Montin v. Ramsey et al
Plaintiff: John Maxwell Montin
Defendant: Barbra Ramsey, Wendal Roscoe, Corrine McCoy, Bill Gibson, Mary Sullivan and Christine Peterson
Case Number: 4:2008cv03082
Filed: April 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (filing no. 86 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG )
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Defendants Bill Gibson and Mary Sullivan's Motion for Summary Judgment (filing no. 67 ) is granted. All claims against Gibson and Sullivan are dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. All other pending motions are denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding pending motions. 1. Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntary Dismiss in Part (filing no. 45 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court is directed to terminate Christine Peterson, Corrine McCoy, and Wendel Roscoe as Defendants in this matter. 2. Defendants Peterson and McCoys Motion to Dismiss (filing no. 34 ) is denied as moot. 3. Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Document (filing no. 47 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend or Vacate Order (filing no. 38 ) is denied as moot. 4. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (filing no. 48 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion in accordance with a progression order. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affidavits (filing no. 59 ) is denied as moot. 5. Plaintiff's Motion to Seal (filing no. 61 ) is granted. 6. All claims against Defendant Barbra Ramsey are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the court is directed to terminate Barbra Ramsey as a Defendant in this matter. 7. A separate progression order will be entered progressing this matter to final disposition. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Out of Time (filing no. 31 ) is granted. Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading by February 27, 2009. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (filing no. 26 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting MOTION to Extend 23 and MOTION for additional summons forms 19 . To obtain service of process on Defendants, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the court will provide. Plaintiff sha ll, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time, until March 18, 2009, to complete servic e of process. Plaintiff is hereby notified that failure to obtain service of process on the remaining two Defendants by March 18, 2009 will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice as to such defendant. A defendant has twenty (20) da ys after receipt of the summons to answer or otherwise respond to a complaint. The parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the Local Rules of this court. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: March 18, 2009: Check for completion of service of summons on remaining Defendants. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with 2 summons and 2 USM-285 forms)(LKH)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against Defendant Peterson are dismissed. Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment claims for injunctive relief against Defendant Peterson, and Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment claim s for both monetary and injunctive relief against Defendants Ramsey, Roscoe, McCoy, Gibson, and Sullivan may proceed and service is now warranted. To obtain service of process on Defendants, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the court will provide. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. Plaintiff is hereby notified tha t failure to obtain service of process on a defendant within 120 days of the date of this order may result in dismissal of this matter without further notice as to such defendant. The parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by t he Local Rules of this court. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: January 26, 2009: Check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with 6 summons and 6 USM-285 forms)(LKL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montin v. Ramsey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maxwell Montin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbra Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendal Roscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrine McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?