stop electronic notices to Laura R. Hegge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nebraska Association of School Boards v. Strategic Governmental Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska Association of School Boards
Represented By: Laura R. Hegge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Governmental Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MeccaTech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?