Mare v. Peters et al
Plaintiff: Mare
Defendant: Mary E. Peters, John H. Hill and Elyse Mueller
Case Number: 4:2008cv03126
Filed: June 17, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Otoe
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: David L. Piester
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is given until December 19, 2008 in which to hire substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance in this case, or to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the cour t's orders, IN THE ABSENCE OF WHICH THIS CASE WILL BE SUBJECT TO DISMISSAL WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. Plaintiff is given until December 31, 2008 in which to respond to the pending motion to dismiss, filing 15 and to file the required corporate di sclosure statement or show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the court's orders, IN THE ABSENCE OF WHICH THIS CASE WILL BE SUBJECT TO DISMISSAL WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. ( Show Cause Deadline set for 12/19/2008.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (Copy mailed to pro se party and to former counsel as ordered)(GJG, )
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER regarding 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS ORDERED: 1. The motion of counsel for the plaintiff to withdraw, filing no. 21 , is granted, effective upon the filing of a certificate of service or affidavit indicating that the plaintiff has been served with a copy of this order. 2. Corporations may not proceed pro se. Therefore plaintiff is given until November 17, 2008 in which to obtain the services of substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance in its behalf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKL)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement 4 . IT THEREFORE HEREBY IS ORDERED, Counsel for plaintiff, Mares Inc., shall file the Corporate Disclosure Statement on or before October 14, 2008 or show cause by written affidavit why they cannot comply with the rules of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mare v. Peters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mare
Represented By: Tony J. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary E. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elyse Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?