Fanders v. Hy-Vee
Plaintiff: Lukas Fanders
Defendant: Hy-Vee
Case Number: 4:2008cv03100
Filed: May 13, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: David L. Piester
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SETTLEMENT ORDER. It is ordered that: (1) Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court (and provide a copy to the magistrate judge and to United States District Judge Richard G. Kopf, the trial judge to whom this case is assigned), together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case;(2)Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice;(3)This case is removed from the court's trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled.***Set Dismissal Papers Deadline -- due by 5/4/2009. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-The parties have advised the court that they intend to mediate this case, and jointly request that the progression of this case be stayed for sixty days pending the outcome of mediation. Based on the representations of the partie s, IT IS ORDERED: 1) The parties' joint request to stay the deadlines set forth in the court's progression order, (filing no. 18 ), while the parties pursue settlement through mediation is granted. 2) This case is stayed until April 3, 200 9. 3) On or before April 3, 2009, the parties shall either advise the court that the case is settled, or shall jointly file a proposed schedule for continued progression of this case to trial., ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 4/3/2009.) Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKH)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fanders v. Hy-Vee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lukas Fanders
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?